Voip-Pal.com, Inc. v. Apple, Inc.
Plaintiff: Voip-Pal.com, Inc.
Defendant: Apple Inc
Interested Party: Dr. Thomas E. Sawyer
Case Number: 5:2018cv06217
Filed: October 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Referring Judge: Thomas S Hixson
2 Judge: Lucy H Koh
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2019 Filing 101 USCA Case Number 19-1812 USCA for the Federal Circuit for #100 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit filed by Voip-Pal.com, Inc. Entry of Appearance due 05/10/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 05/10/2019. Docketing Statement due 05/10/2019. Appellant's brief is due 06/25/19. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2019 Modified on 4/29/2019 (bwS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/29/2019 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
April 24, 2019 Filing 100 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit by Voip-Pal.com, Inc.. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID 26GVTGG3. Appeal Record due by 5/24/2019. (Malek, Kevin) (Filed on 4/24/2019)
April 24, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] Please re-file in its entirety using correct event "Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit. Re: #99 Notice of Appeal filed by Voip-Pal.com, Inc. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2019)
April 23, 2019 Filing 99 ***INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED WHEN POSTING DOCUMENT*** NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Voip-Pal.com, Inc.. (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-13281798 paid.) to the Federal Circuit Court of Appeals (Malek, Kevin) (Filed on 4/23/2019) Modified on 4/24/2019 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 25, 2019 Filing 98 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/25/19. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2019)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Denying #91 Administrative Motion Pursuant to Order #96 . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2019)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #75 Motion to Dismiss.(lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2019)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re #93 Stipulated Protective Order. (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2019)
March 18, 2019 Filing 94 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #91 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Leave to File Sur-Reply re #75 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint ) filed byApple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply)(Magic, Peter) (Filed on 3/18/2019)
March 18, 2019 Filing 93 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Proposed Protective Order filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Protective Order)(Magic, Peter) (Filed on 3/18/2019)
March 14, 2019 Filing 92 **CLERK'S NOTICE** VACATING March 21, 2019 Hearing for #75 Motion to Dismiss. Matter to be determined on the papers. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2019)
March 13, 2019 Filing 91 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Leave to File Sur-Reply re #75 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Voip-Pal.com, Inc.. Responses due by 3/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Declaration Kevin N. Malek)(Malek, Kevin) (Filed on 3/13/2019)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #87 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #86 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #85 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 87 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Michael J. X. Matulewicz-Crowley ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13154120.) filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Magic, Peter) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 86 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Robert C. Harrits ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13154114.) filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Magic, Peter) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 85 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Ameet A. Modi ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13154089.) filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Magic, Peter) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
February 28, 2019 Filing 84 REPLY (re #75 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint ) filed byApple Inc. (Magic, Peter) (Filed on 2/28/2019)
February 12, 2019 Filing 83 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #75 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint ) CORRECTION OF DOCKET #81 filed byVoip-Pal.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Kevin N Malek, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Declaration Declaration of Magione-Smith)(Malek, Kevin) (Filed on 2/12/2019)
February 11, 2019 Filing 82 NOTICE of Change of Address by Peter Curtis Magic (Magic, Peter) (Filed on 2/11/2019)
