R&R Produce, Inc. v. PK Produce, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: R&R Produce, Inc.
Defendant: PK Produce, Inc., Paul G.A. Kasapis, Debbie Kasapis, George Argie and Argie, D'Amico & Vitantonio
Case Number: 5:2019cv02966
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Case transferred from California Northern has been opened in Northern District of Ohio as case 1:19-cv-01673, filed 07/23/2019. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) #18 . Case TRANSFERRED to the U.S. District Court, Northern District of Ohio. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 7/22/2019. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 19, 2019 Filing 18 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #17 MOTION to Change Venue MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by R&R Produce, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order ON STIPULATION TO TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404(a))(Anastassiou, Effie) (Filed on 7/19/2019)
July 17, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Change Venue MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by R&R Produce, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/28/2019 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Responses due by 7/31/2019. Replies due by 8/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF EFFIE F. ANASTASSIOU IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), #2 Proposed Order ON MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), #3 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE ON MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), #4 Exhibit TO REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE ON MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404(a))(Anastassiou, Effie) (Filed on 7/17/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by R&R Produce, Inc.. (Anastassiou, Effie) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by R&R Produce, Inc.. Paul G.A. Kasapis served on 7/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (Anastassiou, Effie) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
June 27, 2019 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: Defendants are requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 7/11/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by R&R Produce, Inc. for CONSENT OR DECLINATION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE JURISDICTION (Anastassiou, Effie) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by R&R Produce, Inc.. Argie, D'Amico & Vitantonio served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019. (Anastassiou, Effie) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by R&R Produce, Inc.. Debbie Kasapis served on 6/18/2019, answer due 7/9/2019. (Anastassiou, Effie) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by R&R Produce, Inc.. George Argie served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019. (Anastassiou, Effie) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by R&R Produce, Inc.. PK Produce, Inc. served on 6/4/2019, answer due 6/25/2019. (Anastassiou, Effie) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] *Re-File as Summons Returned Executed*Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #8 Certificate of Service filed by R &R Produce, Inc. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 *Filing Error* CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by R&R Produce, Inc. of Summons and Complaint (Anastassiou, Effie) (Filed on 6/13/2019) Modified on 6/17/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
May 31, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by R&R Produce, Inc... (Anastassiou, Effie) (Filed on 5/31/2019)
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to George Argie, Argie, D'Amico & Vitantonio, Debbie Kasapis, Paul G.A. Kasapis, PK Produce, Inc. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/21/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/28/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/13/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by R&R Produce, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate R&R Produce, Inc., Other Affiliate David Rossi, Other Affiliate Daniel Rossi for R&R Produce, Inc.. (Anastassiou, Effie) (Filed on 5/29/2019)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Anastassiou, Effie) (Filed on 5/29/2019)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against George Argie, Argie, D'Amico & Vitantonio, Debbie Kasapis, Paul G.A. Kasapis, PK Produce, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13389845.). Filed byR&R Produce, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Anastassiou, Effie) (Filed on 5/29/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: R&R Produce, Inc. v. PK Produce, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PK Produce, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul G.A. Kasapis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debbie Kasapis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Argie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Argie, D'Amico & Vitantonio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R&R Produce, Inc.
Represented By: Effie F. Anastassiou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?