Johnson v. Sun et al

Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Defendant: Li Jun Sun, Eva Josephine Malek, DC and Timothy Roy Conley
Case Number: 5:2018cv04199
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
0 Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
1 Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 6, 2018 18 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING #16 SECOND STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/6/2018.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2018)
September 6, 2018 17 NOTICE by Scott Johnson of Withdrawal of counsel (Khushpreet Mehton) (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Carson, Chris) (Filed on 9/6/2018)
September 5, 2018 16 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Li Jun Sun. (Carlquist, Mark) (Filed on 9/5/2018)
August 30, 2018 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Johnson. Eva Josephine Malek, DC served on 8/24/2018, answer due 9/14/2018. (Carson, Chris) (Filed on 8/30/2018)
August 27, 2018 14 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING #11 FIRST STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/27/2018.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2018)
August 24, 2018 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Ann McAllister (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(McAllister, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/24/2018)
August 24, 2018 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Johnson. Timothy Roy Conley served on 8/23/2018, answer due 9/13/2018. (Carson, Chris) (Filed on 8/24/2018)
August 23, 2018 11 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER First Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Li Jun Sun. (Carlquist, Mark) (Filed on 8/23/2018)
August 14, 2018 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Johnson. Li Jun Sun served on 8/2/2018, answer due 8/23/2018. (Carson, Chris) (Filed on 8/14/2018)
July 19, 2018 9 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings pursuant to Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment to a U.S. District Court Judge. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 7/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2018)
July 18, 2018 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2018)
July 16, 2018 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Scott Johnson.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Carson, Chris) (Filed on 7/16/2018)
July 13, 2018 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 13, 2018 5 Summons Issued as to Timothy Roy Conley, Eva Josephine Malek, DC, Li Jun Sun. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 13, 2018 4 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/27/2018. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 13, 2018 3 Proposed Summons. (Carson, Chris) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 13, 2018 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Scott Johnson re #1 Complaint, (Carson, Chris) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 13, 2018 1 COMPLAINT For Damages And Injunctive Relief For Violations Of: Americans With Disabilities Act; Unruh Civil Rights Act against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12509489.). Filed byScott Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carson, Chris) (Filed on 7/13/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Sun et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Represented By: Khushpreet R. Mehton
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Chris Carson
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Represented By: Jennifer Ann McAllister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Li Jun Sun
Represented By: Mark Steven Carlquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eva Josephine Malek, DC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Roy Conley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?