Neo4j, Inc. v. PureThink, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Neo4j, Inc. and Neo4j Sweden AB
Defendant: John Mark Suhy, iGov, Inc. and PureThink, LLC
Case Number: 5:2018cv07182
Filed: November 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward J Davila
Referring Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Plaintiffs and Counter-Defendants Amended ANSWER to Counterclaim byNeo4j Sweden AB, Neo4j, Inc.. (Chien, Cary) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Order granting #44 Stipulation for Leave to File Plaintiff and Counter-Defendant's First Amended Answer. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/31/2019. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (JOINT) FOR LEAVE TO FILE PLAINTIFF AND COUNTER-DEFENDANTS FIRST AMENDED ANSWER filed by Neo4j Sweden AB, Neo4j, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chien, Cary) (Filed on 10/30/2019)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Denying Without Prejudice #41 Administrative Motion ; Denying #42 Stipulation Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/29/2019. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2019)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #41 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed by Neo4j Sweden AB, Neo4j, Inc.. (Chien, Cary) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed by Neo4j, Inc.. Responses due by 11/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Cary Chien iso Plaintiff's Stipulated Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Chien, Cary) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Cary Chien (Chien, Cary) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Certificate of Interested Entities by Neo4j Sweden AB identifying Other Affiliate Sunstone Technology Ventures Fund II K/S, Other Affiliate Europe Ventures L.P., Other Affiliate Greenbridge Investment Partners Limited, Other Affiliate One Peak Expansion Europe LP for Neo4j Sweden AB. (Ratinoff, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/24/2019)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Neo4j Sweden AB identifying Corporate Parent Neo4j, Inc. for Neo4j Sweden AB. (Ratinoff, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/24/2019)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint for: (1) Trademark Infringement; (2) False Designation of Origin; (3) False Advertising; (4) Federal and State Unfair Competition; (5) Breach of Contract; (6) Invasion of Privacy; and (7) Violations of the DMCA against PureThink, LLC, John Mark Suhy, iGov, Inc.. Filed byNeo4j, Inc., Neo4j Sweden AB. (Ratinoff, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/23/2019)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Order granting #35 Stipulation For Leave To File First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/22/2019. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2019)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Neo4j, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed First Amended Complaint)(Ratinoff, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/22/2019)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER #33 . Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 10/2/19. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Protective Order filed by Neo4j, Inc.. (Ratinoff, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/30/2019)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order ***Set Deadlines/Hearings per ECF #32 Order: Close of Expert Discovery due by 6/1/2020. Close of Fact Discovery due by 2/28/2020. Trial Setting Conference Statement due by 1/21/2020. Trial Setting Conference set for 1/30/2020 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Dispositive and Daubert Motions due by 7/17/2020. Responses due by 8/17/2020. Replies due by 9/4/2020. Opening Reports due by 4/1/2020. Rebuttal Reports due by 5/1/2020. Dispositive and Daubert Motion Hearing set for 10/29/2020 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2019)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/22/2019. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2019)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Case Management Conference Statement and FRCP 26(f) Report filed by Neo4j, Inc.. (Ratinoff, Jeffrey) (Filed on 2/21/2019)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM #22 Counterclaim byNeo4j, Inc.. (Ratinoff, Jeffrey) (Filed on 2/21/2019)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Certificate of Interested Entities by PureThink, LLC, John Mark Suhy, iGov, Inc. (Beene, Adron) (Filed on 2/15/2019)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Order Granting #26 Stipulation selecting Private ADR Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila.(ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Ratinoff, Jeffrey) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Neo4j, Inc. filed by Neo4j, Inc.. (Ratinoff, Jeffrey) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Order Granting #24 Stipulation for Extension of Time to to Respond to PURETHINK LLC and IGOV, INC.S #22 Counterclaims Signed by by Judge Edward J. Davila.(ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2019)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #22 Counterclaim Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to PureThink LLC and iGov, Inc.'s Counterclaims filed by Neo4j, Inc.. (Ratinoff, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/25/2019)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , COUNTERCLAIM against PureThink, LLC byJohn Mark Suhy, iGov, Inc., PureThink, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Beene, Adron) (Filed on 1/10/2019)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 COUNTERCLAIM against Neo4j, Inc.. Filed byiGov, Inc., PureThink, LLC. (Beene, Adron) (Filed on 1/9/2019)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Adron W. Beene (Beene, Adron) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PureThink, LLC, John Mark Suhy, iGov, Inc. (Beene, Adron) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Adron Gustav Beene (Beene, Adron) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by PureThink, LLC, John Mark Suhy, iGov, Inc.. (Beene, Adron) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Neo4j, Inc.. John Mark Suhy served on 11/30/2018, answer due 12/21/2018. (Ratinoff, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/11/2018)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Neo4j, Inc.. iGov, Inc. served on 11/30/2018, answer due 12/21/2018. (Ratinoff, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/11/2018)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Neo4j, Inc.. PureThink, LLC served on 11/30/2018, answer due 12/21/2018. (Ratinoff, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/11/2018)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Trademark (cc: form mailed to register). (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2018)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras Case Management Statement due by 2/21/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/28/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2018)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Summons Issued as to PureThink, LLC. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2018)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Summons Issued as to iGov, Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2018)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Summons Issued as to John Mark Suhy. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2018)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Case assigned to Judge Edward J. Davila and Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2018)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by John V. Picone, III (Picone, John) (Filed on 11/28/2018)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Michael Ratinoff (Ratinoff, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/28/2018)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Neo4j, Inc. (Ratinoff, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/28/2018)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Entities by Neo4j, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Sunstone Technology Ventures Fund II K/S, Other Affiliate Europe Ventures L.P., Other Affiliate Greenbridge Investment Partners Limited, Other Affiliate One Peak Expansion Europe LP for Neo4j, Inc.. (Ratinoff, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/28/2018)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Ratinoff, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/28/2018)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Ratinoff, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/28/2018)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Ratinoff, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/28/2018)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT for (1) Trademark Infringement; (2) False Designation of Origin; (3) False Advertising; (4) Federal and State Unfair Competition; (5) Breach of Contract; and (6) Invasion of Privacy against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12880258.). Filed byNeo4j, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ratinoff, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/28/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neo4j, Inc. v. PureThink, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Mark Suhy
Represented By: Adron Gustav Beene
Represented By: Adron W. Beene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: iGov, Inc.
Represented By: Adron Gustav Beene
Represented By: Adron W. Beene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PureThink, LLC
Represented By: Adron Gustav Beene
Represented By: Adron W. Beene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neo4j, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Ratinoff
Represented By: John V. Picone, III
Represented By: Cary Chien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neo4j Sweden AB
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Ratinoff
Represented By: Cary Chien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?