February 7, 2019 Filing 81 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #75 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint ) filed byVoip-Pal.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Affidavit)(Malek, Kevin) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
February 6, 2019 Filing 80 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Peter Curtis Magic Withdrawal of Michael J. McCue of the Firm, Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP (Magic, Peter) (Filed on 2/6/2019)
February 4, 2019 Filing 79 Transcript of Proceedings held on 1-16-19, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (78 in 5:18-cv-06217-LHK) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/6/2019. (las, ) (Filed on 2/4/2019)
January 25, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings per ECF Nos. (65 in 5:18-cv-06177-LHK, 73 in 5:18-cv-04523-LHK, 125 in 5:18-cv-06054-LHK, 77 in 5:18-cv-06217-LHK): Last Day to Amend the Pleadings/Add Parties by 2/13/2019. Case Management Statement due by 5/17/2019. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/22/2019 at 2:00 pm. Claims Construction Hearing set for 8/15/2019 01:30 PM. Close of Fact Discovery due by 11/15/2019. Close of Expert Discovery due by 3/2/2020. Deadline to file Dispositive and Daubert Motions due by 4/2/2020. Hearing on Dispositive and Daubert Motions set for 5/14/2020 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. (ecgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2019)
January 17, 2019 Filing 78 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 01/16/2019 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by Apple Inc, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Magic, Peter) (Filed on 1/17/2019)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/16/19. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2019)
January 16, 2019 Filing 76 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lucy H. Koh: Initial Case Management Conference held on 1/16/2019. A forthcoming Case Management Order will memorialize all relevant information, deadlines, and rulings from the Conference. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/22/2019 02:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor.Total Time in Court: 54 minutes. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. Plaintiff Attorney: Kevin Malek. Defendants Attorneys: Gene Lee and Sarah Stahnke (Twitter), Daniel Shvodian (Amazon), Wayne Stacy (ATT), William Hector (Verizon), John Demarais and Peter Magic (Apple). For transcript requests please see: http://www.cand.uscourts.gov/transcripts#ORDERING (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ecgS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/16/2019)
January 10, 2019 Filing 75 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Apple Inc. Motion Hearing set for 3/21/2019 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 2/7/2019. Replies due by 2/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Magic, Peter) (Filed on 1/10/2019)
January 9, 2019 Filing 74 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Voip-Pal.com, Inc.. (Malek, Kevin) (Filed on 1/9/2019)
December 14, 2018 Filing 73 RESPONSE to re #69 Order by Voip-Pal.com, Inc.. (Malek, Kevin) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
December 10, 2018 Filing 72 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on November 14, 2018 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by Voip-Pal.com, Inc., for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Malek, Kevin) (Filed on 12/10/2018)
December 10, 2018 Filing 71 RESPONSE to re #69 Order DEFENDANT APPLE INC.'S RESPONSE TO DISCLOSURE ORDER (DKT. NO. 69) by Apple Inc. (Magic, Peter) (Filed on 12/10/2018)
December 10, 2018 Filing 70 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11-14-18, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (66 in 5:18-cv-06217-LHK) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2019. (las, ) (Filed on 12/10/2018)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 DISCLOSURE ORDER. Responses due by 12/14/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 12/3/2018. (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2018)
November 28, 2018 Filing 68 NOTICE by Voip-Pal.com, Inc. re #65 Order Requiring Identification of Asserted Claims (Malek, Kevin) (Filed on 11/28/2018)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Order Relating and Consolidating Cases. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/15/18. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2018)
November 15, 2018 Filing 66 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/15/2018 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by Apple Inc, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Magic, Peter) (Filed on 11/15/2018)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/14/18. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2018)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE SEE ECF No. #65 *** CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/14/2018. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2018) Modified on 11/15/2018 (iym, COURT STAFF).
