Gaffney et al v. City of Santa Clara
Plaintiff: Guido Quartaroli, Jeff Provancher, John C O'Leary, Christopher Gaffney and Andre Jerome Soto
Defendant: City of Santa Clara
Case Number: 5:2018cv06500
Filed: October 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 15:1938
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2018 Filing 9 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Christopher Gaffney, John C O'Leary, Jeff Provancher, Guido Quartaroli, Andre Jerome Soto filed by Christopher Gaffney, John C O'Leary, Jeff Provancher, Guido Quartaroli, Andre Jerome Soto. (Dammeier, Dieter) (Filed on 12/22/2018)
November 1, 2018 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Christopher Gaffney, John C O'Leary, Jeff Provancher, Guido Quartaroli, Andre Jerome Soto.. (Dammeier, Dieter) (Filed on 11/1/2018)
October 24, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to City of Santa Clara. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2018)
October 24, 2018 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 1/16/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/23/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 7, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2018)
October 24, 2018 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Dammeier, Dieter) (Filed on 10/24/2018)
October 24, 2018 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/7/2018. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2018)
October 24, 2018 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Christopher Gaffney, John C O'Leary, Jeff Provancher, Guido Quartaroli, Andre Jerome Soto (Dammeier, Dieter) (Filed on 10/24/2018)
October 24, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Christopher Gaffney, John C O'Leary, Jeff Provancher, Guido Quartaroli, Andre Jerome Soto . (Dammeier, Dieter) (Filed on 10/24/2018)
October 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Santa Clara ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12789209.). Filed byGuido Quartaroli, Christopher Gaffney, John C O'Leary, Andre Jerome Soto, Jeff Provancher. (Dammeier, Dieter) (Filed on 10/24/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gaffney et al v. City of Santa Clara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guido Quartaroli
Represented By: Dieter C. Dammeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Provancher
Represented By: Dieter C. Dammeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John C O'Leary
Represented By: Dieter C. Dammeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Gaffney
Represented By: Dieter C. Dammeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Jerome Soto
Represented By: Dieter C. Dammeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Santa Clara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?