Microsoft Corporation et al v. Hon Hai Precision Industry Co., Ltd. Featured Case

Plaintiffs Microsoft Corporation and Microsoft Licensing, GP alleged that Defendants Hon Hai Precision Industry Co, Ltd, trading as Foxconn Technology Group, breached a Confidential Patent License Agreement dated April 1, 2013, under which Microsoft granted a worldwide patent portfolio license to make and sell certain Covered Products in exchange for Royalty Reports, per-device royalty payments and, if requested, an audit by an independent accounting firm. Despite the agreement, Plaintiff alleged that Defendant has failed to submit royalty reports and cooperate with an audit.

Plaintiff: Microsoft Corporation and Microsoft Licensing, GP
Defendant: Hon Hai Precision Industry Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 5:2019cv01279
Filed: March 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Filing 10 Order deferring ruling on 8 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal entered by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Defendant may oppose or state non-opposition to motion to seal within 7 days of appearance. The attachment will remain temporarily under seal until further order, in order to preserve the present status. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
March 12, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: Parties file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 3/26/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2019)
March 11, 2019 Filing 8 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Licensing, GP. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin Kehoe In Support, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Herold, Frederick) (Filed on 3/11/2019)
March 11, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Hon Hai Precision Industry Co., Ltd. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2019)
March 11, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/5/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/12/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2019)
March 11, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/25/2019. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Microsoft Licensing, GP identifying Corporate Parent Microsoft Corporation for Microsoft Licensing, GP. (Herold, Frederick) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Microsoft Corporation (Herold, Frederick) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Herold, Frederick) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hon Hai Precision Industry Co., Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13157184.). Filed byMicrosoft Corporation, Microsoft Licensing, GP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Herold, Frederick) (Filed on 3/8/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Microsoft Corporation et al v. Hon Hai Precision Industry Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Microsoft Corporation
Represented By: Frederick George Herold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Microsoft Licensing, GP
Represented By: Frederick George Herold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hon Hai Precision Industry Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?