Johnson v. Apple Nine SPE San Jose, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Defendant: Apple Eight Hospitality Management, Inc. and Apple Nine SPE San Jose, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00474
Filed: January 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Apple Nine SPE San Jose, Inc... (Donald, Sarah) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 20, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 4/3/2019. (djmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2019)
March 1, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint byApple Nine SPE San Jose, Inc.. (Donald, Sarah) (Filed on 3/1/2019)
March 1, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint byApple Eight Hospitality Management, Inc.. (Donald, Sarah) (Filed on 3/1/2019)
February 27, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Johnson. Apple Eight Hospitality Management, Inc. served on 2/1/2019, answer due 2/22/2019. (Carson, Chris) (Filed on 2/27/2019)
February 13, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Johnson. Apple Nine SPE San Jose, Inc. served on 2/1/2019, answer due 2/22/2019. (Carson, Chris) (Filed on 2/13/2019)
January 29, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Scott Johnson.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Carson, Chris) (Filed on 1/29/2019)
January 28, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Apple Eight Hospitality Management, Inc., Apple Nine SPE San Jose, Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2019)
January 28, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2019)
January 28, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/11/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2019)
January 28, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Carson, Chris) (Filed on 1/28/2019)
January 28, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Scott Johnson re #1 Complaint, (Carson, Chris) (Filed on 1/28/2019)
January 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Damages And Injunctive Relief For Violations Of: Americans With Disabilities Act; Unruh Civil Rights Act against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13038585.). Filed byScott Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carson, Chris) (Filed on 1/28/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Apple Nine SPE San Jose, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Represented By: Chris Carson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Eight Hospitality Management, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah E Donald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Nine SPE San Jose, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah E Donald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?