Uniloc 2017 LLC v. Apple Inc.

Plaintiff: Uniloc 2017 LLC
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv01929
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Referring Judge: Edward J Davila
2 Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 53 CLERK'S NOTICE (Text Only) CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/7/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/17/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Hon. Edward J. Davila. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by James J. Foster (Foster, James) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 51 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Jacobs, Aaron) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 5, 2019 Filing 50 CLERK'S NOTICE DETERMINING THAT NO CASES ARE RELATED. re dkt. 68 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related Under Civil Local Rule 3-12 in case 19-cv-01691-JST Uniloc USA, Inc., et al v. Apple Inc. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
May 24, 2019 Filing 49 ANSWER to Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement byApple, Inc.. (Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 24, 2019 Filing 48 Certificate of Interested Entities by Apple, Inc. (Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 47 *****PLEASE DISREGARD. DOCKET ENTRY MADE IN ERROR.***** CLERK'S NOTICE DETERMINING THAT NO CASES ARE RELATED. re dkt. 68 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related Under Civil Local Rule 3-12 in case 19-cv-01691-JST Uniloc USA, Inc., et al v. Apple Inc. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2019) Modified on 5/22/2019 (mllS, COURT STAFF).
April 24, 2019 Filing 46 STIPULATION (Joint) Regarding Responsive Pleading filed by Apple, Inc.. (Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 4/24/2019)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Judge Susan Illston no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 4/18/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2019)
April 18, 2019 *CMC vacated due to recusal. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2019)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 4/17/19. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2019)
April 16, 2019 Filing 43 CLERK'S NOTICE Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/12/2019 02:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order, #3 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2019)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Susan Illston for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 4/16/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2019)
April 15, 2019 Filing 41 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
April 15, 2019 Filing 40 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Apple, Inc... (Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
April 10, 2019 Filing 39 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/4/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/11/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2019)
April 10, 2019 Filing 38 Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 1:18-cv-00991. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER DISMISSING #19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; GRANTING #25 Motion to Change Venue. Case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (afd)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING #35 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (afd)
March 6, 2019 Filing 35 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Andrew Stein by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John)
March 1, 2019 Filing 34 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Apple Inc., re #25 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) filed by Defendant Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Guaragna Decl., #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(Guaragna, John)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Granting Joint Stipulation Setting Deadlines. ORDER continuing Initial Pretrial Conference until further notice. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING #31 Motion by Krista Celentano Grewal to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
January 8, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 Fee, Receipt #0542-11621887) by John Michael Guaragna for Krista Celentano Grewal by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
January 8, 2019 Filing 30 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Apple Inc. amending, filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gannon, Kevin)
January 2, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE Regarding Apple Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(B)(6) by Uniloc 2017 LLC (Gannon, Kevin)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Andrew Stein. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dl)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER, (Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/1/2019 02:00 PM before Judge Lee Yeakel). Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
December 27, 2018 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #25 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Gannon, Kevin)
December 21, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Jaynes Decl., #2 Guaragna Decl., #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Summer Torrez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dl)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Mark D. Fowler. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dl)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING #18 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dl)
December 21, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ($100.00 Fee Paid, Receipt # 0542-11584212) by John Michael Guaragna for Andrew Stein by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
December 18, 2018 Filing 20 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
December 18, 2018 Filing 19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
December 18, 2018 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation (Motion to Transfer Venue) by Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
December 18, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna for Mark D. Fowler (Filing fee #100 receipt number 0542-11569788) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John) Modified on 12/18/2018 (tr).
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Christine K. Corbett. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dl)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Larissa Bifano. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dl)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jonathan Hicks. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dl)
December 18, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna for Summer Torrez ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11569288) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
December 14, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna for Christine K. Corbett ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11559866) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
December 13, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna for Jonathan Hicks ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11554914) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
December 13, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna for Larissa Bifano ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11554871) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
December 13, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Michael Guaragna on behalf of Apple Inc.. Attorney John Michael Guaragna added to party Apple Inc.(pty:dft) (Guaragna, John)
November 19, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc. (td)
November 19, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shawn A. Latchford on behalf of Uniloc 2017 LLC (Latchford, Shawn)
November 19, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin Gannon on behalf of Uniloc 2017 LLC (Gannon, Kevin)
November 19, 2018 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Nelson, Edward)
November 19, 2018 Filing 4 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Nelson, Edward)
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward Nelson, III on behalf of Uniloc 2017 LLC (Nelson, Edward)
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office with copy of Complaint. (afd)
November 17, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (afd)
November 17, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (afd)
November 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11468203). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A (U.S. Patent No. 7,020,252))(Jacobs, Aaron) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/19/2018) (afd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Uniloc 2017 LLC v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: Larissa Bifano
Represented By: Andrew N. Stein
Represented By: Christine K Corbett
Represented By: Mark D Fowler
Represented By: Jonathan H Hicks
Represented By: Summer Torrez
Represented By: Brian K. Erickson
Represented By: Krista Celentano Grewal
Represented By: John Michael Guaragna
Represented By: Christine Kerba Corbett
Represented By: Larissa Susan Bifano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uniloc 2017 LLC
Represented By: Aaron S. Jacobs
Represented By: Kevin Gannon
Represented By: Edward Nelson, III
Represented By: Shawn A Latchford
Represented By: Aaron Seth Jacobs
Represented By: James J. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?