Melucci v. Corcept Therapeutics Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Nicholas Melucci
Defendant: Joseph K. Belanoff, Charles Robb and Corcept Therapeutics Incorporated
Petitioner: Ferraro Family Foundation, Inc., Robert Baffa, Nova Scotia Health Employees Pension Plan, Bucks County Employees Retirement Fund and James L. Ferraro
Case Number: 5:2019cv01372
Filed: March 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Referring Judge: Lucy H Koh
2 Judge: Elizabeth D Laporte
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Denying #54 Stipulation.(lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
June 4, 2019 Filing 54 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Appointing Co-Lead Plaintiffs and Approving Co-Lead Counsel filed by James L. Ferraro, Ferraro Family Foundation, Inc., Nova Scotia Health Employees Pension Plan. (Nespole, Gregory) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #52 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
June 3, 2019 Filing 52 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13401438.) filed by James L. Ferraro, Ferraro Family Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Nespole, Gregory) (Filed on 6/3/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 51 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #29 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , #17 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ) MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF THE MOTION OF THE NOVA SCOTIA HEALTH EMPLOYEES PENSION PLAN FOR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVAL OF LEAD COUNSEL, AND IN OPPOSITION TO COMPETING MOTIONS filed byNova Scotia Health Employees Pension Plan. (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 50 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #32 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , #29 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ) filed byJames L. Ferraro, Ferraro Family Foundation, Inc.. (McCall, Adam) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #47 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #43 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 47 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13384268.) filed by Nova Scotia Health Employees Pension Plan. (Tuccillo, Matthew) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 46 **CLERK'S NOTICE** VACATING June 12, 2019 Case Management Conference. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #37 Stipulation.(lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 44 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion of Robert Baffa For Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Counsel (Dkt. No. 15) (Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 43 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13383048.) filed by Nova Scotia Health Employees Pension Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Dahlstrom, Patrick) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 42 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion (Myers, Danielle) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #39 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2019)
May 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #38 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2019)
May 24, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13378570.) filed by Nova Scotia Health Employees Pension Plan. (Hood, J) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 24, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13378549.) filed by Nova Scotia Health Employees Pension Plan. (Lieberman, Jeremy) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 37 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Joseph K. Belanoff, Corcept Therapeutics Incorporated, Charles Robb. (Kang, Michael) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 36 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(cmfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 35 Certificate of Interested Entities by Nova Scotia Health Employees Pension Plan re #32 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #32 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel by Jennifer Pafiti on behalf of Nova Scotia Health Employees Pension Plan (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 33 Declaration of Jennifer Pafiti in Support of #32 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed byNova Scotia Health Employees Pension Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Loss Chart, #2 Exhibit B - Press Release, #3 Exhibit C - Certification, #4 Exhibit D - Firm Resume)(Related document(s) #32 ) (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Nova Scotia Health Employees Pension Plan. Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2019 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 5/28/2019. Replies due by 6/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 31 Declaration of Lesley F. Portnoy in Support of #29 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed byNicholas Melucci. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Press Release, #2 Exhibit B - Certification, #3 Exhibit C - Loss Chart, #4 Exhibit D - Firm Resume)(Related document(s) #29 ) (Portnoy, Lesley) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Juan Carlos Sanchez on behalf of Bucks County Employees Retirement Fund (Sanchez, Juan) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Nicholas Melucci. Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2019 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 5/28/2019. Replies due by 6/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Portnoy, Lesley) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Shawn A. Williams on behalf of Bucks County Employees Retirement Fund (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Danielle Suzanne Myers on behalf of Bucks County Employees Retirement Fund (Myers, Danielle) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 26 Certificate of Interested Entities by Bucks County Employees Retirement Fund (Myers, Danielle) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 25 Declaration of Danielle S. Myers in Support of #24 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof filed byBucks County Employees Retirement Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #24 ) (Myers, Danielle) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof filed by Bucks County Employees Retirement Fund. Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2019 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 5/28/2019. Replies due by 6/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Myers, Danielle) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle Suzanne Myers (Myers, Danielle) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 22 Certificate of Interested Entities by James L. Ferraro, Ferraro Family Foundation, Inc. (McCall, Adam) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of Counsel PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 3-7(d) by Adam Christopher McCall on behalf of James L. Ferraro, Ferraro Family Foundation, Inc. (McCall, Adam) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 20 Certificate of Interested Entities by Robert Baffa (Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 19 Declaration of Adam C. McCall in Support of #17 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed byJames L. Ferraro, Ferraro Family Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #17 ) (McCall, Adam) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of Counsel by Laurence Matthew Rosen on behalf of Robert Baffa (Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Ferraro Family Foundation, Inc., James L. Ferraro. Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2019 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 5/28/2019. Replies due by 6/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McCall, Adam) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 16 Declaration of Laurence M. Rosen in Support of #15 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byRobert Baffa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - PSLRA Early Notice, #2 Exhibit 2 - PSLRA Certification, #3 Exhibit 3 - Loss Chart, #4 Exhibit 4 - Firm Resume)(Related document(s) #15 ) (Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Robert Baffa. Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2019 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 5/28/2019. Replies due by 6/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #12 Stipulation.(lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
April 5, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Nicholas Melucci of Publication of SEC Class Action Notice (Portnoy, Lesley) (Filed on 4/5/2019)
April 5, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Scheduling filed by Joseph K. Belanoff, Corcept Therapeutics Incorporated, Charles Robb. (Kang, Michael) (Filed on 4/5/2019)
April 5, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Kang (Kang, Michael) (Filed on 4/5/2019)
March 19, 2019 Filing 10 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER SEC CLASS ACTION This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras SEC Class Action Notice due by 4/4/2019. Case Management Statement due by 6/5/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/12/2019 02:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2019)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ***THE CORRECT SEC SCHEDULING ORDER IS AT DOCKET #10 *** Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 3/15/19. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2019) Modified on 3/19/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
March 15, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Joseph K. Belanoff, Corcept Therapeutics Incorporated, Charles Robb. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2019)
March 15, 2019 Filing 7 ERRONEOUSLY E-FILED:PLEASE SEE DOCKET NUMBER #9 FOR THE CORRECTION Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. Signed by the Clerk on 3/15/19. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2019) Modified on 3/19/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Lucy H. Koh and Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 03/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2019)
March 14, 2019 Filing 5 ***Case incorrectly assigned to Judge. See #6 for presiding judge information*** Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/28/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2019) Modified on 3/19/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
March 14, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #1 Complaint, by Lesley F. Portnoy on behalf of Nicholas Melucci (Portnoy, Lesley) (Filed on 3/14/2019)
March 14, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Nicholas Melucci re #1 Complaint, (Portnoy, Lesley) (Filed on 3/14/2019)
March 14, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Portnoy, Lesley) (Filed on 3/14/2019)
March 14, 2019 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATIONS OF THE FEDERAL SECURITIES LAWS; JURY TRIAL DEMANDED; against Joseph K. Belanoff, Corcept Therapeutics Incorporated, Charles Robb ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13171963.). Filed byNicholas Melucci. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Portnoy, Lesley) (Filed on 3/14/2019) Modified on 3/15/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Melucci v. Corcept Therapeutics Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph K. Belanoff
Represented By: Michael Kang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Robb
Represented By: Michael Kang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corcept Therapeutics Incorporated
Represented By: Michael Kang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Melucci
Represented By: Lesley F. Portnoy
Represented By: Charles Henry Linehan
Represented By: Lionel Zevi Glancy
Represented By: Pavithra Rajesh
Represented By: Robert Vincent Prongay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ferraro Family Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: Adam Christopher McCall
Represented By: Gregory Mark Nespole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert Baffa
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nova Scotia Health Employees Pension Plan
Represented By: Matthew Laurence Tuccillo
Represented By: Patrick V. Dahlstrom
Represented By: Jennifer Pafiti
Represented By: J Alexander Hood, II
Represented By: Jeremy A Lieberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bucks County Employees Retirement Fund
Represented By: Juan Carlos Sanchez
Represented By: Shawn A. Williams
Represented By: Danielle Suzanne Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: Adam Christopher McCall
Represented By: Gregory Mark Nespole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?