Wilson v. Fidelity Management Trust Company et al
Plaintiff: Thomas K Wilson
Defendant: Fidelity Management Trust Company, Qorvo US, Inc. and Fidelity Workplace Services LLC
Case Number: 5:2018cv07425
Filed: December 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING #17 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Kamps. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/7/2019.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
February 7, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13072096.) filed by Fidelity Management Trust Company, Fidelity Workplace Services LLC, Qorvo US, Inc.. (Kamps, Julie) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings pursuant to Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment to a U.S. District Judge. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 4/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2019) Modified on 2/4/2019 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
February 4, 2019 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2019)
February 1, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Fidelity Management Trust Company, Fidelity Workplace Services LLC.. (Belzer, Aaron) (Filed on 2/1/2019)
January 31, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Thomas K Wilson.. (Basile, Anthony) (Filed on 1/31/2019)
January 29, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, to Extend Time for Filing Response filed by Fidelity Management Trust Company, Fidelity Workplace Services LLC, Qorvo US, Inc.. (Belzer, Aaron) (Filed on 1/29/2019)
January 18, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: All parties shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 2/1/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2019)
January 11, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas K Wilson. All Defendants. (Basile, Anthony) (Filed on 1/11/2019)
December 21, 2018 Filing 9 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Filing Response to Complaint filed by Thomas K Wilson. (Casas, Daniel) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
December 18, 2018 Filing 8 Refund Status re #7 Application for Refund APPROVED. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2018)
December 11, 2018 Filing 7 Application for Refund, Receipt Number 26E1SHPR by Thomas K Wilson. (Casas, Daniel) (Filed on 12/11/2018)
December 11, 2018 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Entities by Thomas K Wilson (Casas, Daniel) (Filed on 12/11/2018)
December 11, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Fidelity Management Trust Company, Fidelity Workplace Services LLC, Qorvo US, Inc. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2018)
December 11, 2018 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/6/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/13/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 7, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2018)
December 10, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/24/2018. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2018)
December 10, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Casas, Daniel) (Filed on 12/10/2018)
December 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fidelity Management Trust Company, Fidelity Workplace Services LLC, Qorvo US, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12915226.). Filed byThomas K Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Casas, Daniel) (Filed on 12/10/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Fidelity Management Trust Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity Management Trust Company
Represented By: Aaron Belzer
Represented By: Julie Melissa Kamps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qorvo US, Inc.
Represented By: Aaron Belzer
Represented By: Julie Melissa Kamps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity Workplace Services LLC
Represented By: Aaron Belzer
Represented By: Julie Melissa Kamps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas K Wilson
Represented By: Daniel L. Casas
Represented By: Anthony Francis Basile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?