Tecson v. Robinhood Crypto, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Vivian Tecson
Defendant: Robinhood Crypto, LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc. and Robinhood Financial LLC
Case Number: 5:2018cv05185
Filed: August 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Referring Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 Filing 17 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Robinhood Crypto, LLC, Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc.. (Heath, Jacob) (Filed on 11/15/2018)
October 31, 2018 Filing 16 STIPULATION for Extension to Respond to Complaint filed by Robinhood Crypto, LLC, Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc.. (Heath, Jacob) (Filed on 10/31/2018)
October 30, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE by Vivian Tecson Notice of Separation of Attorney (Zelenski, Abigail) (Filed on 10/30/2018)
October 12, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE by Vivian Tecson (Notice of Separation of Attorney) (Zelenski, David) (Filed on 10/12/2018)
September 26, 2018 Filing 13 STIPULATION for Extension to Respond to Complaint filed by Robinhood Crypto, LLC, Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc.. (Heath, Jacob) (Filed on 9/26/2018)
September 12, 2018 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AFTER REASSIGNMENT.Case Management Statement due by 11/29/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/6/2018 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2018)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings pursuant to Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment to a U.S. District Court Judge. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen remains as referral judge assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 9/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2018)
September 11, 2018 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (djmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2018)
September 6, 2018 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Entities by Vivian Tecson (Zelenski, David) (Filed on 9/6/2018)
September 6, 2018 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Vivian Tecson.. (Zelenski, David) (Filed on 9/6/2018)
August 29, 2018 Filing 7 STIPULATION [JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT] filed by Robinhood Crypto, LLC, Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc.. (Heath, Jacob) (Filed on 8/29/2018)
August 23, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Robinhood Crypto, LLC, Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc. (Heath, Jacob) (Filed on 8/23/2018)
August 23, 2018 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/13/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/20/2018 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2018)
August 23, 2018 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/6/2018. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2018)
August 23, 2018 Filing 3 FEE PAID (Filing fee$400,receipt number 0971-12622043). (Heath, Jacob) (Filed on 8/23/2018)
August 23, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Robinhood Crypto, LLC, Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Robinhood Markets, Inc. for Robinhood Crypto, LLC, Robinhood Financial LLC. (Heath, Jacob) (Filed on 8/23/2018)
August 23, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of CIVIL ACTION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. Section 1331, 1332(D), 1441, 1446, and 1453 from Santa Clara Superior Court. Their case number is 18cv323584. (). Filed byRobinhood Crypto, LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Financial LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Declaration of Jacob M. Heath in Support of Defendants' Notive of Removal, #5 Declaration of Abhishek Fatehpuria in Support of Defendants' Notive of Removal, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Heath, Jacob) (Filed on 8/23/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tecson v. Robinhood Crypto, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinhood Crypto, LLC
Represented By: Jacob Marcus Heath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinhood Markets, Inc.
Represented By: Jacob Marcus Heath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinhood Financial LLC
Represented By: Jacob Marcus Heath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vivian Tecson
Represented By: David Zelenski
Represented By: Abigail Ameri Zelenski
Represented By: Michael Joe Jaurigue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?