November 14, 2018 Filing 63 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Lucy H. Koh: Initial Case Management Conference held on 11/14/2018 from 2:06 - 2:54 PM (48 minutes). A forthcoming Case Management Order will memorialize all relevant information, deadlines, and rulings from the Conference. A subsequent Initial Case Management Conference is set for 1/16/19 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Seven days prior to the next CMC date, the parties shall file an updated Joint Case Management Statement, pursuant to Civil Local Rules 16-10(d). Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. Courtroom Deputy: Irene Mason. For Plaintiff(s): Kevin N Malek. For Defendant(s): Gene W. Lee, Sarah Elizabeth Stahnke, William Andrew Hector, Bryant Carroll Boren, Jr., and Peter Curtis Magic, all personally present. Megan Woodworth, appearing telephonically. For transcript requests please see: http://www.cand.uscourts.gov/transcripts#ORDERING (This is a text only Minute Entry; there is no document associated with this entry) (iymS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/14/2018)
November 7, 2018 Filing 62 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Voip-Pal.com, Inc.. (Malek, Kevin) (Filed on 11/7/2018)
November 7, 2018 Filing 61 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Magic, Peter) (Filed on 11/7/2018)
November 7, 2018 Filing 60 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Malek, Kevin) (Filed on 11/7/2018)
November 7, 2018 Filing 59 Certificate of Interested Entities by Apple Inc (Magic, Peter) (Filed on 11/7/2018)
November 7, 2018 Filing 58 **CLERK'S NOTICE FOLLOWING CASE REASSIGNMENT TO THE HONORABLE LUCY H. KOH** Following the case reassignment to Hon. Lucy H. Koh, an Initial Case Management Conference is set for 11/14/2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th floor, in San Jose, California. A Joint Case Management Conference Statement is due 7 days before the scheduled conference date. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). The parties shall familiarize themselves with the Scheduling Notes and Standing Orders for the Hon. Lucy H. Koh: http://cand.uscourts.gov/lhk. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2018)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Lucy H. Koh and Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi for all further proceedings pursuant to NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patent. Judge Jeffrey S. White no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/7/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2018) Modified on 11/7/2018 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
November 6, 2018 Filing 56 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patent by Voip-Pal.com, Inc. (Malek, Kevin) (Filed on 11/6/2018)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #52 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Kevin N. Malek (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2018)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/26/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2018)
October 25, 2018 Filing 53 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2018)
October 25, 2018 Filing 52 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Kevin N. Malek ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12792834.) filed by Voip-Pal.com, Inc.. (Felipe, June) (Filed on 10/25/2018)
October 25, 2018 Filing 51 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Apple Inc.. (Magic, Peter) (Filed on 10/25/2018)
October 25, 2018 Filing 50 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to the Complaint filed by Apple Inc. (Magic, Peter) (Filed on 10/25/2018)
October 24, 2018 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Curtis Magic (Magic, Peter) (Filed on 10/24/2018)
October 11, 2018 Filing 48 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/3/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/10/2019 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2018)
October 11, 2018 Filing 47 Case transferred in from District of Nevada; Case Number 2:16-cv-00260. Case file, copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified on 11/1/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Granting #45 Stipulation Transferring Case to the Northern District of California. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION and Order Transferring the Case to the Northern District of California by Defendant Apple, Inc... (McCue, Michael)
September 7, 2018 Filing 44 NOTICE re #43 Motion for Hearing; filed by Voip-Pal.com, Inc. (Malek, Kevin)
May 23, 2018 Filing 43 MOTION for Hearing Before District Judge by Plaintiff Voip-Pal.com, Inc.. (Malek, Kevin)
May 17, 2018 Filing 42 NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to #41 Notice (Other). ERROR: Incorrect event selected by Attorney Adam R Knecht. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to refile document selecting the correct Motion for hearing event. Document #41 is terminated. (no image attached) (DKJ)
May 17, 2018 Filing 41 ERROR: Incorrect event selected by Attorney. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to refile document selecting the correct Motion for hearing event. NOTICE Of Request For Status Conference by Voip-Pal.com, Inc.. (Knecht, Adam) Modified on 5/17/2018 (DKJ).
