Tamboura et al v. Singer et al
Plaintiff: Marine Hall-Poirier, Caleb Crane, Cole Smith, Laurence Poirier, Kasra Keyhan, Karl Armbrust, Dirk Armbrust, Jillian Garcia, Leilani Durden, Falen Robinson, Candace Tjoa, Ronda Smith, Michael Vollmer, Keith Hall, Angelique Vollmer, Kathleen Tatusko, Timmy Mai, Alyssa Tamboura, Mika Tjoa, Amy Tatusko, LaNae Durden, Victor Garcia, Esteban Frausto, Laila Keyhan, Chrissy Pham and Yasamin Ghodsbin
Defendant: Stanford University, The University of San Diego, The Edge College & Career Network, LLC, William Rick Singer, The Regents of the University of California, The University of Texas at Austin, The University of Southern California, Wake Forest University, Georgetown University, Yale University and The Key Worldwide Foundation
Case Number: 5:2019cv03411
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward J Davila
Referring Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2020 Filing 160 Transcript of Zoom Proceedings held on 05/28/2020, before Judge Davila. Court Reporter Irene L. Rodriguez, email address Irene_Rodriguez@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/8/2020. (irodS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2020)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER DISMISSING WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND BENDIS AND TAMBOURA PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED COMPLAINTS FOR LACK OF STANDING #95 #104 #106 #107 #144 . Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/29/2020. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 29, 2020 Filing 158 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/28/20 before Judge Edward J. Davila by The University of Southern California, for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Do, Kim) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 28, 2020 Filing 157 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward J. Davila: Motions to Dismiss and to Sever Hearing held on 5/28/2020 via Zoom Webinar. The Court heard oral argument and took the matters under submission. The Court to issue the Order. Plaintiff Attorney: David Cialkowski, Alia Abdi, Raina Borrelli, Patrick Howard, John Medler. Defendant Attorney: Stephen Devereaux, Nicholas Shepard, James Fogelman, Timothy Loose, Kim Do, John Grenfell, Hakeem Rizk, William SternBruce Berman, Adam Doerr. Total Time in Court:10:00-11:15am(1hr.25Mins.) Court Reporter: Irene Rodriguez. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/28/2020)
May 27, 2020 ***THIS POST IS THE SAME AS #136 and in Case 5:19-cv-03411-EJD 156 - REPOSTED FOR WEBSITE INFORMATION*** CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Please take NOTICE that the Motions #84 , #91 , #92 and #125 and in Case 5:19-cv-03411-EJD Motions #95 , #104 , #106 , #107 , and #144 Hearing is HEREBY SET for 5/28/2020 at 10:00 AM (PST) via Zoom Webinar before Judge Edward J. Davila. For Zoom connection, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/This proceeding will be a Zoom video conferencing webinar. ADVANCE REGISTRATION OF PARTICIPATING COUNSEL IS REQUIRED and must be done by emailing a list of names and emails of counsel who will be participating in the hearing to ejdcrd@cand.uscourts.gov by no later than May 27, 2020 at 10 AM PST.Case participants may also receive an email invitation from the court with different information which should be followed.All counsel, members of the public and press please click the link or use the information below to join the webinar: https://us02web.zoom.us/j/83375106055?pwd=bERZOG82ZW9jaXlnOHU2cHNNd2JCdz09Meeting ID: 833 7510 6055Password: 584393Dial by your location+1 929 205 6099 US (New York)+1 253 215 8782 US+1 301 715 8592 US+1 312 626 6799 US (Chicago)+1 346 248 7799 US (Houston)+1 669 900 6833 US (San Jose)Find your local number: https://zoom.us/u/ac4JkPfcjoFor important information and guidance on technical preparation, please see #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/.,. Motion Hearing set for 5/28/2020 10:00 AM before Judge Edward J. Davila. For Zoom connection, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/This proceeding will be a Zoom video conferencing webinar. Case participants may also receive an email invitation from the court with different information which should be followed.All counsel, members of the public and press please click the link or use the information below to join the webinar: https://us02web.zoom.us/j/83375106055?pwd=bERZOG82ZW9jaXlnOHU2cHNNd2JCdz09Meeting ID: 833 7510 6055Password: 584393Dial by your location+1 929 205 6099 US (New York)+1 253 215 8782 US+1 301 715 8592 US+1 312 626 6799 US (Chicago)+1 346 248 7799 US (Houston)+1 669 900 6833 US (San Jose)Find your local number: https://zoom.us/u/ac4JkPfcjoFor important information and guidance on technical preparation, please see #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Motion Hearing set for 5/28/2020 10:00 AM before Judge Edward J. Davila. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2020)
