Chugh et al v. Oracle Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Rajiv Chugh and Sarita Chugh
Defendant: Safra A. Catz, Bruce R. Chizen, William G. Parrett, Jeffrey S. Berg, Michael J. Boskin, Lawrence J. Ellison, Leon E. Panetta, Mark V. Hurd, Hector Garcia-Molina, Jeffrey O. Henley, Renee J. James, George H. Conrades, Charles W. Moorman, IV, Naomi O. Seligman and Oracle Corporation
Case Number: 5:2019cv00764
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2019 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Sarita Chugh, Rajiv Chugh. Service waived by Naomi O. Seligman waiver sent on 2/22/2019, answer due 4/23/2019. (Tostrud, Jon) (Filed on 3/25/2019)
March 25, 2019 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Sarita Chugh, Rajiv Chugh. Service waived by William G. Parrett waiver sent on 2/22/2019, answer due 4/23/2019. (Tostrud, Jon) (Filed on 3/25/2019)
March 25, 2019 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Sarita Chugh, Rajiv Chugh. Service waived by Leon E. Panetta waiver sent on 2/22/2019, answer due 4/23/2019. (Tostrud, Jon) (Filed on 3/25/2019)
March 25, 2019 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Sarita Chugh, Rajiv Chugh. Service waived by Charles W. Moorman, IV waiver sent on 2/22/2019, answer due 4/23/2019. (Tostrud, Jon) (Filed on 3/25/2019)
March 25, 2019 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Sarita Chugh, Rajiv Chugh. Service waived by Renee J. James waiver sent on 2/22/2019, answer due 4/23/2019. (Tostrud, Jon) (Filed on 3/25/2019)
March 25, 2019 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Sarita Chugh, Rajiv Chugh. Service waived by Mark V. Hurd waiver sent on 2/22/2019, answer due 4/23/2019. (Tostrud, Jon) (Filed on 3/25/2019)
March 25, 2019 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Sarita Chugh, Rajiv Chugh. Service waived by Jeffrey O. Henley waiver sent on 2/22/2019, answer due 4/23/2019. (Tostrud, Jon) (Filed on 3/25/2019)
March 25, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Sarita Chugh, Rajiv Chugh. Service waived by Hector Garcia-Molina waiver sent on 2/22/2019, answer due 4/23/2019. (Tostrud, Jon) (Filed on 3/25/2019)
March 25, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Sarita Chugh, Rajiv Chugh. Service waived by Lawrence J. Ellison waiver sent on 2/22/2019, answer due 4/23/2019. (Tostrud, Jon) (Filed on 3/25/2019)
March 25, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Sarita Chugh, Rajiv Chugh. Service waived by George H. Conrades waiver sent on 2/22/2019, answer due 4/23/2019. (Tostrud, Jon) (Filed on 3/25/2019)
March 25, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Sarita Chugh, Rajiv Chugh. Service waived by Bruce R. Chizen waiver sent on 2/22/2019, answer due 4/23/2019. (Tostrud, Jon) (Filed on 3/25/2019)
March 25, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Sarita Chugh, Rajiv Chugh. Service waived by Safra A. Catz waiver sent on 2/22/2019, answer due 4/23/2019. (Tostrud, Jon) (Filed on 3/25/2019)
March 25, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Sarita Chugh, Rajiv Chugh. Service waived by Michael J. Boskin waiver sent on 2/22/2019, answer due 4/23/2019. (Tostrud, Jon) (Filed on 3/25/2019)
March 25, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Sarita Chugh, Rajiv Chugh. Service waived by Jeffrey S. Berg waiver sent on 2/22/2019, answer due 4/23/2019. (Tostrud, Jon) (Filed on 3/25/2019)
March 25, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Sarita Chugh, Rajiv Chugh. Service waived by Oracle Corporation waiver sent on 2/22/2019, answer due 4/23/2019. (Tostrud, Jon) (Filed on 3/25/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Rajiv Chugh, Sarita Chugh.. (Tostrud, Jon) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
February 27, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 3/13/2019. (djmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2019)
February 12, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/7/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/14/2019 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2019)
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Jeffrey S. Berg, Michael J. Boskin, Safra A. Catz, Bruce R. Chizen, George H. Conrades, Lawrence J. Ellison, Hector Garcia-Molina, Jeffrey O. Henley, Mark V. Hurd, Renee J. James, Charles W. Moorman, IV, Oracle Corporation, Leon E. Panetta, William G. Parrett, Naomi O. Seligman. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2019)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/26/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2019)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Schedule A to Summons)(Tostrud, Jon) (Filed on 2/12/2019)
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Rajiv Chugh, Sarita Chugh re #1 Complaint (Tostrud, Jon) (Filed on 2/12/2019)
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13086611.). Filed bySarita Chugh, Rajiv Chugh. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tostrud, Jon) (Filed on 2/12/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chugh et al v. Oracle Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safra A. Catz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce R. Chizen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William G. Parrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey S. Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Boskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence J. Ellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leon E. Panetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark V. Hurd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hector Garcia-Molina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey O. Henley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renee J. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George H. Conrades
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles W. Moorman, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naomi O. Seligman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oracle Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rajiv Chugh
Represented By: Jon A Tostrud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarita Chugh
Represented By: Jon A Tostrud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?