Sponchiado et al v. Apple Inc.

Plaintiff: Christian Sponchiado and Courtney Davis
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 5:2018cv07533
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: California Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2019)
January 4, 2019 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Courtney Davis, Christian Sponchiado.. (Makman, David) (Filed on 1/4/2019)
January 3, 2019 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice CK Lee ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12970846.) filed by Courtney Davis, Christian Sponchiado. (Attachments: #1 CK LEE CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING)(Makman, David) (Filed on 1/3/2019)
December 18, 2018 7 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: All parties shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 1/2/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2018)
December 14, 2018 6 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
December 14, 2018 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/13/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/20/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 7, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
December 14, 2018 4 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/28/2018. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
December 14, 2018 3 Civil Cover Sheet by Courtney Davis, Christian Sponchiado . (Makman, David) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
December 14, 2018 #Electronic filing error. This filing will not be randomly assigned to Judge by Clerk due to lack of filing completed Civil Cover Sheet. Please complete and file current Civil Cov er Sheet JS-CAND 44 (Rev 06/17) as separate docket entry Re: #1 Complaint filed by Christian Sponchiado, Courtney Davis (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
December 14, 2018 2 Proposed Summons. (Makman, David) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
December 14, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Apple Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12928935.). Filed byChristian Sponchiado, Courtney Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Makman, David) (Filed on 12/14/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sponchiado et al v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Sponchiado
Represented By: David Alan Makman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Davis
Represented By: David Alan Makman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?