Azeveda v. Comcast Cable Communications Management LLC et al
Plaintiff: Mario Azeveda
Defendant: Comcast Cable Communications Management LLC and Comcast Cable Communications LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv01225
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward J Davila
Referring Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint byComcast Cable Communications LLC, Comcast Cable Communications Management LLC. (Frederick, Andrew) (Filed on 4/26/2019)
March 18, 2019 Filing 12 (Text Only) CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/3/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/13/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 1, 5th Floor before Hon. Edward J. Davila. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2019)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 3/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2019)
March 18, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (djmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2019)
March 18, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Comcast Cable Communications LLC, Comcast Cable Communications Management LLC.. (Frederick, Andrew) (Filed on 3/18/2019)
March 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Comcast Cable Communications LLC, Comcast Cable Communications Management LLC NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1446(d) AND PROOF OF SERVICE OF CASE INITIATING DOCUMENTS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice to State Court, Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B - Proof of Service re Other Case Initiating Documents)(Frederick, Andrew) (Filed on 3/13/2019)
March 13, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Comcast Cable Communications LLC, Comcast Cable Communications Management LLC. (Frederick, Andrew) (Filed on 3/13/2019)
March 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Aleksandr Markelov (Markelov, Aleksandr) (Filed on 3/13/2019)
March 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Daryl Steven Landy (Landy, Daryl) (Filed on 3/13/2019)
March 7, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 5/ 28/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/4/2019 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2019)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Comcast Cable Communications LLC, Comcast Cable Communications Management LLC. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2019) Modified on 3/7/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 6, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/20/2019. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2019)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Comcast Cable Communications LLC, Comcast Cable Communications Management LLC identifying Corporate Parent Comcast Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent Comcast Corporation for Comcast Cable Communications LLC, Comcast Cable Communications Management LLC. (Frederick, Andrew) (Filed on 3/6/2019)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT from Santa Clara Superior Court. Their case number is 19CV341868. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13148960). Filed byComcast Cable Communications LLC, Comcast Cable Communications Management LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Notice re: Complex Designation, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Answer, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Nijole Povilaitis, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Declaration of Derek Squire, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Frederick, Andrew) (Filed on 3/6/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Azeveda v. Comcast Cable Communications Management LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcast Cable Communications Management LLC
Represented By: Andrew Paul Frederick
Represented By: Aleksandr Markelov
Represented By: Daryl Steven Landy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcast Cable Communications LLC
Represented By: Andrew Paul Frederick
Represented By: Aleksandr Markelov
Represented By: Daryl Steven Landy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Azeveda
Represented By: Chaim Shaun Setareh
Represented By: William Matthew Pao
Represented By: Scott Leviant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?