Pauly et al v. Stanford Health Care
Plaintiff: Makenzie B Pauly and Faiza Marie Pauly
Defendant: Stanford Health Care and Stanford Hospital and Clinics
Case Number: 5:2018cv05387
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Referring Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 REPLY (re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP, Rule 12(b)(6) ) filed byStanford Health Care. (Northrop, Carolyn) (Filed on 10/18/2018)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 OPPOSITION (re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP, Rule 12(b)(6) ) filed by Faiza Marie Pauly, Makenzie B Pauly. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2018)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Renotice motion hearing re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP, Rule 12(b)(6) filed byStanford Health Care. (Related document(s) #8 ) (Northrop, Carolyn) (Filed on 10/2/2018)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DENYING #2 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES RE NONPATIENT STANDING. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/1/2018.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/15/2018: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tshS, COURT STAFF).
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING MOTION HEARINGS AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AFTER REASSIGNMENT and CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. #8 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP, Rule 12(b)(6), #2 MOTION for Leave to File.Case Management Statement due by 3/28/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/4/2019 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2018) (tshS, COURT STAFF).
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings pursuant to Order Directing Clerk to Reassign Case to District Judge. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen remains as referral judge assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Eecutive Committee on 9/28/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (djm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Stanford Health Care identifying Corporate Parent Stanford University for Stanford Health Care. (Northrop, Carolyn) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Stanford Health Care.. (Northrop, Carolyn) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Stanford Health Care. (Northrop, Carolyn) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Carolyn Laney Northrop for Thomas M. Gray, Esq. (Northrop, Carolyn) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP, Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Stanford Health Care. Motion Hearing set for 11/6/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Responses due by 10/11/2018. Replies due by 10/18/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Northrop, Carolyn) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Faiza Marie Pauly, Makenzie B Pauly.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2018)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Faiza Marie Pauly. Stanford Health Care served on 9/6/2018, answer due 9/27/2018. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2018)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/27/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/4/2018 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2018)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Stanford Health Care. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2018)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 [Proposed] Order Granting MOTION for Leave to File Pursuant to L.R. 7-11 re #2 by Faiza Marie Pauly, Makenzie B Pauly. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2018) Modified on 8/31/2018 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File Pursuant to L.R. 7-11 the attached MEMORANDUM in support of non patient standing in EMTALA support of complaint filed by Faiza Marie Pauly, Makenzie B Pauly. Responses due by 9/14/2018. Replies due by 9/21/2018. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2018) Modified on 8/31/2018 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Stanford Health Care (Filing fee of $ 400 paid, Receipt # 54611017670); Summons Issued filed by Makenzie B Pauly, Faiza Marie Pauly. Consent/Declination due by 9/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pauly et al v. Stanford Health Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Makenzie B Pauly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faiza Marie Pauly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanford Health Care
Represented By: Carolyn Laney Northrop
Represented By: Thomas Miles Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanford Hospital and Clinics
Represented By: Carolyn Laney Northrop
Represented By: Thomas Miles Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?