Stephen Ciari Plumbing & Heating, Inc. v. Cyber Professional Solutions Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Ciari Plumbing & Heating, Inc.
Defendant: Cyber Professional Solutions Corporation and American Contractors Indemnity Company
Case Number: 5:2018cv07552
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 28:1352
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2018 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Stephen Ciari Plumbing & Heating, Inc... (James, Matthew) (Filed on 12/31/2018)
December 19, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephen Ciari Plumbing & Heating, Inc.. American Contractors Indemnity Company served on 12/17/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. (James, Matthew) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 18, 2018 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Please re-file in its entirety Using *Summons Returned Executed* event. Re: #6 Certificate of Service filed by Stephen Ciari Plumbing & Heating, Inc. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2018)
December 18, 2018 Filing 6 *Filing Error*CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Stephen Ciari Plumbing & Heating, Inc. re #1 Complaint, for Cyber Professional Solutions Corporation (James, Matthew) (Filed on 12/18/2018) Modified on 12/18/2018 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
December 17, 2018 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/13/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/20/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 7, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to American Contractors Indemnity Company, Cyber Professional Solutions Corporation. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/31/2018. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
December 14, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (James, Matthew) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Breach of Contract, Recovery on Miller Act Payment Bonds, Agreed Value of Goods Sold and Delivered, Reasonable Value of Goods Sold and Delivered, Account Stated, Open Book Account, and Recovery on License Bond against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12931392.). Filed byStephen Ciari Plumbing & Heating, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(James, Matthew) (Filed on 12/14/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stephen Ciari Plumbing & Heating, Inc. v. Cyber Professional Solutions Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Ciari Plumbing & Heating, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Patrick James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyber Professional Solutions Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Contractors Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?