Flex Logix v. Konda et al
Plaintiff: Flex Logix
Defendant: Venkat Konda and Konda Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2018cv04222
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Lucy H Koh
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Flex Logix. Flex Logix served on 8/3/2018, answer due 8/24/2018. (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 13, 2018 #Electronic filing error. Document not properly linked. [err102]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #13 Certificate of Service filed by Flex Lo gix (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 13, 2018 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Please re-file in its entirety using correct event Summons Returned Executed. Re: #12 Certificate of Service filed by Fle x Logix (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 10, 2018 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 7 , #8 , 9 , #10 , #11 by Flex Logix (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 8/10/2018) Modified on 8/13/2018 linking entry to related documents (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2018 Filing 12 ***INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED WHEN POSTING DOCUMENT*** CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Flex Logix OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT AND ADDITIONAL INITIATING DOCUMENTS (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 8/10/2018) Modified on 8/13/2018 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
August 7, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Ann Laughton (Laughton, Elizabeth) (Filed on 8/7/2018)
August 2, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory P. Stone (Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 8/2/2018)
August 2, 2018 Filing 9 **CLERK'S NOTICE FOLLOWING CASE REASSIGNMENT TO THE HONORABLE LUCY H. KOH** Following the case reassignment to Hon. Lucy H. Koh, an Initial Case Management Conference is set for 10/17/2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th floor, in San Jose, California. A Joint Case Management Conference Statement is due 7 days before the scheduled conference date. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. The parties shall familiarize themselves with the Scheduling Notes and Standing Orders for the Hon. Lucy H. Koh: http://cand.uscourts.gov/lhk. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2018)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Lucy H. Koh pursuant to Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment to a U.S. District Court Judge. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive committee on 7/30/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2018)
July 30, 2018 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2018)
July 27, 2018 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Flex Logix.. (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 7/27/2018)
July 16, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Venkat Konda, Konda Technologies, Inc. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2018)
July 16, 2018 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/10/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/17/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2018)
July 16, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/30/2018. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2018)
July 13, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Perry, Steven) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for False Advertising and Unfair Business Practices against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12512369.). Filed byFlex Logix. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Perry, Steven) (Filed on 7/13/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flex Logix v. Konda et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flex Logix
Represented By: Steven McCall Perry
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Laughton,
Represented By: Gregory P. Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Venkat Konda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Konda Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?