April 30, 2018 Filing 40 NOTICE OF RELATED CASES 2:16-cv-00271-RCJ-VCF and 2:16-cv-02338-RFB-CWH by Plaintiff Voip-Pal.com, Inc.. (Bonds, Kurt)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Granting #38 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kevin N. Malek for Voip-Pal.com, Inc. and approving Designation of Local Counsel Kurt R. Bonds. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/22/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 21, 2018 Filing 38 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Kevin N. Malek and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Kurt R. Bonds (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-4977008) by Plaintiff Voip-Pal.com, Inc.. (Bonds, Kurt)
January 26, 2018 Filing 37 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Apple, Inc.. (McCue, Michael)
January 26, 2018 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Apple, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (McCue, Michael)
December 18, 2017 Filing 35 DECLARATION of Adam R. Knecht re #28 Letter, #32 Letter by Plaintiff Voip-Pal.com, Inc.. (Knecht, Adam)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Granting #33 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report (First Request). Joint Status Report due by 1/26/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 12, 2017 Filing 33 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) TO FILE JOINT STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Voip-Pal.com, Inc.. (Knecht, Adam)
November 1, 2017 Filing 32 Copy of LETTER to the Honorable David P. Ruschke and Joseph Matal dated 10/23/2017 from Dr. Thomas E. Sawyer. (MR)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting #29 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/11/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 25, 2017 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michael J. McCue on behalf of Defendant Apple, Inc.. (McCue, Michael)
August 25, 2017 Filing 29 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Jonathan W. Fountain by Defendant Apple, Inc.. (Fountain, Jonathan)
May 8, 2017 Filing 28 Copy of LETTER to Honorable David P. Ruschke dated 5/1/17 filed by Interested Party, Dr. Thomas E. Sawyer. (ADR)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting #26 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE STAY Pending Written Decisions by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board. Joint Status Report due by 12/12/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/20/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 20, 2016 Filing 26 STIPULATION re #25 Order on Motion to Stay, Order on Stipulation, ; STIPULATION TO CONTINUE STAY by Defendant Apple, Inc.. (Fountain, Jonathan)
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER re #24 Stipulation. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that #23 Motion to Stay is DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/19/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
July 19, 2016 Filing 24 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Stay Pending a Decision by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board Regarding Institution of Inter Partes Review by Defendant Apple, Inc.. (Fountain, Jonathan)
July 8, 2016 Filing 23 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Inter Partes Review By the Patent Trial and Appeal Board by Defendant Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kerri-Ann Limbeek, #2 Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit 1 - Apple's Petition for IPR of the 8,542,815 Patent, #4 Exhibit 2 - Apple's Petition for IPR of the 9,179,005 Patent, #5 Exhibit 3 - Unified's Petition for IPR of the 8,542,815 Patent, #6 Exhibit 4 - Notice of Filing Date for Apple's IPR of the 8,542,815 Patent, #7 Exhibit 5 - Notice of Filing Date for Apple's IPR of the 9,179,005 Patent, #8 Exhibit 6 - Notice of Filing Date for Unified's IPR of the 8,542,815 Patent, #9 Exhibit 7 - PTAB Statistics (May 31, 2016), #10 Exhibit 8 - VoIP-Pal Company Overview, #11 Exhibit 9 - VoIP-Pal Board of Directors May 25, 2016 Conference Call Transcript (excerpt))(Fountain, Jonathan)
June 2, 2016 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Voip-Pal.com, Inc. re #11 Amended Complaint,. Apple, Inc. served on 5/9/2016, answer due 7/29/2016. (Bonds, Kurt)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER approving ECF No. #17 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kerri-Ann Limbeek for Apple, Inc. and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/31/16. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER approving ECF No. #16 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John Michael Desmarais for Apple, Inc. and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/31/16. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER approving ECF No. #15 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael Peter Stadnick for Apple, Inc. and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/31/16. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
May 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting #14 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ameet A. Modi for Apple, Inc. and approving Designation of Local Counsel Jonathan W. Fountain. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/29/16. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
May 26, 2016 Filing 17 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Kerri-Ann Limbeek and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jonathan W. Fountain (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-4135874) filed by Defendant Apple, Inc. . (Fountain, Jonathan)
