Johnson v. 150 South First Street, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Defendant: 150 South First Street, LLC and Starbucks Corporation
Case Number: 5:2018cv06429
Filed: October 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Cathy L. Arias for Defendants Starbucks Corporation and 150 South First Street, LLC. Julie Y. Zong is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned parties in this case. (Arias, Cathy) (Filed on 11/27/2018)
November 26, 2018 Filing 13 STIPULATION To Extend Time For Defendants Starbucks Corporation and 150 South First Street, LLC to Respond To Initial Complaint filed by 150 South First Street, LLC, Starbucks Corporation. (Arias, Cathy) (Filed on 11/26/2018)
November 7, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Johnson. 150 South First Street, LLC served on 11/1/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. (Carson, Chris) (Filed on 11/7/2018)
November 6, 2018 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] **Summons and Complaint Served Must be Filed as Summons Returned Executed and Not a Certificate of Service**Please re-fi le in its entirety. Re: #11 Certificate of Service filed by Scott Johnson (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2018)
November 6, 2018 Filing 11 *2nd Filing Error* CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Scott Johnson (Carson, Chris) (Filed on 11/6/2018) Modified on 11/6/2018 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
November 5, 2018 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]*Re-File as Summons Returned Executed*Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #10 Certificate of Service filed by Scott Joh nson (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2018)
November 5, 2018 Filing 10 *Filing Error* CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Scott Johnson (Carson, Chris) (Filed on 11/5/2018) Modified on 11/5/2018 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings pursuant to Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment to a U.S. District Court Judge. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 10/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2018)
October 25, 2018 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2018)
October 24, 2018 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Scott Johnson.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Carson, Chris) (Filed on 10/24/2018)
October 23, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to 150 South First Street, LLC, Starbucks Corporation. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2018)
October 23, 2018 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2018)
October 22, 2018 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/5/2018. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
October 22, 2018 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Carson, Chris) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
October 22, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Scott Johnson re #1 Complaint, (Carson, Chris) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
October 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Damages And Injunctive Relief For Violations Of: Americans With Disabilities Act; Unruh Civil Rights Act against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12780541.). Filed byScott Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carson, Chris) (Filed on 10/22/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. 150 South First Street, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 150 South First Street, LLC
Represented By: Cathy L. Arias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Represented By: Cathy L. Arias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Represented By: Chris Carson
Represented By: Amanda Lockhart Seabock
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?