Voip-Pal.com, Inc. v. Apple, Inc.
Plaintiff: Voip-Pal.com, Inc.
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2018cv06216
Filed: October 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Referring Judge: Susan van Keulen
2 Judge: Lucy H Koh
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 95 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT Reply Claim Construction Brief filed by Voip-Pal.com, Inc.. (Malek, Kevin) (Filed on 8/9/2019)
August 2, 2019 Filing 94 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT Defendants' Responsive Claim Construction Brief filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Peter C. Magic, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Magic, Peter) (Filed on 8/2/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 93 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT VoIP-Pal's Opening Claim Construction Brief filed by Voip-Pal.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Kevin N. Malek, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Malek, Kevin) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
June 26, 2019 Filing 92 REPLY (re #89 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaints ) filed byApple, Inc.. (Magic, Peter) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 91 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #89 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaints ) CORRECTION OF DOCKET #90 filed byVoip-Pal.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Malek Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Declaration Mangione-Smith Declaration)(Malek, Kevin) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 90 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #89 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaints ) filed byVoip-Pal.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Malek Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Declaration Mangione-Smith Declaration)(Malek, Kevin) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 5, 2019 Filing 89 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaints filed by Apple, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/5/2019 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 6/19/2019. Replies due by 6/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Magic, Peter) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
May 29, 2019 Filing 88 Transcript of Proceedings held on 5-22-19, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #87 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/27/2019. (Related documents(s) #87 ) (las, ) (Filed on 5/29/2019)
May 23, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings pursuant to May 22, 2019 Case Management Order. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/19/2019 at 1:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 9/12/2019. Hearing on Joint Consolidated Motion to Dismiss set for 9/5/2019 at 1:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Claims Construction Hearing set for 9/19/2019 at 1:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Hearing on Dispositive and Daubert Motions set for 5/21/2020 at 1:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 87 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/22/2019 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by Apple, Inc., for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Magic, Peter) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 86 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lucy H. Koh: Further Case Management Conference held on 5/22/2019 from 2:04 PM - 2:16 PM (12 minutes). The May 22, 2019 Case Management Order memorializes all relevant information, deadlines, and rulings from the Conference. Total Time in Court: 12 minutes. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. Plaintiff Attorney: Kevin Malek. Defendant Attorney: Peter Magic for Apple, Inc.; Daniel Shvodian for Amazon.com, Inc. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/22/2019) Modified on 5/22/2019 (kedS, COURT STAFF).
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/22/19. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Denying as Moot #57 Motion to Dismiss.(lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 20, 2019 Filing 83 Statement re #80 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Joint Statement by Apple, Inc.. (Magic, Peter) (Filed on 5/20/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 82 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT filed by Voip-Pal.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B)(Malek, Kevin) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 81 AMENDED COMPLAINT First against Apple, Inc.. Filed byVoip-Pal.com, Inc.. (Malek, Kevin) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #67 Motion to Amend.(lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2019)
May 15, 2019 Filing 79 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Voip-Pal.com, Inc.. (Malek, Kevin) (Filed on 5/15/2019)
May 10, 2019 Filing 78 **CLERK'S NOTICE** VACATING May 16, 2019 Hearing for #67 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint. Matter to be determined on the papers. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2019)
April 25, 2019 Filing 77 **CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING HEARING DATE** The previously-scheduled hearing for #57 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint is ADVANCED to June 13, 2019 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th floor, in San Jose, California before the Hon. Lucy H. Koh. All other hearings and deadliness remain as set. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
April 12, 2019 Filing 76 OBJECTIONS to re #74 Reply to Opposition/Response by Voip-Pal.com, Inc.. (Malek, Kevin) (Filed on 4/12/2019)
April 5, 2019 Filing 75 REPLY (re #67 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint,, ) filed byVoip-Pal.com, Inc.. (Malek, Kevin) (Filed on 4/5/2019)
April 5, 2019 Filing 74 REPLY (re #57 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint ) filed byApple, Inc.. (Magic, Peter) (Filed on 4/5/2019)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Denying #72 Stipulation to Extend Time Regarding Claim Construction Exchanges. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2019)
April 1, 2019 Filing 72 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND TIME REGARDING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION EXCHANGES filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Ameet A.Modi)(Modi, Ameet) (Filed on 4/1/2019)
March 29, 2019 Filing 71 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #67 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint,, ) filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Daniel T. Shvodian, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Modi, Ameet) (Filed on 3/29/2019)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re #69 Stipulated Protective Order. (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2019)
March 18, 2019 Filing 69 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Proposed Protective Order filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Protective Order)(Magic, Peter) (Filed on 3/18/2019)
March 15, 2019 Filing 68 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #57 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint ) filed byVoip-Pal.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Kevin N Malek, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Declaration Mangione-Smith)(Malek, Kevin) (Filed on 3/15/2019)
March 15, 2019 Filing 67 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint,, filed by Voip-Pal.com, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/16/2019 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 3/29/2019. Replies due by 4/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Malek, Kevin) (Filed on 3/15/2019)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Order re First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/11/19. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 65 ***PURSUANT TO ORDER (DOC. #66) DOCUMENT STRICKEN***AMENDED COMPLAINT First against Apple, Inc.. Filed byVoip-Pal.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Malek, Kevin) (Filed on 3/8/2019) Modified text on 3/12/2019 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #61 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #60 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #59 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 61 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Michael J. X. Matulewicz-Crowley ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13154142.) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Magic, Peter) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 60 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Robert C. Harrits ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13154139.) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Magic, Peter) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 59 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Ameet A. Modi ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13154131.) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Magic, Peter) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
