Sream, Inc. et al v. Ammari et al
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc. and RooR International, BV
Defendant: DOES 1 though 10, inclusive and Adel Ammari
Case Number: 5:2018cv05686
Filed: September 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2018 ***Civil Case Terminated pursuant to Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Action #12 . (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2018)
October 16, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by RooR International, BV, Sream, Inc. (Vakil, Imran) (Filed on 10/16/2018)
October 8, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sream, Inc., RooR International, BV. Adel Ammari served on 10/7/2018, answer due 10/29/2018. (Vakil, Imran) (Filed on 10/8/2018)
October 1, 2018 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by RooR International, BV, Sream, Inc... (Vakil, Imran) (Filed on 10/1/2018)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING Motion to Appear by Telephone filed by Plaintiffs #8 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2018)
September 26, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by RooR International, BV, Sream, Inc.. (Vakil, Imran) (Filed on 9/26/2018)
September 18, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Adel Ammari. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2018)
September 18, 2018 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/12/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/19/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 7, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2018)
September 18, 2018 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/2/2018. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2018)
September 17, 2018 Filing 4 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by RooR International, BV, Sream, Inc. (Vakil, Imran) (Filed on 9/17/2018)
September 17, 2018 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by RooR International, BV, Sream, Inc. (Vakil, Imran) (Filed on 9/17/2018)
September 17, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Vakil, Imran) (Filed on 9/17/2018)
September 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Adel Ammari, DOES 1 though 10, inclusive ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12685989.). Filed bySream, Inc., RooR International, BV. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vakil, Imran) (Filed on 9/17/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sream, Inc. et al v. Ammari et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 though 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adel Ammari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc.
Represented By: Imran Vakil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RooR International, BV
Represented By: Imran Vakil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?