Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 98.207.81.65
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 98.207.81.65
Case Number: 5:2018cv07074
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference is hereby reset to 3/5/2019 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 2/26/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (djmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2019)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO A RULE 26(F) CONFERENCE Dkt. No. #8 . Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 12/21/18. (djmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
December 20, 2018 Filing 8 Ex Parte Application For Leave To Serve A Third Party Subpoena Prior To A Rule 26(f) Conference; Memorandum of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D Declarations In Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 12/20/2018)
December 5, 2018 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.. (Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 12/5/2018)
November 21, 2018 Filing 6 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding copyright (cc: form mailed to register). (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2018)
November 21, 2018 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/12/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/19/2019 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2018)
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/5/2018. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2018)
November 20, 2018 Filing 3 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 11/20/2018)
November 20, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC, Other Affiliate John Doe, Defendant for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 11/20/2018)
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Copyright Infringement - Demand For Jury Trial against John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 98.207.81.65 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12865466.). Filed byStrike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 11/20/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 98.207.81.65
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Lincoln Dee Bandlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 98.207.81.65
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?