Johnson v. Booton et al
Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Defendant: Cheryl A. Booton, Starbucks Corporation and Brian E. Booton
Case Number: 5:2018cv04216
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2018 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Johnson. Cheryl A. Booton served on 8/23/2018, answer due 9/13/2018. (Carson, Chris) (Filed on 8/30/2018)
August 24, 2018 Filing 16 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Starbucks Corporation.. (Zong, Julie) (Filed on 8/24/2018)
August 17, 2018 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 8/31/2018. (djmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2018)
August 15, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur Slezak Gaus (Gaus, Arthur) (Filed on 8/15/2018)
August 15, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle D. Jew (Jew, Michelle) (Filed on 8/15/2018)
August 15, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Cathy L. Arias (Arias, Cathy) (Filed on 8/15/2018)
August 15, 2018 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Starbucks Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Starbucks Corporation for Starbucks Corporation. (Zong, Julie) (Filed on 8/15/2018)
August 15, 2018 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Entities by Starbucks Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Starbucks Corporation for Starbucks Corporation. (Zong, Julie) (Filed on 8/15/2018)
August 15, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byStarbucks Corporation. (Zong, Julie) (Filed on 8/15/2018)
July 16, 2018 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Scott Johnson.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Carson, Chris) (Filed on 7/16/2018)
July 16, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2018)
July 16, 2018 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Carson, Chris) (Filed on 7/16/2018)
July 13, 2018 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 13, 2018 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/27/2018. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 13, 2018 Filing 3 *** DUPLICATE DOCKET ENTRY *** Certificate of Interested Entities (Carson, Chris) (Filed on 7/13/2018) Modified on 7/13/2018 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 13, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Scott Johnson re #1 Complaint, (Carson, Chris) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Damages And Injunctive Relief For Violations Of: Americans With Disabilities Act; Unruh Civil Rights Act against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12511258.). Filed byScott Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carson, Chris) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 13, 2018 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Duplicate entry. [err103]Incorrect PDF attached. [err201]This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-fi le in its entirety. Re: #3 Proposed Summons filed by Scott Johnson (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Booton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Represented By: Chris Carson
Represented By: Khushpreet R. Mehton
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl A. Booton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Represented By: Julie Yin Zong
Represented By: Arthur Slezak Gaus
Represented By: Cathy L. Arias
Represented By: Michelle D. Jew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian E. Booton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?