Chong's Produce, Inc. v. Queen Fresh Fruits, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Chong's Produce, Inc.
Defendant: Queen Fresh Fruits, LLC and Queen Kho Bo LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv01610
Filed: March 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING Case Management Conference set for 6/26/2019 to 8/14/2019 at 01:00 PM, the hearing date of the Motion for Default Judgment #12 . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Queen Fresh Fruits LLC and Queen Kho Bo LLC filed by Chong's Produce, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/14/2019 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Responses due by 7/5/2019. Replies due by 7/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Summary, #2 Declaration of Susan Bishop, #3 Declaration of Andy Chong, #4 Proposed Order)(Bishop, Susan) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
May 9, 2019 Filing 11 Clerk's Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to QUEEN FRESH FRUITS, LLC and QUEEN KHO BO, LLC. (Related documents(s) #10 )(pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 7, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Chong's Produce, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Susan E. Bishop in Support of Request for Entry of Default, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Bishop, Susan) (Filed on 5/7/2019)
April 16, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Chong's Produce, Inc... (Bishop, Susan) (Filed on 4/16/2019)
April 10, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chong's Produce, Inc.. Queen Fresh Fruits, LLC served on 4/8/2019, answer due 4/29/2019; Queen Kho Bo LLC served on 4/3/2019, answer due 4/24/2019. (Bishop, Susan) (Filed on 4/10/2019)
April 1, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Queen Fresh Fruits, LLC, Queen Kho Bo LLC. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2019)
March 29, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Entities by Chong's Produce, Inc. (Bishop, Susan) (Filed on 3/29/2019)
March 29, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Bishop, Susan) (Filed on 3/29/2019)
March 29, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Duplicate entry. [err103] **Both Summons are the same**This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re : #2 Proposed Summons filed by Chong's Produce, Inc. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2019)
March 29, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/19/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/26/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2019)
March 29, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/12/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2019)
March 28, 2019 Filing 2 *Filing Error* Proposed Summons. (Bishop, Susan) (Filed on 3/28/2019) Modified on 3/29/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13212923.). Filed byChong's Produce, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bishop, Susan) (Filed on 3/28/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chong's Produce, Inc. v. Queen Fresh Fruits, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Queen Fresh Fruits, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Queen Kho Bo LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chong's Produce, Inc.
Represented By: Susan E. Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?