Collins v. County of Monterey Board of Supervisors et al

Plaintiff: James G Collins
Defendant: County of Monterey Board of Supervisors and Stephen L Vagnini
Case Number: 5:2019cv01214
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION Regarding Extension of Time For Plaintiff To Amend the Complaint and For Defendants To File Responsive Pleadings #20 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
May 2, 2019 Filing 20 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by James G Collins. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Obermeyer, Jason) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION Regarding Extension of Time for Defendants to File Responsive Pleadings #18 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2019)
April 3, 2019 Filing 18 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Granting Stipulation Re Extension of Time for Defendants to File Responsive Pleadings filed by County of Monterey Board of Supervisors, Stephen L Vagnini. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Stipulation Re Extension of Time for Defendants to File Responsive Pleading)(Litt, William) (Filed on 4/3/2019)
March 27, 2019 Filing 17 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by County of Monterey Board of Supervisors, Stephen L Vagnini.. (Litt, William) (Filed on 3/27/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James G Collins. Stephen L Vagnini served on 3/18/2019, answer due 4/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Mailing)(Bonnel-Rogers, Julie) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James G Collins. County of Monterey Board of Supervisors served on 3/12/2019, answer due 4/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Mailing)(Bonnel-Rogers, Julie) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 21, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]*ReFile as Summons Returned Executed*Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #13 Certificate of Service filed by Jame s G Collins, #14 Certificate of Service filed by James G Collins (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 20, 2019 Filing 14 **Filing Error** CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by James G Collins (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Mailing)(Bonnel-Rogers, Julie) (Filed on 3/20/2019) Modified on 3/21/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
March 20, 2019 Filing 13 **Filing Error** CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by James G Collins (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Mailing)(Bonnel-Rogers, Julie) (Filed on 3/20/2019) Modified on 3/21/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
March 18, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by James G Collins.. (Cook, Derise) (Filed on 3/18/2019)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney John M. Sosbe Pro Hac Vice representing James G. Collins #8 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2019).
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Jason Obermeyer Pro Hac Vice representing James G. Collins #7 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2019)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Duane Cook Pro Hac Vice representing James G. Collins #6 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by John Sosbe ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13153996.) filed by James G Collins. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Sosbe, John) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Jason Obermeyer ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13153990.) filed by James G Collins. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Obermeyer, Jason) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Duane Cook ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13153985.) filed by James G Collins. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Cook, Derise) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 7, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to County of Monterey Board of Supervisors, Stephen L Vagnini. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2019)
March 7, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Bonnel-Rogers, Julie) (Filed on 3/7/2019)
March 7, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]*Proposed Summons shall be filed using the correct event and not as an attachment to any document or as an exhibit*This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re:[1-2] Summons, filed by James G Collins (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2019)
March 7, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/29/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/5/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2019)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/20/2019. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2019)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against County of Monterey Board of Supervisors, Stephen L Vagnini ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13147712.). Filed by James G Collins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, Filing Error#2 Summons)(Bonnel-Rogers, Julie) (Filed on 3/6/2019) Modified on 3/7/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins v. County of Monterey Board of Supervisors et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James G Collins
Represented By: Julie Elaine Bonnel-Rogers
Represented By: Derise Duane Cook
Represented By: John Milton Sosbe
Represented By: Jason Michael Obermeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Monterey Board of Supervisors
Represented By: William Merrill Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen L Vagnini
Represented By: William Merrill Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?