May 26, 2016 Filing 16 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Desmarais and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jonathan W. Fountain (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-4135870) filed by Defendant Apple, Inc. . (Fountain, Jonathan)
May 26, 2016 Filing 15 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Michael Peter Stadnick and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jonathan W. Fountain (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-4135861) filed by Defendant Apple, Inc. . (Fountain, Jonathan)
May 26, 2016 Filing 14 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Ameet A. Modi and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jonathan W. Fountain (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-4135853) filed by Defendant Apple, Inc. . (Fountain, Jonathan)
May 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting #12 Stipulation re #1 Complaint. Apple, Inc. answer due 7/29/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/20/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 18, 2016 Filing 12 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #11 Amended Complaint, ; by Defendant Apple, Inc.. (Fountain, Jonathan)
May 5, 2016 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Apple, Inc., filed by Voip-Pal.com, Inc.. No changes to parties. Proof of service due by 8/3/2016. (Attachments: #1 Index Table of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Index Chart 1 to Exhibit D, #7 Index Chart 2 to Exhibit D, #8 Index Chart 3 to Exhibit D, #9 Index Chart 4 to Exhibit D, #10 Exhibit E, #11 Exhibit F, #12 Appendix Addendum 1 to Exhibit F) (Bonds, Kurt)
April 27, 2016 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Apple, Inc. (TR)
April 27, 2016 Filing 9 NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to #8 Certificate of Interested Parties. ERROR Incorrect document attached. Document does not pertain to this case. CORRECTION: Attorney Kurt Bonds advised to refile Certificate of Interested Parties that pertains to this case.(no image attached)(DKJ)
April 27, 2016 Filing 8 ERROR Incorrect document attached. Document does not pertain to this case. CORRECTION: Attorney Kurt Bonds advised to refile and attach correct document. CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Voip-Pal.com, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Bonds, Kurt)
April 27, 2016 Filing 7 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Apple, Inc, filed by Plaintiff Voip-Pal.com, Inc.. (Bonds, Kurt)
April 6, 2016 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Apple, Inc., filed by Voip-Pal.com, Inc.. No changes to parties. Proof of service due by 7/5/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Table of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Index Chart to 1 Exhibit D, #7 Index Chart to 2 Exhibit D, #8 Index Chart to 3 Exhibit D, #9 Index Chart to 4 Exhibit D, #10 Exhibit E, #11 Exhibit F, #12 Supplement Addendum 1 to Exhibit F) (Bonds, Kurt)
February 23, 2016 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Voip-Pal.com, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Bonds, Kurt)
February 10, 2016 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Apple, Inc. re #1 Complaint. (TR)
February 10, 2016 Filing 3 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 complaint) (TR)
February 10, 2016 Filing 2 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.)NOTICE OF GENERAL ORDER 2013-1 AND OPPORTUNITY FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL SETTING: The parties in this action are provided with a link to General Order 2013-1 and the USDC Short Trial Rules on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. If the parties agree that this action can be ready for trial within 180 days and that a trial of this matter would take three (3) days or less, the parties should consider participation in the USDC Short Trial Program. If the parties wish to be considered for entry into the Court's Short Trial Program, they should execute and electronically file with USDC Short Trial Form 4(a)(1) or Form 4(a)(2). (no image attached) (TR)
February 9, 2016 Case assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Nature of Suit: 830 Patent Case (TR)
February 9, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Voip-Pal.com, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-3994067), filed by Voip-Pal.com, Inc.. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 2/19/2016. Proof of service due by 6/8/2016. (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit D-(Chart 1), #7 Exhibit D-(Chart 2), #8 Exhibit D-(Chart 3), #9 Exhibit D-(Chart 4), #10 Exhibit E, #11 Exhibit F, #12 Exhibit F-Addendum 1, #13 Civil Cover Sheet, #14 Summons) (Bonds, Kurt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Voip-Pal.com, Inc. v. Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc
Represented By: Michael P. Stadnick
Represented By: Jonathan W. Fountain
Represented By: John M. Desmarais
Represented By: Ameet A. Modi
Represented By: Kerri-Ann Limbeek
Represented By: Michael J. McCue
Represented By: Peter Curtis Magic
Represented By: Robert C. Harrits
Represented By: Michael J.X. Matulewicz-Crowley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Dr. Thomas E. Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Voip-Pal.com, Inc.
Represented By: Kurt R. Bonds
Represented By: Kevin N Malek
Represented By: Adam R Knecht
Represented By: June Grace Felipe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?