Reinhardt v. Hamlin
Plaintiff: David Michael Reinhardt
Defendant: Gary Hoff, Arlan Harrell, W. Kent Hamlin, Kathleen A. Meehan, Herbert I. Levy, Brad R. Hill, Jennifer R.S. Detjen, Tani Gorre Cantil-Sakauye, Donald R. Franson, Stephen J Kane, Gene M. Gomes, Rosendo Pena, Jr., Chief Justice Ronald M. George, Gary Orozco, Thomas DeSantos, Charles S. Poochigian, James R. Oppliger, James A. Ardaiz, Dennis A. Cornell, M. Bruce Smith, Marvin R. Baxter and Rebecca A. Wiseman
Case Number: 5:2019cv02343
Filed: April 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Referring Judge: PSLC MBI
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 Receipt of acknowledgment - Case transferred from California Northern has been opened in Eastern District of California Live System as case 1:19cv00892, filed 06/28/2019.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF TRANSFER. This action is TRANSFERRED to the Eastern District. The Clerk shall transfer this action forthwith. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 6/28/19. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(dmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Hearing filed by David Michael Reinhardt. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Summary Judgment, MOTION for Hearing filed by David Michael Reinhardt. Responses due by 6/25/2019. Replies due by 7/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 9, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by David Michael Reinhardt.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
April 30, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from David Michael Reinhardt. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2019)
April 30, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2019) (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by David Michael Reinhardt. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/2/2019: #1 certificate) (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by David Michael Reinhardt. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2019) (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kent Hamlin M. Bruce Smith, James R. Oppliger, Gary Orozco, Rebecca A. Wiseman, Herbert I. Levy, Gene M. Gomes, Dennis A. Cornell, Stephen J Kane, James A. Ardaiz, Brad R. Hill, Donald R. Franson, Charles S. Poochigian, Rosendo Pena, Jr, Jennifer R.S. Detjen, Thomas DeSantos, Kathleen A. Meehan, George, Baxter and Tani Gorre Cantil-Sakauye. Filed by David Michael Reinhardt. Consent/Declination due by 5/14/2019. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/2/2019: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope) (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/2/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reinhardt v. Hamlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Hoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arlan Harrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Kent Hamlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen A. Meehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herbert I. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad R. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer R.S. Detjen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tani Gorre Cantil-Sakauye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald R. Franson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen J Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gene M. Gomes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosendo Pena, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Justice Ronald M. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Orozco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas DeSantos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles S. Poochigian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James R. Oppliger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A. Ardaiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis A. Cornell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Bruce Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin R. Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca A. Wiseman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Michael Reinhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?