NASSTECH, LLC v. OSNOVATION SYSTEMS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: NASSTECH, LLC
Defendant: OSNOVATION SYSTEMS, INC. dba OSNOVATIVE SYSTEMS, INC. and CSNK WORKING CAPITAl FINANCE, CORP.,
Case Number: 5:2018cv04417
Filed: July 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2018 Filing 42 Case Remanded to Santa Clara County Superior Court per docket #41 Order Adopting Report and Recommendation to Grant Motion to Remand. (Attachments: #1 Remand Order) (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/17/2018: #2 Certified Docket) (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER ADOPTING #26 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION TO GRANT #10 MOTION TO REMAND AND VACATING HEARING ON WRIT OF ATTACHMENT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/17/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2018)
August 10, 2018 Filing 40 NOTICE by NASSTECH, LLC OF REPLACEMENT UNDERTAKING (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Pereyda, Jamie) (Filed on 8/10/2018)
August 9, 2018 Filing 39 Receipt for Surety Bond in the amount of $10,000.00 from SureTec Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Bond for Temporary Protective Order)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2018)
August 9, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE by NASSTECH, LLC OF UNDERTAKING (Eckhardt, Kevin) (Filed on 8/9/2018)
August 9, 2018 Filing 37 Summons Issued as to CSNK WORKING CAPITAl FINANCE, CORP.,. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2018)
August 9, 2018 Filing 36 Proposed Summons. (Pereyda, Jamie) (Filed on 8/9/2018)
August 8, 2018 Set Hearing on Plaintiff's Application for Writ of Attachment. Hearing set for 8/22/2018 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2018)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #32 PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION TO EXTEND STATE COURT TEMPORARY PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/8/2018.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2018)
August 8, 2018 Filing 34 Request for Judicial Notice re #32 Ex Parte Application to Extend State Court Temporary Protective Order; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byNASSTECH, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) #32 ) (Pereyda, Jamie) (Filed on 8/8/2018)
August 8, 2018 Filing 33 Declaration of Jamie L. Pereyda in Support of #32 Ex Parte Application to Extend State Court Temporary Protective Order; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byNASSTECH, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #32 ) (Pereyda, Jamie) (Filed on 8/8/2018)
August 8, 2018 Filing 32 Ex Parte Application to Extend State Court Temporary Protective Order; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by NASSTECH, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion to Extend State Court Temporary Protective Order)(Pereyda, Jamie) (Filed on 8/8/2018)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER DENYING #28 EX PARTE MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME FOR FILING OF MOTION FOR DE NOVO DETERMINATION OF DISPOSITIVE MATTER REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Beth Labson Freeman on 8/6/2018.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2018)
August 3, 2018 Filing 30 Request for Judicial Notice re #28 Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time for Filing of Motion for De Novo Determination of Dispositive Matter Referred to Magistrate Judge filed byNASSTECH, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #28 ) (Pereyda, Jamie) (Filed on 8/3/2018)
August 3, 2018 Filing 29 Declaration of Jamie L. Pereyda in Support of #28 Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time for Filing of Motion for De Novo Determination of Dispositive Matter Referred to Magistrate Judge filed byNASSTECH, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #28 ) (Pereyda, Jamie) (Filed on 8/3/2018)
August 3, 2018 Filing 28 Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time for Filing of Motion for De Novo Determination of Dispositive Matter Referred to Magistrate Judge filed by NASSTECH, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion to Shorten Time for Filing of Motion for De Novo Determination of Dispositive Matter Referred to Magistrate Judge)(Pereyda, Jamie) (Filed on 8/3/2018)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings pursuant to Report, Recommendation and Request for Reassignment to District Judge. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to the case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2018)
August 2, 2018 Filing 26 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION TO REMAND CASE BACK TO SANTA CLARA COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT; AND REQUESTING REASSIGNMENT TO DISTRICT COURT JUDGE DUE TO LACK OF CONSENT. RE: ECF #10 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 8/2/2018. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2018)
August 2, 2018 Filing 24 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 8/1/2018 1:26:03 PM ]. File Size [ 7632 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:15:54 ]. (courtspeak).
August 2, 2018 Filing 23 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 8/1/2018 1:07:09 PM ]. File Size [ 3800 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:07:55 ]. (courtspeak).
