Wei v. San Jose Sharks et al

Plaintiff: Susan Wei
Defendant: Logan Couture and San Jose Sharks
Case Number: 5:2018cv05483
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2018 Filing 49 REPLY (re #44 First MOTION to Remand Santa Clara superior court,Notice of motion,declaration,proposed order ) filed bySusan Wei. (Wei, Susan) (Filed on 10/24/2018)
October 17, 2018 Filing 48 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #44 First MOTION to Remand Santa Clara superior court,Notice of motion,declaration,proposed order ) filed byLogan Couture, San Jose Sharks. (Protas, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/17/2018)
October 5, 2018 Filing 47 REPLY (re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (B) (6) and Motion to Strike Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(F); Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) filed byLogan Couture, San Jose Sharks. (Protas, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/5/2018)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K DeMarchi denying as moot #45 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2018)
October 3, 2018 Filing 44 First MOTION to Remand Santa Clara superior court,Notice of motion,declaration,proposed order filed by Susan Wei. Motion Hearing set for 11/13/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor before Magistrate Judge Virginia K DeMarchi. Responses due by 10/17/2018. Replies due by 10/24/2018. (Wei, Susan) (Filed on 10/3/2018)
October 3, 2018 Filing 43 First MOTION to Remand to Santa Clara Superior Court,Notice of Motion,declaration,proposed order filed by Susan Wei. Motion Hearing set for 11/13/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor before Magistrate Judge Virginia K DeMarchi. Responses due by 10/17/2018. Replies due by 10/24/2018. (Wei, Susan) (Filed on 10/3/2018)
September 28, 2018 Filing 42 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Susan Wei.. (Wei, Susan) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K DeMarchi re #32 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time and #11 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike. Motion Hearing set for 11/13/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor before Magistrate Judge Virginia K DeMarchi. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 28, 2018 Filing 40 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #32 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (B) (6) and Motion to Strike Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(F); Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) filed byLogan Couture, San Jose Sharks. (Protas, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 28, 2018 Filing 39 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (B) (6) and Motion to Strike Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(F); Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #32 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (B) (6) and Motion to Strike Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(F); Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) filed bySusan Wei. (Wei, Susan) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 25, 2018 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #36 Order, (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2018)
September 25, 2018 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #35 Order, (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2018)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER re Plaintiff's Consent/Declination. Plaintiff's definitive consent/declination due by 10/5/2018. Signed by Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 9/24/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pro Se Handbook)(vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2018)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER re #32 , #33 , #34 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike. Defendants' response due by 9/28/2018. Signed by Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 9/24/2018. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2018)
September 24, 2018 Filing 34 Proposed Order re Motion for Extension of Civil Local Rule 7-3 Filing Deadlines for Non-ECF User by Susan Wei. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2018)
September 24, 2018 Filing 33 Proposed Order re #32 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer to #11 MOTION to Dismiss by Susan Wei. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2018)
September 24, 2018 Filing 32 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer to #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Susan Wei. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2018)
September 24, 2018 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Logan Couture, San Jose Sharks re #29 Renotice motion hearing, #30 Proposed Order (Protas, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/24/2018)
September 24, 2018 Filing 30 Proposed Order re #29 Renotice motion hearing, by Logan Couture, San Jose Sharks. (Protas, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/24/2018)
September 24, 2018 Filing 29 Renotice motion hearing re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (B) (6) and Motion to Strike Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(F); Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byLogan Couture, San Jose Sharks. (Related document(s) #11 ) (Protas, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/24/2018)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K DeMarchi for all further proceedings. Judge Jeffrey S. White no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/21/2018. (jjb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/21/2018: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (bwS, COURT STAFF).
