Bird v. Berryhill
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Petitioner: Kristy Bird
Case Number: 5:2019cv00757
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed in a Social Security Case Nancy A. Berryhill served on 3/29/2019, answer due 6/27/2019. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2019)
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 USMS 285-SSA, #2 USMS 285- US Attny, #3 USMS 285-Attny Gen)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2019)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION AND DIRECTING U.S. MARSHALS TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(lmhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2019)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2019)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kristy Bird. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2019)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (no process) against Nancy A. Berryhill. Filed byKristy Bird. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bird v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kristy Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?