August 1, 2018 Filing 25 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins: Hearing re: Plaintiff's Motion to Remand #10 held on 8/1/2018: Court to issue report and recommendation to grant motion. Attorneys for Plaintiff: Jamie Pereyda, Kevin Ekhardt. Attorney for Defendants: Joshua Brysk. (FTR Time: 1:07pm - 1:15pm/1:26pm - 1:42pm. Time in Court: 24 mins) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/1/2018)
August 1, 2018 Filing 22 Certificate of Interested Entities by NASSTECH, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Shawn Langer, Other Affiliate Nissim Mashiach, Other Affiliate Ari Kellen for NASSTECH, LLC. (Pereyda, Jamie) (Filed on 8/1/2018)
July 31, 2018 Filing 21 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #10 MOTION to Remand , Request for Attorney's Fees and Costs ) filed byOSNOVATION SYSTEMS, INC. dba OSNOVATIVE SYSTEMS, INC.. (Schwartz, James) (Filed on 7/31/2018)
July 31, 2018 Filing 20 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL Of ACTION UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1441 (b) against OSNOVATION SYSTEMS, INC. dba OSNOVATIVE SYSTEMS, INC.. Filed byOSNOVATION SYSTEMS, INC. dba OSNOVATIVE SYSTEMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Schwartz, James) (Filed on 7/31/2018)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Motion to Appear by Telephone #17 . Counsel must contact the Courtroom Deputy at Lili_Harrell@cand.uscourts.gov to provide a direct dial number for this appearance. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2018)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion to Appear By Telephone #16 . Counsel must contact the Courtroom Deputy at Lili_Harrell@cand.uscourts.gov to provide a direct dial number for this appearance. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2018)
July 31, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Hearing on Motion to Remand filed by NASSTECH, LLC. (Eckhardt, Kevin) (Filed on 7/31/2018)
July 31, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Motion to Remand filed by OSNOVATION SYSTEMS, INC. dba OSNOVATIVE SYSTEMS, INC.. (Schwartz, James) (Filed on 7/31/2018)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Motion to Remand #7 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2018)
July 30, 2018 Reset Deadlines as to Motion to Remand and Request for Attorney's Fees and Costs #10 . Defendant's opposition due 7/31/2018; no reply. Hearing set for 8/1/2018 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2018)
July 27, 2018 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 8/3/2018. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2018)
July 27, 2018 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by NASSTECH, LLC.. (Pereyda, Jamie) (Filed on 7/27/2018)
July 27, 2018 Filing 12 Request for Judicial Notice re #10 MOTION to Remand , Request for Attorney's Fees and Costs filed byNASSTECH, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #10 ) (Pereyda, Jamie) (Filed on 7/27/2018)
July 27, 2018 Filing 11 Declaration of Jamie L. Pereyda in Support of #10 MOTION to Remand , Request for Attorney's Fees and Costs filed byNASSTECH, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #10 ) (Pereyda, Jamie) (Filed on 7/27/2018)
July 27, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand , Request for Attorney's Fees and Costs filed by NASSTECH, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 9/5/2018 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Responses due by 8/10/2018. Replies due by 8/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and Request for Attorney's Fees and Costs)(Pereyda, Jamie) (Filed on 7/27/2018)
July 27, 2018 Filing 9 Request for Judicial Notice re #7 Ex Parte Application to Remand and Request for Attorney's Fees and Costs, and Alternative Ex Parte Motion for Order to Shorten Time on Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed byNASSTECH, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #7 ) (Pereyda, Jamie) (Filed on 7/27/2018)
July 27, 2018 Filing 8 Declaration of Jamie L. Pereyda in Support of #7 Ex Parte Application to Remand and Request for Attorney's Fees and Costs, and Alternative Ex Parte Motion for Order to Shorten Time on Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed byNASSTECH, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #7 ) (Pereyda, Jamie) (Filed on 7/27/2018)
July 27, 2018 Filing 7 Ex Parte Application to Remand and Request for Attorney's Fees and Costs, and Alternative Ex Parte Motion for Order to Shorten Time on Hearing filed by NASSTECH, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion to Remand and Request for Attorney's Fees and Costs, #2 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion to Shorten Time for Hearing on Motion to Remand)(Pereyda, Jamie) (Filed on 7/27/2018)
July 26, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew I. Bobb for Plaintiff (Bobb, Matthew) (Filed on 7/26/2018)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION OVER LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. Re: Dkt. No. #1 . Defendants must file a response to this order by 8/3/2018. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 7/25/2018. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2018)
July 23, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie Lee Pereyda for Plaintiff (Pereyda, Jamie) (Filed on 7/23/2018)
July 23, 2018 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/17/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/24/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2018)
July 20, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/3/2018. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2018)
July 20, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Of ACTION UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1441 (b) from Santa Clara County Superior Court. Their case number is 18CV331129. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-12532482). Filed byOSNOVATION SYSTEMS, INC. dba OSNOVATIVE SYSTEMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schwartz, James) (Filed on 7/20/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NASSTECH, LLC v. OSNOVATION SYSTEMS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OSNOVATION SYSTEMS, INC. dba OSNOVATIVE SYSTEMS, INC.
Represented By: James Gerald Schwartz
Represented By: Joshua David Brysk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSNK WORKING CAPITAl FINANCE, CORP.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NASSTECH, LLC
Represented By: Kevin Michael Eckhardt
Represented By: Matthew I. Bobb
Represented By: Jamie Lee Pereyda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?