Tech Mahindra Limited v. Khajeh-Hosseiny
Petitioner: Tech Mahindra Limited
Respondent: Hosein Khajeh-Hosseiny and Dr. Hosein Khajeh-Hosseiny
Interested Party: Northgate Fintech Innovations Partners, L.P.
Case Number: 5:2018cv06613
Filed: October 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Edward J Davila
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #23 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/5/2018. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2018)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #3 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/5/2018. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2018)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #22 Stipulation and Request for Stipulated Order Resolving Petition to Compel Compliance with Arbitrators Subpoena. The hearing scheduled for 11/5/2018 is VACATED and counsel are relieved from the obligation to appear. The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/5/2018. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2018)
November 4, 2018 Filing 23 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 1, 2, and 3 to Its Petition to Compel Compliance with Arbitrator_s Subpoena filed by Tech Mahindra Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Raymond Cardozo, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 3)(Cardozo, Raymond) (Filed on 11/4/2018)
November 4, 2018 Filing 22 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #1 Petition,, Stipulation and Request for Stipulated Order Resolving Petition to Compel Compliance with Arbitrators Subpoena filed by Tech Mahindra Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cardozo, Raymond) (Filed on 11/4/2018)
November 3, 2018 Filing 21 Declaration of Amy S. Park in Support of #3 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 7 to its Petition to Compel Compliance with Arbitrator's Subpoena filed byHosein Khajeh-Hosseiny. (Related document(s) #3 ) (Park, Amy) (Filed on 11/3/2018)
November 3, 2018 Filing 20 Response re #1 Petition,, Opposition To Petition To Compel Compliance With Arbitrator's Subpoena byHosein Khajeh-Hosseiny. (Attachments: #1 Second Declaration of Amy S. Park, #2 Second Declaration of Dr. Hosein Khajeh-Hosseiny)(Park, Amy) (Filed on 11/3/2018)
November 2, 2018 Filing 19 Declaration of Bryan Wilson in Support of #3 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 7 to its Petition to Compel Compliance with Arbitrator's Subpoena filed byNorthgate Fintech Innovations Partners, L.P.. (Related document(s) #3 ) (Wilson, Bryan) (Filed on 11/2/2018)
November 2, 2018 ***Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearing per ECF #18 Order: as to Petition to Compel Compliance with Arbitrator's Subpoena #1 . Opposition due by 11/3/2018. Motion Hearing set for 11/5/2018 11:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2018)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #8 Ex Parte Application for an Order Shortening Time to Hear Petition to Compel Compliance With Arbitrator's Subpoena. The Petition shall be heard on 11/5/2018 at 11:30 a.m. Any opposition must be filed by 11/3/2018 no later than 4:00 p.m. and shall not exceed 10 pages. A written reply to the opposition will not be considered and should not be filed. Counsel for Petitioner and Respondent must personally appear; telephonic appearances will not be permitted. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/2/2018. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2018)
November 2, 2018 Filing 17 REPLY (re #8 Ex Parte Application re #1 Petition, for an Order Shortening Time to Hear Petition to Compel Compliance With Arbitrator'sSubpoena ) filed byTech Mahindra Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit)(Miller, Jesse) (Filed on 11/2/2018) Modified on 11/2/2018 (fff, COURT STAFF).
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER RE: #8 EX PARTE APPLICATION. No later than 12:00 p.m. on 11/2/2018, Petitioner shall file a response to the opposition #15 . SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/1/2018. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2018)
November 1, 2018 Filing 15 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #8 Ex Parte Application re #1 Petition, for an Order Shortening Time to Hear Petition to Compel Compliance With Arbitrator'sSubpoena ) filed byHosein Khajeh-Hosseiny. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of A. Park, #2 Declaration of H. Khajeh-Hosseiny)(Park, Amy) (Filed on 11/1/2018)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings pursuant to Order for Reassignment to a District Judge due to Lack of Consent to Jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2018) Modified on 11/2/2018 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
November 1, 2018 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tech Mahindra Limited re #8 Ex Parte Application re #1 Petition, for an Order Shortening Time to Hear Petition to Compel Compliance With Arbitrator'sSubpoena (Neudecker, James) (Filed on 11/1/2018)
November 1, 2018 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tech Mahindra Limited re #3 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 7 to its Petition to Compel Compliance with Arbitrator's Subpoena (Neudecker, James) (Filed on 11/1/2018)
November 1, 2018 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tech Mahindra Limited re #1 Petition,, to Compel Compliance with Arbitrator's Subpona (Neudecker, James) (Filed on 11/1/2018)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR REASSIGNMENT TO A DISTRICT COURT JUDGE DUE TO LACK OF CONSENT TO JURISDICTION OF A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 11/1/2018. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2018)
November 1, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Tech Mahindra Limited. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2018)
October 31, 2018 Filing 8 Ex Parte Application re #1 Petition, for an Order Shortening Time to Hear Petition to Compel Compliance With Arbitrator'sSubpoena filed by Tech Mahindra Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jesse Miller, #2 Exhibit 1 to Decl. of Jesse Miller, #3 Exhibit 2 to Decl. of Jesse Miller, #4 Exhibit 3 to Decl. of Jesse Miller, # *** (5) Exhibit 4 to Decl. of Jesse Miller DOCUMENT LOCKED AT FILER'S REQUEST. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** , #6 Exhibit 5 to Decl. of Jesse Miller, #7 Proposed Order)(Miller, Jesse) (Filed on 10/31/2018) Modified on 11/1/2018 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
October 31, 2018 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. (Miller, Jesse) (Filed on 10/31/2018)
October 31, 2018 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/23/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/30/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 7, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2018)
October 31, 2018 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] *Summons Not Issued to Be Returned Unexecuted*This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in i ts entirety as PROPOSED SUMMONS. Re: #2 Summons Returned Unexecuted filed by Tech Mahindra Limited (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2018)
October 30, 2018 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/13/2018. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2018)
October 30, 2018 Filing 4 Declaration of Jesse L. Miller in Support of #1 Petition, Supplemental Declaration of Jesse L. Miller in Support of Tech Mahindra Limited_s Petition to Compel Compliance with Arbitrator_s Subpoena filed byTech Mahindra Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Miller, Jesse) (Filed on 10/30/2018)
October 30, 2018 Filing 3 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 7 to its Petition to Compel Compliance with Arbitrator's Subpoena filed by Tech Mahindra Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit redacted version of Exhibit 7, #4 Exhibit Unredacted version of Exhibit 7)(Miller, Jesse) (Filed on 10/30/2018)
October 30, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Tech Mahindra Limited as to Hosein Khajeh-Hosseiny. (Miller, Jesse) (Filed on 10/30/2018)
October 30, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION to Compel Compliance with Arbitrator's Subpoena against Hosein Khajeh-Hosseiny (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-12807892). Filed byTech Mahindra Limited. (Attachments: *** #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3 DOCUMENTS LOCKED AT FILER'S REQUEST DUE TO CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION.*** , #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Miller, Jesse) (Filed on 10/30/2018) Modified on 11/1/2018 (ewn, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/1/2018 (sfbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/1/2018 (ewn, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tech Mahindra Limited v. Khajeh-Hosseiny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tech Mahindra Limited
Represented By: Jesse Luke Miller
Represented By: James Mark Neudecker
Represented By: Raymond A. Cardozo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Hosein Khajeh-Hosseiny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dr. Hosein Khajeh-Hosseiny
Represented By: Amy S. Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Northgate Fintech Innovations Partners, L.P.
Represented By: Bryan Joseph Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?