Khan v. SAP Labs, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Muhammad Khan
Defendant: Jenny Le, Jewell Parkinson, SAP America, Inc. and SAP Labs, LLC
Case Number: 5:2018cv07490
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Referring Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING #35 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND; TERMINATING AS MOOT #7 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT; DENYING #34 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL; AND ADVISING THAT #37 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND WILL BE DECIDED ON THE PAPERS UPON THE COMPLETION OF BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/1/2019. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/2/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tshS, COURT STAFF).
April 29, 2019 Filing 39 Statement of Non-Opposition TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byJenny Le, Jewell Parkinson, SAP America, Inc., SAP Labs, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Johnsrud, Brian) (Filed on 4/29/2019)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER VACATING HEARING RE ALL PENDING MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/26/2019. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/29/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tshS, COURT STAFF).
April 25, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION to Remand filed by Muhammad Khan. Responses due by 5/23/2019. Replies due by 6/6/2019. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
April 23, 2019 Filing 36 Proposed Order re #35 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Muhammad Khan. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service, #2 Proposed Amended Complaint)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2019)
April 23, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint. filed by Muhammad Khan. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/24/2019: #2 Envelope) (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
April 23, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Muhammad Khan. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/24/2019: #2 Envelope) (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER DENYING #32 PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PERMISSION TO BECOME AN E-FILER; GRANTING #32 PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO EXTEND THE DEADLINE FOR OPPOSING #7 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS; SETTING DEADLINE OF MAY 1, 2019 FOR PLAINTIFF TO PLACE HIS OPPOSITION IN THE PRISON MAIL; GRANTING DEFENDANTS SEVEN DAYS TO FILE A REPLY BRIEF; VACATING HEARING ON #7 MOTION TO DISMISS; AND CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 8/15/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/22/2019 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/23/2019. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/24/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tshS, COURT STAFF).
April 22, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION for Extension of Time to File filed by Muhammad Khan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Envelope)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2019)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING #30 PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL TIME; AND EXTENDING DEADLINE TO FILE OPPOSITION TO APRIL 19, 2019. Opposition to #7 Motion to Dismiss due by 4/19/2019. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/11/2019. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/12/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tshS, COURT STAFF).
March 6, 2019 Filing 30 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File filed by Muhammad Khan. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2019)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING #28 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE OPPOSITION TO #7 . Plaintiff's opposition to #7 due by 4/1/2019. Defendants' reply due by 4/8/2019. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/1/2019. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/4/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tshS, COURT STAFF).
February 27, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Muhammad Khan. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2019)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING #25 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/27/2019.(blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/28/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tshS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/28/2019: #2 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tshS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/28/2019 - CC: Finance (tshS, COURT STAFF).
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER ADDRESSING #23 PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE FILED FEBRUARY 11, 2019; AND EXTENDING PLAINTIFF'S DEADLINE TO FILE OPPOSITION TO #7 MOTION TO DISMISS TO MARCH 1, 2019. Opposition due by 3/1/2019. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/15/2019. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/15/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tshS, COURT STAFF).
February 13, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Muhammad Khan. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2019)
February 13, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE to DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF NON-RECEIPT OF SUBPOENAED DOCUMENTS AND REQUEST TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR OPPOSITION AND COMPLEX CLASSIFICATION. REQUEST TO AMEND COMPLAINT. by Jenny Le, Jewell Parkinson, SAP America, Inc., SAP Labs, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Johnsrud, Brian) (Filed on 2/13/2019)
February 11, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Non-Receipt of Subpoenaed Documents and Request to Extend Deadline for Opposition and Complex Classification and Request to Amend Complaint by Muhammad Khan (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2019)
February 7, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jenny Le, Jewell Parkinson, SAP America, Inc., SAP Labs, LLC PROOF OF SERVICE FOR DEFENDANTS NOTICE TO THE COURT THAT THEY HAVE NOT RECEIVED AN OPPOSITION TO THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS (Johnsrud, Brian) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
February 7, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE by Jenny Le, Jewell Parkinson, SAP America, Inc., SAP Labs, LLC DEFENDANTS NOTICE TO THE COURT THAT THEY HAVE NOT RECEIVED AN OPPOSITION TO THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Johnsrud, Brian) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
January 17, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE by Jenny Le, Jewell Parkinson, SAP America, Inc., SAP Labs, LLC re #18 Order, Notice of Compliance with the Court's Order Directing Defendants to Re-serve Plaintiff with Notice of Removal and Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Johnsrud, Brian) (Filed on 1/17/2019)
January 17, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jenny Le, Jewell Parkinson, SAP America, Inc., SAP Labs, LLC re #18 Order, (Johnsrud, Brian) (Filed on 1/17/2019)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO RE-SERVE PLAINTIFF WITH #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL AND #7 MOTION TO DISMISS; AND ADDRESSING #17 PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT ALL HEARINGS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/16/2019. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/17/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tshS, COURT STAFF).
