izmo, inc. v. Roadster, Inc.

Plaintiff: izmo, inc.
Defendant: Roadster, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv02679
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 **For Further Docket Entries See Lead Consolidated Action 5:18-cv-06092-NC** (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2019) Modified on 6/28/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
June 12, 2019 Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Initial Case Management Conference held on 6/12/2019. Case consolidated with 19-02679 and all future filings to be in 18-06092.Court to issue scheduling order. Attorneys for Plaintiff: Mark Hejinian, Karen Frank. Attorneys for Defendant: Roya Rahmanpour, Deborah Pollack-Milgate. FTR Time: 1:54pm - 2:08pm. Time in Court: 14 minutes. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/12/2019).
June 5, 2019 Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint filed by izmo, inc.. (Hejinian, Mark) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
May 30, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by izmo, inc... (Harvey, Thomas) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 30, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by izmo, inc.. Service waived by All Defendants. (Harvey, Thomas) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING Initial Case Management Conference for 6/12/2019 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 6/5/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: All parties shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge 6/5/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RELATING CASES 18-cv-06092 NC and 19-cv-02679 VKD. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 5/24/2019. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2019).
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins for all further proceedings Order Relating Cases. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi no longer assigned to case. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 COMPLAINT CORRECTION OF DOCKET #1 against Roadster, Inc.. Filed byizmo, inc.. (Frank, Karen) (Filed on 5/20/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Roadster, Inc.. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/13/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/20/2019 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/31/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by izmo, inc. (Frank, Karen) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 ***DOCUMENT FILED WITH INCORRECT CASE NUMBER. SEE DOCUMENT #6 FOR CORRECT DOCUMENT*** COMPLAINT against Roadster, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13358512.). Filed byizmo, inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Frank, Karen) (Filed on 5/17/2019) Modified on 5/20/2019 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: izmo, inc. v. Roadster, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: izmo, inc.
Represented By: Mark Luhe Hejinian
Represented By: Karen Susanna Frank
Represented By: Lawrence J. Siskind
Represented By: Thomas Andrews Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roadster, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?