El Camino Produce, Inc. v. Golden Rule Produce, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: El Camino Produce, Inc.
Defendant: Dimitrios (Jimmy) Tsigaris and Golden Rule Produce, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv01826
Filed: April 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Filing 24 ABSTRACT ISSUED of of Judgment issued in the amount of $58,889.82 against defendants Golden Rule Produce, Inc. and Dimitrios Tsigaris. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 23 WRIT of Writ of Execution issued in the amount of $58,889.82 against defendants Golden Rule Produce, Inc. and Dimitrios Tsigaris. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 22 Proposed Abstract of Judgment Abstract of Judgment by El Camino Produce, Inc.. (Young, Kaipo) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 21 Proposed Writ Writ Of Execution by El Camino Produce, Inc.. (Young, Kaipo) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE by El Camino Produce, Inc. re #18 Order on Stipulation, #19 Judgment, Terminated Case Notice Of Entry Of Order And Judgment (Young, Kaipo) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 19 JUDGMENT entered in favor of PLAINTIFF and against DEFENDANTS. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 6/19/2019. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION Of Undisputed Facts and For Entry Of Judgment #12 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 17 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Golden Rule Produce, Inc., Dimitrios (Jimmy) Tsigaris.. (Bishop, Susan) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER RE: CONSENT OR DECLINATION TO PROCEED BEFORE A MAGISTRATE JUDGE; ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Defendants are directed to file a consent or declination by 6/24/2019. The Court SETS this case for a case management conference on 6/26/2019, at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 6/17/2019. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
May 21, 2019 Filing 15 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by El Camino Produce, Inc... (Young, Kaipo) (Filed on 5/21/2019)
May 20, 2019 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: All parties shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 5/28/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER [Proposed] Judgment filed by El Camino Produce, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Judgment)(Young, Kaipo) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #11 Stipulation, Proposed Order [Proposed] Approving Stipulation Of Undisputed Facts Anf For Entry Of Judgment filed by El Camino Produce, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Approving Stipulation Of Undisputed Facts And For Entry Of Judgment)(Young, Kaipo) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION STIPULATION OF UNDISPUTED FACTS AND FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT filed by El Camino Produce, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #1 [Proposed] Order Approving Stipulation Of Undisputed Facts And For Entry Of Judgment, #2 Exhibit #2 [Proposed] Judgment, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Young, Kaipo) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by El Camino Produce, Inc.. Dimitrios (Jimmy) Tsigaris served on 4/29/2019, answer due 5/20/2019. Summons Returned Executed re Golden Rule Produce, Inc. re Tsigaris (Young, Kaipo) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by El Camino Produce, Inc.. Golden Rule Produce, Inc. served on 4/12/2019, answer due 5/3/2019. Summons Returned Executed re Golden Rule Produce, Inc. (Young, Kaipo) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 13, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]*Re-File as Summons Returned Executed*Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #8 Certificate of Service filed by El Camino Produce, Inc., #7 Certificate of Service filed by El Camino Produce, Inc. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 10, 2019 Filing 8 *Filing Error* CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by El Camino Produce, Inc. Certificate of Service re: Dimitrios Tsigaris (Young, Kaipo) (Filed on 5/10/2019) Modified on 5/13/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
May 10, 2019 Filing 7 *Filing Error* CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by El Camino Produce, Inc. Certificate of Service re: Golden Rule Produce, Inc. (Young, Kaipo) (Filed on 5/10/2019) Modified on 5/13/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
April 5, 2019 Filing 6 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by El Camino Produce, Inc. re #1 Complaint,, RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Young, Kaipo) (Filed on 4/5/2019)
April 5, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Golden Rule Produce, Inc., Dimitrios (Jimmy) Tsigaris. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2019)
April 5, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/26/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/3/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2019)
April 5, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]*Use Event, Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures* Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents.Please re-file in its entirety. Re: ONLY [1-2] Supplement, filed by El Camino Produce, Inc. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2019)
April 4, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/18/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2019)
April 4, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Young, Kaipo) (Filed on 4/4/2019)
April 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF THE PERISHABLE AGRICULTURAL COMMODITIES ACT (7 U.S.C. 499b et seq.), FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF, FOR VIOLATION OF CALIFORNIA BUSINESS AND PROFESSIONS CODE 17220, FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT, AND FOR CONVERSION. against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13233414.). Filed byEl Camino Produce, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosire Statement)(Young, Kaipo) (Filed on 4/4/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: El Camino Produce, Inc. v. Golden Rule Produce, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: El Camino Produce, Inc.
Represented By: Kaipo K.B. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dimitrios (Jimmy) Tsigaris
Represented By: Susan E. Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Rule Produce, Inc.
Represented By: Susan E. Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?