January 14, 2019 Filing 17 Letter from Muhammad Khan re: requesting telephonic appearance for all hearings.. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2019)
January 9, 2019 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING MOTION HEARING AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AFTER REASSIGNMENT. #7 MOTION to Dismiss hearing set for 5/16/2019 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Case Management Statement due by 5/9/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/16/2019 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman.(tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/9/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tshS, COURT STAFF).
January 9, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by Jenny Le, Jewell Parkinson, SAP America, Inc., SAP Labs, LLC DEFENDANTS NOTICE TO THE COURT THAT THEY HAVE NOT RECEIVED AN OPPOSITION TO THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS; AND REQUEST THAT THE COURT SET A NEW HEARING DATE FOR THE MOTION TO DISMISS (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Jara, Cynthia) (Filed on 1/9/2019)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings pursuant to Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment to A U.S District Judge. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen remains as referral judge assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 1/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2019)
January 8, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (djmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2019)
January 7, 2019 Filing 15 Letter from Muhammad Khan dated 1/1/19. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2019)
January 7, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Muhammad Khan.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2019)
January 3, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 1/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (djmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2019)
December 27, 2018 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 1/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (djmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2018)
December 26, 2018 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jenny Le, Jewell Parkinson, SAP America, Inc., SAP Labs, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Jara, Cynthia) (Filed on 12/26/2018)
December 19, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jenny Le, Jewell Parkinson, SAP America, Inc., SAP Labs, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 1/29/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Responses due by 1/2/2019. Replies due by 1/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice Filed ISO of Defendants Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order Granting Defendants Motion to Dismiss, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Johnsrud, Brian) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 14, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jenny Le, Jewell Parkinson, SAP America, Inc., SAP Labs, LLC re 4 Case Assigned by Intake,,, (Johnsrud, Brian) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
December 13, 2018 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 3/ 12/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/19/2019 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2018)
December 13, 2018 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/27/2018. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2018)
December 13, 2018 Filing 3 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by SAP America, Inc., SAP Labs, LLC identifying Corporate Parent SAP Nederland Holding B.V., Corporate Parent SAP SE for SAP America, Inc.. (Johnsrud, Brian) (Filed on 12/13/2018)
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Jenny Le, Jewell Parkinson, SAP America, Inc., SAP Labs, LLC identifying Corporate Parent SAP Nederland Holding B.V., Corporate Parent SAP SE for SAP America, Inc.. (Johnsrud, Brian) (Filed on 12/13/2018)
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Action from Santa Clara County Superior Court. Their case number is 18CV333969. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-12923991). Filed byJenny Le, SAP America, Inc., SAP Labs, LLC, Jewell Parkinson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Jewell Parkinson iso Defendants' Notice of Removal of Civil Action, #3 Declaration of Elizabeth Heck iso Defendants' Notice of Removal of Civil Action, #4 Declaration of Brian L. Johnsrud iso Defendants' Notice of Removal of Civil Action, #5 Request for Judicial Notice iso Defendants' Notice of Removal of Civil Action, #6 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Johnsrud, Brian) (Filed on 12/13/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Khan v. SAP Labs, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Muhammad Khan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenny Le
Represented By: Patrick Michael Sherman
Represented By: Brian Lee Johnsrud
Represented By: Cynthia Micaela Jara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jewell Parkinson
Represented By: Patrick Michael Sherman
Represented By: Brian Lee Johnsrud
Represented By: Cynthia Micaela Jara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAP America, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick Michael Sherman
Represented By: Brian Lee Johnsrud
Represented By: Cynthia Micaela Jara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAP Labs, LLC
Represented By: Patrick Michael Sherman
Represented By: Brian Lee Johnsrud
Represented By: Cynthia Micaela Jara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?