Johnson v. Quach et al

Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Defendant: Express Gas & Auto Service Inc., Ut Thi Quach and Loi Quach
Case Number: 5:2018cv04196
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
0 Judge: Edward J Davila
1 Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 10, 2018 12 ANSWER to Complaint byExpress Gas & Auto Service Inc., Loi Quach, Ut Thi Quach. (Do, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/10/2018)
September 10, 2018 11 NOTICE by Scott Johnson of Withdrawal of counsel (Khushpreet Mehton) (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Carson, Chris) (Filed on 9/10/2018)
September 5, 2018 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Farrell Jay Goodman (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Goodman, Farrell) (Filed on 9/5/2018)
September 3, 2018 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Johnson. Ut Thi Quach served on 9/3/2018, answer due 9/24/2018. (Carson, Chris) (Filed on 9/3/2018)
September 3, 2018 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Johnson. Express Gas & Auto Service Inc. served on 9/3/2018, answer due 9/24/2018. (Carson, Chris) (Filed on 9/3/2018)
August 30, 2018 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Johnson. Loi Quach served on 8/23/2018, answer due 9/13/2018. (Carson, Chris) (Filed on 8/30/2018)
July 13, 2018 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 13, 2018 5 Summons Issued as to Express Gas & Auto Service Inc., Loi Quach, Ut Thi Quach. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 13, 2018 4 Case assigned to Judge Edward J. Davila. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 13, 2018 3 Proposed Summons. (Carson, Chris) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 13, 2018 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Scott Johnson re #1 Complaint, (Carson, Chris) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 13, 2018 1 COMPLAINT For Damages And Injunctive Relief For Violations Of: Americans With Disabilities Act; Unruh Civil Rights Act against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12509469.). Filed byScott Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carson, Chris) (Filed on 7/13/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Quach et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Gas & Auto Service Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan C. Do
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ut Thi Quach
Represented By: Jonathan C. Do
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loi Quach
Represented By: Jonathan C. Do
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Chris Carson
Represented By: Khushpreet R. Mehton
Represented By: Farrell Jay Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?