Starr Indemnity and Liability Insurance Company v. Camenzind Dredging, Inc.
Plaintiff: Starr Indemnity and Liability Insurance Company
Defendant: Camenzind Dredging, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00694
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Referring Judge: Lucy H Koh
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE FOLLOWING CASE RE-ASSIGNMENT TO THE HONORABLE LUCY H. KOH. Following the case re-assignment to Judge Lucy Koh, an Initial Case Management Conference has been set for 5/15/2019 02:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor. A Joint Case Management Conference Statement is due 7-days before the scheduled conference date. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). The Parties shall familiarize themselves with the Scheduling Notes and Standing Orders for the Hon. Lucy Koh: http://cand.uscourts.gov/lhk.. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2019)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Lucy H. Koh and Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen remains as the referral judge for all further proceedings. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Judge Executive Committee on 2/19/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2019)
February 19, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (svklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2019)
February 15, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Starr Indemnity and Liability Insurance Company.. (Cummins, Michael) (Filed on 2/15/2019)
February 7, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Camenzind Dredging, Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
February 7, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/7/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/14/2019 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
February 7, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/21/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
February 7, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by STARR INDEMNITY AND LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent Starr Indemnity and Liability Insurance Company (SILI), Corporate Parent Starr International Company, Inc., parent company of SILI for STARR INDEMNITY AND LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY. re #1 Complaint, (Cummins, Michael) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Cummins, Michael) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 EXHIBITS re #1 Complaint, filed bySTARR INDEMNITY AND LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Cummins, Michael) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Camenzind Dredging, Inc.( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13074084.). Filed by STARR INDEMNITY AND LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cummins, Michael) (Filed on 2/7/2019) Modified on 2/7/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Starr Indemnity and Liability Insurance Company v. Camenzind Dredging, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Starr Indemnity and Liability Insurance Company
Represented By: George Geoffrey Robb
Represented By: Michael J. Cummins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camenzind Dredging, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?