Bustamante et al v. Ford Motor Company et al

Plaintiff: aka Miguel Vincebustamante and Miguel Vinces Bustamante
Defendant: Ford Motor Company, DGDG 16, LLC dba Capitol Ford and DGDG 16, LLC
Case Number: 5:2018cv04818
Filed: August 9, 2018
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
0 Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
1 Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 4, 2018 Case transferred from California Northern has been opened in CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA as case 2:18-cv-07538, filed 08/29/2018. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2018)
August 31, 2018 13 MDL PANEL ORDER, ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Central District of California. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2018)
August 16, 2018 12 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AFTER REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Statement due by 11/1/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/8/2018 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2018)
August 14, 2018 11 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings pursuant to Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment to a U.S. District Court Judge. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 8/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2018)
August 13, 2018 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 13, 2018 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ford Motor Company.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Hugret, Spencer) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 13, 2018 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ford Motor Company of Judge Assignment (Hugret, Spencer) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 10, 2018 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/31/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/7/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2018)
August 9, 2018 1 Answer to Removal Complaint by DGDG 16, LLC, Ford Motor Company [1-1, Exhibit H]. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2018)
August 9, 2018 6 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/23/2018. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2018)
August 9, 2018 5 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patent by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceeding, #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceeding, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Hugret, Spencer) (Filed on 8/9/2018)
August 9, 2018 4 Ex Parte Application for an Order Staying All Proceedings and Deadlines Pending JPML Determination of Inclusion in Multidistrict Litigation (MDL No. 2814) filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Molly J. Mrowka, #2 Exhibit to Declaration of Molly J. Mroka, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Hugret, Spencer) (Filed on 8/9/2018)
August 9, 2018 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Molly Jeannette Mrowka (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Mrowka, Molly) (Filed on 8/9/2018)
August 9, 2018 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Spencer Peter Hugret (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Hugret, Spencer) (Filed on 8/9/2018)
August 9, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Clara. Their case number is 18cv331292. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-12581021). Filed byDGDG 16, LLC dba Capitol Ford, Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit to Removal, #2 Declaration of Spencer P. Hugret, #3 Declaration of Molly J. Mrowka, #4 Exhibit to Declaration of Molly J. Mrowka, #5 Exhibit to Declaration of Molly J. Mrowka, #6 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Hugret, Spencer) (Filed on 8/9/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bustamante et al v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: aka Miguel Vincebustamante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Vinces Bustamante
Represented By: Amy Morse
Represented By: Steve Mikhov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Represented By: Molly Jeannette Mrowka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DGDG 16, LLC dba Capitol Ford
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Represented By: Molly Jeannette Mrowka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DGDG 16, LLC
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Represented By: Molly Jeannette Mrowka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?