Brodsky v. Apple, Inc.

Plaintiff: Jay Brodsky
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2018cv04930
Filed: August 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Edward J Davila
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jay Brodsky. Apple, Inc. served on 9/6/2018, answer due 9/27/2018. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
August 28, 2018 Filing 11 Receipt of acknowledgment from US Marshals. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2018)
August 27, 2018 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 USM-285)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2018)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/27/2018. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/27/2018: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (amkS, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2018 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jay Brodsky. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2018)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings Pursuant to Order Relating Case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to the case. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service, #2 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2018)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RELATING CASE. It is hereby ordered that Case 5:18-md-02827-EJD In Re: Apple Inc. Device Performance Litigation is HEREBY RELATED to 5:18-cv-04930-NC Brodsky v. Apple, Inc., and such case shall be reassigned to Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/20/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2018)
August 15, 2018 Filing 5 SUA SPONTE Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases 18-cv-04930 NC and 18-md-02827 EJD. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 8/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2018).
August 15, 2018 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 8/29/2018. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2018)
August 14, 2018 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/7/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/14/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2018)
August 14, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jay Brodsky. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2018)
August 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Apple, Inc.. Filed byJay Brodsky. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brodsky v. Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Brodsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?