Lam v. Kingue et al
Plaintiff: Loren Lam
Defendant: Terrance Finley, Bibiane Kingue, James Felix and Bethany Birdsong
Case Number: 5:2019cv02993
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE: CONSENT OR DECLINE TO JURISDICTION UNDER 28 U.S.C 636; AND REMINDER TO DEFENDANTS RE: MOTION TO REMAND. Consent/Declination form and defendants' response to plaintiff's motion to remand due 7/15/2019. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 7/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Declination Form, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bibiane Kingue. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: Defendants are requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 7/2/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand filed by Loren Lam. Motion Hearing set for 8/7/2019 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Responses due by 7/2/2019. Replies due by 7/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Pirrone, Christopher) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 Mail sent to Bibiane Kingue returned as undeliverable re #3 Clerk's Notice. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
May 31, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: All parties shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 6/14/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2019)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/21/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/28/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Clara County Superior Court. Their case number is 19cv345009. ( Filing fee $400-Paid ). COMPLAINT - Unlawful Detainer, Exhibit 2A - Notice of Termination of Tenancy - Filed by Bibiane Kingue. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2019) Modified on 5/30/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lam v. Kingue et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrance Finley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bibiane Kingue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Felix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bethany Birdsong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loren Lam
Represented By: Dana R Wares
Represented By: Christopher Scott Pirrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?