Broussard v. Amazon, Inc.

Plaintiff: Gerald Broussard
Defendant: Amazon, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00703
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Entities by Amazon, Inc. re #12 Certificate of Interested Entities, Amended Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Dexter, Douglas) (Filed on 3/29/2019)
March 28, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Amazon, Inc. re #12 Certificate of Interested Entities, (Kim, Whayeun) (Filed on 3/28/2019)
March 27, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amazon, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Amazon Global Resources, Inc., Corporate Parent Amazon.com LLC, Corporate Parent Amazon Corporate LLC, Corporate Parent Amazon.Com Services, Inc. for Amazon, Inc.. and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Dexter, Douglas) (Filed on 3/27/2019)
March 1, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint For Damages byAmazon, Inc.. (Kim, Whayeun) (Filed on 3/1/2019)
February 25, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Amazon, Inc... (Kim, Whayeun) (Filed on 2/25/2019)
February 21, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Gerald Broussard. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2019)
February 11, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gerald Broussard. Amazon, Inc. served on 2/8/2019, answer due 3/1/2019. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2019)
February 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address by Gerald Broussard (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2019)
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: All parties shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 2/25/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2019)
February 8, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Gerald Broussard. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Amazon, Inc. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 5/8/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/15/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Gerald Broussard. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Damages against Amazon, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400-Paid). Filed by Gerald Broussard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broussard v. Amazon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Broussard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon, Inc.
Represented By: Whayeun Kim
Represented By: Douglas Evans Dexter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?