Uniloc 2017 LLC v. Apple Inc.

Plaintiff: Uniloc 2017 LLC
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv01904
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Clerk of Court to reassign this case to another judge. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 4/11/19. (djmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2019)
April 11, 2019 Filing 39 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/2/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/9/2019 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2019)
April 11, 2019 Filing 38 Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 1:18-cv-00990. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING Defendant's #25 Motion to Transfer Venue and TRANSFERRING this cause to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. ORDER DISMISSING without prejudice Apple's #19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING Defendant's #35 Unopposed Motion for Withdrawal of Andrew Stein as counsel for Apple. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
March 6, 2019 Filing 35 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Andrew Stein by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John)
March 1, 2019 Filing 34 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Apple Inc., re #25 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) filed by Defendant Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Guaragna Decl., #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(Guaragna, John)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Granting Joint Stipulation Setting Deadlines. ORDER continuing Initial Pretrial Conference until further notice. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING #31 Motion for Krista Celentano Grewal to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Apple Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
January 8, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna for Krista Celentano Grewal ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11621840) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
January 8, 2019 Filing 30 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Apple Inc. amending, filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gannon, Kevin)
January 2, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE Regarding Apple Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(B)(6) by Uniloc 2017 LLC (Gannon, Kevin)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING #21 Motion for Andrew Stein to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Apple Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER SETTING Initial Pretrial Conference for 2/1/2019 at 02:00 PM before Judge Lee Yeakel. IN ALL OTHER RESPECTS this action is STAYED, pending further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
December 27, 2018 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #25 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Gannon, Kevin)
December 21, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Jaynes Decl., #2 Guaragna Decl., #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING #17 Motion for Mark D. Fowler to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Apple Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING #16 Motion for Summer Torrez to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Apple Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING Apple Inc's #18 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
December 21, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ($100.00 Fee Paid Receipt #0542-11584058 by John Michael Guaragna for Andrew Stein by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
December 18, 2018 Filing 20 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
December 18, 2018 Filing 19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Guaragna, John)
December 18, 2018 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation (Motion to Transfer Venue) by Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
December 18, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna for Mark D. Fowler ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11569745) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
December 18, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna for Summer Torrez ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11569251) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion for Christine K. Corbett to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Apple Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion for Jonathan Hicks to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Apple Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion for Larissa Bifano to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Apple Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
December 14, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna for Christine K. Corbett ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11559848) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
December 13, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna for Jonathan Hicks ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11554862) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
December 13, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna for Larissa Bifano ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11554844) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
December 13, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Michael Guaragna on behalf of Apple Inc.. Attorney John Michael Guaragna added to party Apple Inc.(pty:dft) (Guaragna, John)
November 19, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc. (lt)
November 19, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shawn A. Latchford on behalf of Uniloc 2017 LLC (Latchford, Shawn)
November 19, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin Gannon on behalf of Uniloc 2017 LLC (Gannon, Kevin)
November 19, 2018 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Nelson, Edward) (Main Document 5 replaced on 11/19/2018 to flatten form) (lt).
November 19, 2018 Filing 4 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Nelson, Edward)
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward Nelson, III on behalf of Uniloc 2017 LLC (Nelson, Edward)
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office with copy of Complaint. (afd)
November 17, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (afd)
November 17, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (afd)
November 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11468201). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A (U.S. Patent No. 7,136,999))(Jacobs, Aaron) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/19/2018 to flatten image) (afd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Uniloc 2017 LLC v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: Larissa Bifano
Represented By: Andrew N. Stein
Represented By: Christine K Corbett
Represented By: Krista Celentano Grewal
Represented By: Mark D Fowler
Represented By: Summer Torrez
Represented By: Jonathan H Hicks
Represented By: Brian K. Erickson
Represented By: John Michael Guaragna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uniloc 2017 LLC
Represented By: Aaron S. Jacobs
Represented By: Kevin Gannon
Represented By: Edward Nelson, III
Represented By: Shawn A Latchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?