February 18, 2019 Filing 58 CLERK'S NOTICE Set hearing as to #57 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 6/20/2019 at 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2019)
February 15, 2019 Filing 57 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Apple, Inc.. Responses due by 3/15/2019. Replies due by 4/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Magic, Peter) (Filed on 2/15/2019)
February 11, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE of Change of Address by Peter Curtis Magic (Magic, Peter) (Filed on 2/11/2019)
February 6, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Peter Curtis Magic Withdrawal of Michael J. McCue of the Firm, Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP (Magic, Peter) (Filed on 2/6/2019)
February 4, 2019 Filing 54 Transcript of Proceedings held on 1-16-19, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (78 in 5:18-cv-06217-LHK) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/6/2019. (las, ) (Filed on 2/4/2019)
January 16, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings per ECF Nos. (40 in 5:18-cv-07020-LHK, 53 in 5:18-cv-06216-LHK):: Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement due 5/17/2019. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/22/2019 at 2:00 p.m. Last Day to Amend the Pleadings/Add Parties due by 2/13/2019. Claims Construction Hearing set for 9/5/2019 01:30 PM. Close of Fact Discovery due by 12/6/2019. Close of Expert Discovery due by 3/6/2020. Deadline to file Dispositive and Daubert Motions due by 4/3/2020. Hearing on Dispositive and Daubert Motions set for 5/21/2020 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. (ecgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2019)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/16/19. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2019)
January 16, 2019 Filing 52 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lucy H. Koh: Initial Case Management Conference held on 1/16/2019. A forthcoming Case Management Order will memorialize all relevant information, deadlines, and rulings from the Conference. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/22/2019 02:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor.Total Time in Court: 54 minutes. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. Plaintiff Attorney: Kevin Malek. Defendants Attorneys: Gene Lee and Sarah Stahnke (Twitter), Daniel Shvodian (Amazon), Wayne Stacy (ATT), William Hector (Verizon), John Demarais and Peter Magic (Apple). For transcript requests please see: http://www.cand.uscourts.gov/transcripts#ORDERING (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ecgS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/16/2019)
January 9, 2019 Filing 51 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Voip-Pal.com, Inc.. (Malek, Kevin) (Filed on 1/9/2019)
December 21, 2018 Filing 50 STIPULATION JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit)(Magic, Peter) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
December 14, 2018 Filing 49 NOTICE by Voip-Pal.com, Inc. Informing the Court of Asserted Claims of The '762 Patent, The '002 Patent, The '330 Patent and The '549 Patent (Malek, Kevin) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
December 14, 2018 Filing 48 RESPONSE to re #46 Order by Voip-Pal.com, Inc.. (Malek, Kevin) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
December 10, 2018 Filing 47 RESPONSE to re #46 Order DEFENDANT APPLE INC.'S RESPONSE TO DISCLOSURE ORDER (DKT. NO. 46) by Apple, Inc.. (Magic, Peter) (Filed on 12/10/2018)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 DISCLOSURE ORDER. Responses due by 12/14/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 12/3/2018. (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2018)
November 28, 2018 Filing 45 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patent by Voip-Pal.com, Inc. (Malek, Kevin) (Filed on 11/28/2018)
November 19, 2018 Filing 44 **CLERK'S NOTICE FOLLOWING CASE REASSIGNMENT TO THE HONORABLE LUCY H. KOH** Following the case reassignment to Hon. Lucy H. Koh, an Initial Case Management Conference is set for 1/16/2019 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th floor, in San Jose, California. A Joint Case Management Conference Statement is due 7 days before the scheduled conference date. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. The parties shall familiarize themselves with the Scheduling Notes and Standing Orders for the Hon. Lucy H. Koh: http://cand.uscourts.gov/lhk. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2018)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings pursuant to Order Relating and Consolidating cases. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Judge Jon S. Tigar no longer assigned to the case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2018)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER RELATING AND CONSOLIDATING CASES. The Court hereby relates case number 18-CV-6216-JST, currently pending before Judge Tigar, to case number 18-CV-6217-LHK. The Clerk shall reassign case number 18-CV-6216-JST to this Court. The Court hereby consolidates these two cases for pretrial purposes. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/15/2018. (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2018)
November 14, 2018 Filing 41 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion To Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related (Doc. 40) (Magic, Peter) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
November 13, 2018 Filing 40 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION To Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed by Apple, Inc.. Responses due by 11/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Magic Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Order)(Magic, Peter) (Filed on 11/13/2018)
November 7, 2018 Filing 39 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Malek, Kevin) (Filed on 11/7/2018)
November 7, 2018 Filing 38 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed by Apple, Inc. (Magic, Peter) (Filed on 11/7/2018)
October 25, 2018 Filing 37 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 1/22/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/30/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2018)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY KEVIN N. MALEK PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #35 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2018)
October 25, 2018 Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice by Kevin N. Malek, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-12792774) filed by Voip-Pal.com, Inc.. (Felipe, June) (Filed on 10/25/2018)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings pursuant to Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment to a U.S. District Court Judge. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Virginia K DeMarchi no longer assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 10/25/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2018)
October 25, 2018 Filing 33 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2018)
October 25, 2018 Filing 32 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Apple, Inc... (Magic, Peter) (Filed on 10/25/2018)
October 25, 2018 Filing 31 Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to the Complaint filed by Apple, Inc.. (Magic, Peter) (Filed on 10/25/2018)
October 24, 2018 Filing 30 CLERK'S NOTICE RE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. This matter having been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi, the Initial Case Management Conference has been re-set for 1/15/2019 01:30 PM, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, United States District Court, 280 South First Street, San Jose, California. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed by 1/8/2019. All other related deadlines remain as set in the Court's Order Setting Initial Case Management Conference and ADR Deadlines (Dkt. No. 25). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2018)
October 24, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Curtis Magic (Magic, Peter) (Filed on 10/24/2018)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K DeMarchi for all further proceedings pursuant to Order of Recusal. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen no longer assigned to the case. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2018)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER OF RECUSAL: This Court recuses itself from hearing this matter and directs the Clerk of Court to reassign this matter to another judge. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on October 16, 2018. (svklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2018).
