Datt et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Plaintiff: Kanta Datt and Ram Datt
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 5:2019cv01216
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Edward J Davila
2 Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 12:1461
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY (re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint ) Reply In Support of Defendant Wells Fargo Bank's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed byWells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Moreno, Alejandro) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
April 18, 2019 Filing 18 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint ) Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed byKanta Datt. (Rosenthal, Robert) (Filed on 4/18/2019)
April 9, 2019 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins as referral judge re #15 Order of Recusal. Magistrate Judge Susan Van Keulen no longer assigned to case. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
April 9, 2019 Filing 16 (Text Only) CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING MOTION HEARING AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Motion #8 to Dismiss Hearing is reset for 8/8/2019 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. The Motion briefing schedule remains unchanged. See Civil L.R. 7-7(d). Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/16/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/26/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF RECUSAL. The Clerk of Court is directed to reassign this case to another magistrate judge. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 4/9/19. (djmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 4/8/2219. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
April 8, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kanta Datt.. (Rosenthal, Robert) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
April 8, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (djmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
April 4, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 4/11/2019. (djmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2019)
April 4, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A... (Moreno, Alejandro) (Filed on 4/4/2019)
April 4, 2019 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Entities by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Moreno, Alejandro) (Filed on 4/4/2019)
April 4, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Motion Hearing set for 5/14/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Responses due by 4/18/2019. Replies due by 4/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service)(Moreno, Alejandro) (Filed on 4/4/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 7 EXHIBITS re #1 Complaint Exhibit A and Exhibit B filed byKanta Datt. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Rosenthal, Robert) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/28/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/4/2019 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2019)
March 6, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/20/2019. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2019)
March 6, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Rosenthal, Robert) (Filed on 3/6/2019)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Kanta Datt . (Rosenthal, Robert) (Filed on 3/6/2019)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Civil Action Complaint against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13147843.). Filed byKanta Datt. (Rosenthal, Robert) (Filed on 3/6/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Datt et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Alejandro E. Moreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kanta Datt
Represented By: Robert Edward Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ram Datt
Represented By: Robert Edward Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?