September 20, 2018 Filing 45 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Susan Wei. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Envelopes)(dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2018)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge For All Purposes. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/20/18. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2018)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #15 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2018)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/20/18. Case Management Statement due by 12/7/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/14/2018 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (certificate of service attached)(jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2018)
September 20, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (B) (6) and Motion to Strike Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(F); Memorandum of Points and Authorities. Motion Hearing set for 11/16/2018 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor before Judge Jeffrey S. White. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2018)
September 19, 2018 Filing 26 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Susan Wei. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2018)
September 19, 2018 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Logan Couture, San Jose Sharks re #22 Proposed Order, #21 Renotice motion hearing, (Protas, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/19/2018)
September 19, 2018 Filing 22 Proposed Order re #21 Renotice motion hearing, by Logan Couture, San Jose Sharks. (Protas, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/19/2018)
September 19, 2018 Filing 21 Renotice motion hearing re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (B) (6) and Motion to Strike Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(F); Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byLogan Couture, San Jose Sharks. (Related document(s) #11 ) (Protas, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/19/2018)
September 19, 2018 Filing 20 Case Reassigned to District Judge Jeffrey S. White. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case no longer assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/19/2018: #2 Certificate/Proof of Service) (bwS, COURT STAFF).
September 18, 2018 Filing 19 This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2018)
September 18, 2018 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2018)
September 17, 2018 Filing 17 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Logan Couture, San Jose Sharks.. (Protas, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/17/2018)
September 17, 2018 Filing 16 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Susan Wei. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2018)
September 17, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Susan Wei. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2018)
September 14, 2018 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Logan Couture, San Jose Sharks re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (B) (6) and Motion to Strike Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(F); Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #13 Proposed Order, #12 Request for Judicial Notice, (Protas, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/14/2018)
September 14, 2018 Filing 13 Proposed Order re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (B) (6) and Motion to Strike Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(F); Memorandum of Points and Authorities by Logan Couture, San Jose Sharks. (Protas, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/14/2018)
September 14, 2018 Filing 12 Request for Judicial Notice re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (B) (6) and Motion to Strike Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(F); Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byLogan Couture, San Jose Sharks. (Related document(s) #11 ) (Protas, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/14/2018)
September 14, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (B) (6) and Motion to Strike Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(F); Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Logan Couture, San Jose Sharks. Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2018 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Responses due by 9/28/2018. Replies due by 10/5/2018. (Protas, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/14/2018)
September 10, 2018 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Logan Couture, San Jose Sharks (Protas, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/10/2018)
September 10, 2018 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: All parties shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 9/24/2018. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2018)
September 7, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Logan Couture, San Jose Sharks re #1 Notice of Removal, #3 Certificate of Interested Entities,, #2 Declaration in Support of Defendants' Notice of Removal (Protas, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
September 7, 2018 Filing 7 EXHIBITS re #1 Notice of Removal, filed byLogan Couture, San Jose Sharks. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Protas, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
September 7, 2018 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/5/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/12/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 7, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
September 7, 2018 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/21/2018. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
September 7, 2018 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet by Logan Couture, San Jose Sharks . (Protas, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
September 7, 2018 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Logan Couture, San Jose Sharks identifying Corporate Parent Sharks Minor Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent San Jose Arena Management LLC, Other Affiliate San Jose Sharks, Other Affiliate Sharks Ice, Other Affiliate San Jose Sports & Entertainment LLC, Other Affiliate SJS Enterprises Company, Other Affiliate National Hockey League Enterprises Canada, Inc., Other Affiliate NHL Enterprises Canada, L.P., Other Affiliate NHL Enterprises Inc., Other Affiliate NHL Enterprises LP, Other Affiliate National Hockey League for Logan Couture, San Jose Sharks. re #1 Notice of Removal (Protas, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
September 7, 2018 Filing 2 Declaration of Jennifer M. Protas in Support of #1 Notice of Removal filed byLogan Couture, San Jose Sharks. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Protas, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
September 7, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Clara County Superior Court. Their case number is 18CV328985. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-12659785). Filed by San Jose Sharks, Logan Couture. (Protas, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/7/2018) Modified on 9/7/2018 *** Initial Pleading NOT attached to the notice of removal. (cv, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wei v. San Jose Sharks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logan Couture
Represented By: Jennifer Michelle Protas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Jose Sharks
Represented By: Jennifer Michelle Protas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Wei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?