PersonalWeb Technologies, LLC et al v. Popsugar Inc.
Plaintiff: Level 3 Communication, LLC and PersonalWeb Technologies, LLC
Defendant: Popsugar Inc.
Case Number: 5:2018cv06612
Filed: October 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Referring Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PersonalWeb Technologies, LLC, Level 3 Communication, LLC. Popsugar Inc. served on 11/1/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. (Sherman, Michael) (Filed on 11/19/2018)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RELATED CASE ORDER. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/6/2018. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2018)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings pursuant to Order Relating Cases. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan Van Keulen remains as referral judge assigned to case. case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2018)
October 31, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Popsugar Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2018)
October 31, 2018 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/22/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/29/2019 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2018)
October 31, 2018 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/14/2018. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2018)
October 30, 2018 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Patent Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (Sherman, Michael) (Filed on 10/30/2018)
October 30, 2018 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Level 3 Communication, LLC, PersonalWeb Technologies, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Kinetech, Inc., Other Affiliate Eurocapital Business Development, LLC, Other Affiliate PersonalWeb, Inc., Other Affiliate Topodia Limited, Other Affiliate Sam Venture Partners for PersonalWeb Technologies, LLC; Corporate Parent Level 3 Financing, Inc., Other Affiliate CenturyLink, Inc. for Level 3 Communication, LLC. (Sherman, Michael) (Filed on 10/30/2018)
October 30, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Sherman, Michael) (Filed on 10/30/2018)
October 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Popsugar Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12807809.). Filed byPersonalWeb Technologies, LLC, Level 3 Communication, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sherman, Michael) (Filed on 10/30/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PersonalWeb Technologies, LLC et al v. Popsugar Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Level 3 Communication, LLC
Represented By: Michael Amory Sherman
Represented By: Viviana Boero Hedrick
Represented By: Sandeep Seth
Represented By: Wesley W. Monroe
Represented By: Jeffrey F. Gersh
Represented By: Stanley H. Thompson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PersonalWeb Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Michael Amory Sherman
Represented By: Viviana Boero Hedrick
Represented By: Sandeep Seth
Represented By: Wesley W. Monroe
Represented By: Jeffrey F. Gersh
Represented By: Stanley H. Thompson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Popsugar Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?