Fluidigm Corporation v. BioMerieux, SA

Plaintiff: Fluidigm Corporation
Defendant: BioMerieux, SA
Case Number: 5:2019cv02716
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Referring Judge: Lucy H Koh
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathaniel Ryan Scharn on behalf of Plaintiff (Scharn, Nathaniel) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 27, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur Paul Dykhuis on behalf of Plaintiff (Dykhuis, Arthur) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 27, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Fluidigm Corporation. Service waived by BioMerieux, SA waiver sent on 6/21/2019, answer due 9/19/2019. (Carsten, Douglas) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 4, 2019 Filing 12 **CLERK'S NOTICE FOLLOWING CASE REASSIGNMENT TO THE HONORABLE LUCY H. KOH** Following the case reassignment to Hon. Lucy H. Koh, an Initial Case Management Conference is set for Wednesday, August 28, 2019 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th floor, in San Jose, California. The Joint Case Management Statement is due 7 days prior. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). The parties shall familiarize themselves with the Scheduling Notes and Standing Orders for the Hon. Lucy H. Koh: http://cand.uscourts.gov/lhk. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedins and Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi for discovery matters. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 6/3/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2019)
May 31, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2019)
May 31, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Fluidigm Corporation.. (Carsten, Douglas) (Filed on 5/31/2019)
May 21, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent (cc: form mailed to register). (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2019)
May 21, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to BioMerieux, SA. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2019)
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/8/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/15/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2019)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/3/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Fluidigm Corporation and Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons (Carsten, Douglas) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent (cc: form mailed to register). (Carsten, Douglas) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Carsten, Douglas) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against BioMerieux, SA ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13361166.). Filed byFluidigm Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carsten, Douglas) (Filed on 5/17/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fluidigm Corporation v. BioMerieux, SA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fluidigm Corporation
Represented By: Douglas H. Carsten
Represented By: Arthur Paul Dykhuis
Represented By: Nathaniel Ryan Scharn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BioMerieux, SA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?