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 *** Docketed in Error. Please Disregard*** ORDER OF RECUSAL. The Clerk of Court to reassign this matter to another judge. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 10/16/18. (djmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2018) Modified on 10/18/2018 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
October 15, 2018 Filing 25 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/8/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/15/2019 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2018)
October 15, 2018 Filing 24 Case transferred in from District of Nevada; Case Number 2:18-cv-00953. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting #22 Stipulation to Transfer to the Northern District of California. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 4, 2018 Filing 22 STIPULATION to Transfer to the Northern District of California; filed by Defendant Apple, Inc... (McCue, Michael)
September 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #16 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael J.X. Matulewicz-Crowley for Apple, Inc. and approving Designation of Local Counsel Michael J. McCue. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/23/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #17 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice John Michael Desmarais and approving Designation of Local Counsel Michael J. McCue. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/23/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #15 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Tom BenGera and approving Designation of Local Counsel Michael J. McCue. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/23/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #14 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ameet A Modi and approving Designation of Local Counsel Michael J. McCue. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/23/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 19, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Desmarais and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael J. McCue (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5248200) by Defendant Apple, Inc.. (McCue, Michael)
September 19, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Michael J.X. Matulewicz-Crowley and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael J. McCue (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5248195) by Defendant Apple, Inc.. (McCue, Michael)
September 19, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Tom BenGera and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael J. McCue (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5248188) by Defendant Apple, Inc.. (McCue, Michael)
September 19, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Ameet A. Modi and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael J. McCue (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5248160) by Defendant Apple, Inc.. (McCue, Michael)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting #11 Motion to Extend Time. Apple, Inc. answer due 11/12/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 8, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel John M. Desmarais and Ameet A. Modi to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 9/22/2018. (no image attached) (DKJ)
August 7, 2018 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time (Second Request) re #8 Order on Stipulation #1 Complaint, by Defendant Apple, Inc.. (Zhong, Meng) Modified docket entry relationship pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d) on 8/8/2018 (DKJ).
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #9 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kevin N. Malek and approving Designation of Local Counsel Kurt Bonds. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/12/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 9, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Kevin N. Malek and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Kurt Bonds (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5151169) by Plaintiff Voip-Pal.com, Inc.. (Bonds, Kurt)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #6 Stipulation to Extend Time. Apple, Inc. answer due 8/14/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 1, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Apple, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Zhong, Meng)
June 1, 2018 Filing 6 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) To Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Apple, Inc.. (Zhong, Meng)
May 25, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Voip-Pal.com, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Bonds, Kurt)
May 24, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Kevin N. Malek to comply with completion and electronic filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney(s). Verified Petition due by 7/8/2018. (no image attached) (ADR)
May 24, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Apple, Inc. re #1 Complaint. (ADR)
May 24, 2018 Filing 2 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 complaint, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4) (ADR)
May 24, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. Nature of Suit: 830 Patent Case (ADR)
May 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Apple, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5099141) by Voip-Pal.com, Inc.. Proof of service due by 8/22/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons Summons)(Bonds, Kurt) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Voip-Pal.com, Inc. v. Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: Ameet A. Modi
Represented By: Michael J. McCue
Represented By: Michael J.X. Matulewicz-Crowley
Represented By: Tom BenGera
Represented By: Meng Zhong
Represented By: John M. Desmarais
Represented By: Peter Curtis Magic
Represented By: Robert C. Harrits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Voip-Pal.com, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin N Malek
Represented By: Kurt R. Bonds
Represented By: Adam R Knecht
Represented By: June Grace Felipe
Represented By: David J. Kaminski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?