Pereira v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Plaintiff: Melinda Rose Pereira
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00181
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 2/8/2019. (djmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2019)
January 24, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A... (Lee, Baldwin) (Filed on 1/24/2019)
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Lee, Baldwin) (Filed on 1/14/2019)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 4/ 16/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/23/2019 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2019)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/25/2019. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2019)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) byWells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2019)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SECTIONS 1331 AND 1332 from Monterey County Superior Court. Their case number is 18CV004324. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-12992752). Filed byWells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Lee, Baldwin) (Filed on 1/10/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pereira v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Baldwin J. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melinda Rose Pereira
Represented By: Hugo N. Gerstl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?