Pinto v. Aggarwal et al

Plaintiff: Leonard R Pinto
Defendant: Mike Pope, Amy Rothstein, Arlo Technologies, Inc., Sean Aggarwal, Grady K Summers, Ralph E Faison, Matthew McRae and Jocelyn E Carter-Miller
Case Number: 5:2019cv03354
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward J Davila
Referring Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER APPROVAL re #9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant Amy Rothstein ONLY filed by Leonard R Pinto. The Clerk shall terminate Defendant Amy Rothstein ONLY from this action. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/16/2019. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Leonard R Pinto. Service waived by Arlo Technologies, Inc. waiver sent on 6/20/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Magnanimo, Frank) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Leonard R Pinto. Service waived by Grady K Summers waiver sent on 6/20/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Magnanimo, Frank) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Leonard R Pinto. Service waived by Mike Pope waiver sent on 6/20/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Magnanimo, Frank) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Leonard R Pinto. Service waived by Jocelyn E Carter-Miller waiver sent on 6/20/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Magnanimo, Frank) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Leonard R Pinto. Service waived by Ralph E Faison waiver sent on 6/20/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Magnanimo, Frank) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Leonard R Pinto. Service waived by Sean Aggarwal waiver sent on 6/20/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Magnanimo, Frank) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Leonard R Pinto. Service waived by Matthew McRae waiver sent on 6/20/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Magnanimo, Frank) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice as to Defendant Amy Rothstein by Leonard R Pinto (Magnanimo, Frank) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 (Text Only) CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/30/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/10/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Hon. Edward J. Davila. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 7/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Leonard R Pinto.. (Magnanimo, Frank) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/10/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/17/2019 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/27/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Leonard R Pinto (Magnanimo, Frank) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13433476.). Filed byLeonard R Pinto. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Magnanimo, Frank) (Filed on 6/13/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pinto v. Aggarwal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Rothstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arlo Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Aggarwal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grady K Summers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph E Faison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew McRae
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jocelyn E Carter-Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard R Pinto
Represented By: Thomas J. McKenna
Represented By: Frank Alfredo Magnanimo
Represented By: Gregory M. Egleston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?