Drevaleva v. U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs et al
Plaintiff: Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva
Defendant: U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs and Peter O'Rourke
Case Number: 5:2018cv03748
Filed: June 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 200 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 19-cv-6127-DMR. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/11/2019. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER DENYING 174 175 192 MOTIONS FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, TO CHANGE VENUE, AND TO VACATE JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2019)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER RE IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS ON APPEAL (re 179 ). Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/14/2019. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO VACATE by Judge William Alsup [denying 155 Motion to Vacate]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2019) Modified on 8/5/2019 (whasec, COURT STAFF).
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 155 JUDGMENT in favor of defendants United States Department of Veterans Affairs and Robert Wilkie, Secretary, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, and against plaintiff. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/11/2019. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 149 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 5/30/2019. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 141 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases 3:19-cv-02665-LB and 3:18-cv-03748-WHA. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 05/21/2019. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2019)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISQUALIFY re 102 Affidavit filed by Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/9/2019. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR JUDICIAL RECUSAL, FOR JUDICIAL RECUSAL, AND REFERRING MOTION TO DISQUALIFY TO ANOTHER DISTRICT JUDGE FOR DECISION [re 124 MOTION to Amend/Correct for Severance filed by Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva, 96 Fir st MOTION to Stay the Libel, the IIED, and the Constitutional causes of action filed by Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva, 99 MOTION for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration filed by Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva, 126 ADMIN ISTRATIVE MOTION Certify my case to Chief Justice of the 9th Circuit or to appoint a Master 42 U.S. Code §2000e5(f)(4)-(5) filed by Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva, 86 First MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration filed by Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 2/25/2019. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2019)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 OMNIBUS ORDER DENYING MOTIONS TO CERTIFY ORDER FOR INTERLOCUTORY REVIEW (re 76 77 84 ), FOR RECONSIDERATION (re 78 ), AND FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (re 81 82 ) AND VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2019)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER DENYING 65 MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF REVOCATION OF IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS ON APPEAL. Signed by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2018)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER GRANTING 34 MOTION TO DISMISS AND DENYING 38 39 MOTIONS TO STRIKE AND FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2018)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER REVOKING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS ON APPEAL (re 58 ). Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/26/2018. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2018)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S INQUIRIES. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/19/2018. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2018)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION by Judge William Alsup [denying 55 Motion for Leave to File]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING by Judge William Alsup [denying 42 Motion for Leave to File]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2018)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drevaleva v. U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter O'Rourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?