Scholz-Gross v. Starbucks Corporation
Plaintiff: URSULA SCHOLZ-GROSS
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation and Starbucks Corporation a Washington Corporation doing business as Starbucks Coffee Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv00632
Filed: February 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , COUNTERCLAIM against Ursula Scholz-Gross byStarbucks Corporation. (Miller, Robert) (Filed on 4/5/2019)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Re: Dkt. No. #8 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING HEARING set for 3/27/2019 at 01:00 PM re: Motion to Dismiss filed by Starbucks Corporation #8 . The Court finds the motion suitable for decision without oral argument. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 5, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY (re #8 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byStarbucks Corporation. (Marlink, Katherine) (Filed on 3/5/2019)
February 26, 2019 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Ursula Scholz-Gross in Opposition to #8 MOTION to Dismiss 12(b)(6) filed byUrsula Scholz-Gross. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-N)(Related document(s) #8 ) (Beck, David) (Filed on 2/26/2019)
February 26, 2019 Filing 11 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #8 MOTION to Dismiss ) to 12(b)(6) Motion filed byUrsula Scholz-Gross. (Beck, David) (Filed on 2/26/2019)
February 19, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ursula Scholz-Gross.. (Beck, David) (Filed on 2/19/2019)
February 19, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Starbucks Corporation.. (Miller, Robert) (Filed on 2/19/2019)
February 12, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Starbucks Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 3/27/2019 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Responses due by 2/26/2019. Replies due by 3/5/2019. (Marlink, Katherine) (Filed on 2/12/2019)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DENYING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Re: Dkt. No. #2 . Starbucks may refile an administrative motion to seal by 2/15/2019. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
February 7, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: All parties shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 2/21/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
February 7, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Starbucks Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Starbucks Corporation for Starbucks Corporation. (Miller, Robert) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
February 6, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/20/2019. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2019)
February 5, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/1/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/8/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2019)
February 5, 2019 Filing 2 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Starbucks Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A to complaint, #3 Exhibit B to complaint, #4 Exhibit redacted version of complaint, #5 Proposed Order)(Miller, Robert) (Filed on 2/5/2019)
February 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Cruz County Superior Courrt. Their case number is 18CV03641. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13066953). Filed byStarbucks Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Miller, Robert) (Filed on 2/5/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scholz-Gross v. Starbucks Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: URSULA SCHOLZ-GROSS
Represented By: David Russell Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Represented By: Robert James Miller
Represented By: Katherine Lynne Marlink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation a Washington Corporation doing business as Starbucks Coffee Company
Represented By: Robert James Miller
Represented By: Katherine Lynne Marlink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?