Nigam v. Kaiser Foundation Hospitals
Plaintiff: Sunita Nigam
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Hospitals
Case Number: 5:2019cv02309
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Filing 19 STIPULATION Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. (Rasmussen, Jesper) (Filed on 12/27/2019)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order re Admission Status of Plaintiff's Counsel. Signed by Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 8/6/2019. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2019)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Close of Fact Discovery due by 1/30/2020. Close of Expert Discovery due by 4/2/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/5/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. Jury Trial set for 8/19/2020, 8/20/2020, 8/21/2020, 8/24/2020, 8/25/2020, 8/26/2020, 8/27/2020 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Signed by Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 7/30/2019. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2019)
July 30, 2019 Filing 16 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 7/30/2019 1:59:47 PM ]. File Size [ 3864 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:08:03 ]. (courtspeak).
July 30, 2019 Filing 15 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 7/30/2019 1:44:26 PM ]. File Size [ 312 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:00:39 ]. (courtspeak).
July 30, 2019 Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi: Initial Case Management Conference held on 7/30/2019. Hearing held. Court to issue written scheduling order. FTR Time: 1:44-1:45 & 1:59-2:07. Plaintiff Attorney: No Appearance. Defendant Attorney: Michael Wilbur. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/30/2019)
July 23, 2019 Filing 13 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and [Proposed] Order filed by Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. (Wilbur, Michael) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 9, 2019 Filing 12 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Wilbur, Michael) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting in part and denying in part #10 Stipulation Continuing Deadline to Serve Initial Discovery. Parties to produce initial discovery by 7/9/2019. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING DEADLINE TO SERVE INITIAL DISCOVERY filed by Sunita Nigam. (Costanzo, Lori) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
May 30, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kaiser Foundation Hospitals.. (Wilbur, Michael) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 30, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sunita Nigam.. (Costanzo, Lori) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 6/13/2019. (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 2, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kaiser Foundation Hospitals re #5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines,, (Wilbur, Michael) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
April 30, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 7/ 23/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/30/2019 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2019)
April 30, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kaiser Foundation Hospitals re #1 Notice of Removal, (Wilbur, Michael) (Filed on 4/30/2019)
April 29, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/13/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2019)
April 29, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Kaiser Foundation Hospitals re #1 Notice of Removal, (Wilbur, Michael) (Filed on 4/29/2019)
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Clara County Superior Court. Their case number is 19CV343916. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13300596). Filed byKaiser Foundation Hospitals. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Complaint with Notice and Acknowledgment of Summons, #2 Exhibit 2 - Acknowledgment of Receipt, #3 Exhibit 3 - Request for Dismissal of Kaiser Permanente, #4 Exhibit 4 - KFH's Answer, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wilbur, Michael) (Filed on 4/29/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nigam v. Kaiser Foundation Hospitals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunita Nigam
Represented By: Lori J. Costanzo
Represented By: Andrea Justo
Represented By: Andrea J Justo,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Hospitals
Represented By: Michael Eugene Wilbur
Represented By: Jesper Ihde Rasmussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?