West Coast Distributing, Inc. d/b/a West Coast Fresh v. NewStar Fresh Foods, LLC et al

Plaintiff: West Coast Distributing, Inc. d/b/a West Coast Fresh
Defendant: Ramil Eleccion, Carl R. Wiseman, Anthony E. Vasquez, NewStar Fresh Foods, LLC and Mitchell R. Secondo
Case Number: 5:2019cv00421
Filed: January 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Lucy H Koh
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 Filing 23 **CLERK'S NOTICE FOLLOWING CASE REASSIGNMENT TO THE HONORABLE LUCY H. KOH** Following the case reassignment to Hon. Lucy H. Koh, an Initial Case Management Conference is set for 5/8/2019 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th floor, in San Jose, California. The Joint Case Management Statement is due 7 days prior, on 5/1/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
February 25, 2019 Filing 22 CLERK'S NOTICE scheduling hearing for Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #4 on 4/25/2019 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th floor, in San Jose, California before the Honorable Lucy H. Koh. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2019)
February 25, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byCarl R. Wiseman. (Brown, John) (Filed on 2/25/2019)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Lucy H. Koh and Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as the referral judge for all further proceedings. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Judge Executive Committee on 2/21/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2019)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REQUESTING REASSIGNMENT TO A DISTRICT JUDGE. Re: Dkt. No. #4 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 2/20/2019. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2019)
February 19, 2019 Filing 18 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Carl R. Wiseman.. (Brown, John) (Filed on 2/19/2019)
February 19, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY (re #4 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ) filed byWest Coast Distributing, Inc. d/b/a West Coast Fresh. (Stokes, Craig) (Filed on 2/19/2019)
February 12, 2019 Filing 16 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #4 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ) filed byCarl R. Wiseman. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Brown, John) (Filed on 2/12/2019)
February 7, 2019 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 2/11/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
February 5, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by West Coast Distributing, Inc. d/b/a West Coast Fresh. Carl R. Wiseman served on 2/4/2019, answer due 2/25/2019. (Stokes, Craig) (Filed on 2/5/2019)
January 29, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by West Coast Distributing, Inc. d/b/a West Coast Fresh. Mitchell R. Secondo served on 1/26/2019, answer due 2/19/2019. (Stokes, Craig) (Filed on 1/29/2019)
January 29, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by West Coast Distributing, Inc. d/b/a West Coast Fresh. Ramil Eleccion served on 1/25/2019, answer due 2/15/2019. (Stokes, Craig) (Filed on 1/29/2019)
January 29, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by West Coast Distributing, Inc. d/b/a West Coast Fresh. Anthony E. Vasquez served on 1/25/2019, answer due 2/15/2019. (Stokes, Craig) (Filed on 1/29/2019)
January 29, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by West Coast Distributing, Inc. d/b/a West Coast Fresh. NewStar Fresh Foods, LLC served on 1/25/2019, answer due 2/15/2019. (Stokes, Craig) (Filed on 1/29/2019)
January 24, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Ramil Eleccion, NewStar Fresh Foods, LLC, Mitchell R. Secondo, Anthony E. Vasquez, Carl R. Wiseman. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2019)
January 24, 2019 Filing 8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/17/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/24/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2019)
January 24, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by West Coast Distributing, Inc. d/b/a West Coast Fresh.. (Stokes, Craig) (Filed on 1/24/2019)
January 24, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: All parties shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 1/31/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2019)
January 24, 2019 Filing 5 Brief re #4 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byWest Coast Distributing, Inc. d/b/a West Coast Fresh. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibits to Declaration)(Related document(s) #4 ) (Stokes, Craig) (Filed on 1/24/2019)
January 24, 2019 Filing 4 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by West Coast Distributing, Inc. d/b/a West Coast Fresh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Correspondence to Defendants, #3 Proposed Order)(Stokes, Craig) (Filed on 1/24/2019)
January 24, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/7/2019. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2019)
January 24, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Stokes, Craig) (Filed on 1/24/2019)
January 24, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] The correct event is Proposed Summons. The summons should NOT be filed as an attachment to the Complaint. The correct event can be found at Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Proposed Summons. Please re-file the summons in their entirety. Re:[1-7] Summons to NewStar, [1-8] Summons to Anthony Vasquez, [1-9] Summons to Carl Wiseman, [1-10] Summons to Mitchell Secondo, [1-11] Summons to Ramil Eleccion,, filed by West Coast Distributing, Inc. d/b/a West Coast Fresh (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2019)
January 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ramil Eleccion, NewStar Fresh Foods, LLC, Mitchell R. Secondo, Anthony E. Vasquez, Carl R. Wiseman ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13030075.). Filed byWest Coast Distributing, Inc. d/b/a West Coast Fresh. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - West Coast's PACA License, #3 Exhibit B - NewStar's PACA License, #4 Exhibit C - Open Invoices NewStar, #5 Exhibit D - Open Invoices Estrella Nueva S de RL de CV, #6 Exhibit E - Corporate Guaranty, #7 Summons to NewStar, #8 Summons to Anthony Vasquez, #9 Summons to Carl Wiseman, #10 Summons to Mitchell Secondo, #11 Summons to Ramil Eleccion)(Stokes, Craig) (Filed on 1/24/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West Coast Distributing, Inc. d/b/a West Coast Fresh v. NewStar Fresh Foods, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Coast Distributing, Inc. d/b/a West Coast Fresh
Represented By: Craig Alan Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramil Eleccion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl R. Wiseman
Represented By: John Calvin Brown, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony E. Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NewStar Fresh Foods, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell R. Secondo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?