May 22, 2020 Filing 156 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Please take NOTICE that the Motions #106 , #104 , #107 , #95 , and #144 Hearing is HEREBY SET for 5/28/2020 at 10:00 AM (PST) via Zoom Webinar before Judge Edward J. Davila. For Zoom connection, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/This proceeding will be a Zoom video conferencing webinar. ADVANCE REGISTRATION OF PARTICIPATING COUNSEL IS REQUIRED and must be done by emailing a list of names and emails of counsel who will be participating in the hearing to ejdcrd@cand.uscourts.gov by no later than May 27, 2020 at 10:00 AM (PST).Case participants may also receive an email invitation from the court with different information which should be followed.All counsel, members of the public and press please click the link or use the information below to join the webinar: https://us02web.zoom.us/j/83375106055?pwd=bERZOG82ZW9jaXlnOHU2cHNNd2JCdz09Meeting ID: 833 7510 6055Password: 584393Dial by your location+1 929 205 6099 US (New York)+1 253 215 8782 US+1 301 715 8592 US+1 312 626 6799 US (Chicago)+1 346 248 7799 US (Houston)+1 669 900 6833 US (San Jose)Find your local number: https://zoom.us/u/ac4JkPfcjoFor important information and guidance on technical preparation, please see #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/.,. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document a ssociated with this entry.) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2020)
April 9, 2020 Filing 155 REPLY (re #144 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byWilliam Rick Singer, The Edge College & Career Network, LLC. (Shepard, Nicholas) (Filed on 4/9/2020)
March 13, 2020 Filing 154 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING DEADLINE AND HEARINGS. Please take NOTICE that the Motions #84 , #91 , #92 , #95 , #104 , #106 , #107 Hearing set for 3/26/2020 is HEREBY CONTINUED to 5/28/2020 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/3/2020. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 4/2/2020 is HEREBY RESET to 8/13/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2020)
March 11, 2020 Filing 153 Supplemental Brief re #151 Supplemental Brief, #146 Order in Opposition to the University Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed byLaNae Durden, Leilani Durden, Yasamin Ghodsbin, Keith Hall, Marine Hall-Poirier, Kasra Keyhan, Laila Keyhan, Timmy Mai, Chrissy Pham, Laurence Poirier, Cole Smith, Ronda Smith, Alyssa Tamboura, Amy Tatusko, Kathleen Tatusko, Candace Tjoa, Mika Tjoa, Angelique Vollmer, Michael Vollmer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David M. Cialkowski, #2 Exhibit - A-B)(Related document(s) #151 , #146 ) (Cialkowski, David) (Filed on 3/11/2020)
March 10, 2020 Filing 152 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #144 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byLaNae Durden, Leilani Durden, Yasamin Ghodsbin, Keith Hall, Marine Hall-Poirier, Kasra Keyhan, Laila Keyhan, Timmy Mai, Chrissy Pham, Laurence Poirier, Cole Smith, Ronda Smith, Alyssa Tamboura, Amy Tatusko, Kathleen Tatusko, Candace Tjoa, Mika Tjoa, Angelique Vollmer, Michael Vollmer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David M. Cialkowski, #2 Exhibit A-G)(Cialkowski, David) (Filed on 3/10/2020)
February 25, 2020 Filing 151 Supplemental Brief re #69 Amended Complaint,,, UNIVERSITY DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS filed byThe University of Southern California. (Related document(s) #69 ) (Fogelman, James) (Filed on 2/25/2020)
February 25, 2020 Filing 150 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by James P. Fogelman (Fogelman, James) (Filed on 2/25/2020)
February 19, 2020 ***Set/Reset Deadlines per ECF #130 as to ( #125 in 5:19-cv-01405-EJD) Motion to Dismiss, ( #144 in 5:19-cv-03411-EJD) Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 3/10/2020. Replies due by 4/10/2020. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2020)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 149 Order granting #147 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on February 19, 2020.(ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2020)
February 19, 2020 Filing 148 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Wayne Sweetin NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF RICHARD S. LINKERT (Sweetin, Robert) (Filed on 2/19/2020)
February 19, 2020 Filing 147 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend the Time to Respond to the Singer Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Strike Class Allegations filed by LaNae Durden, Leilani Durden, Yasamin Ghodsbin, Keith Hall, Marine Hall-Poirier, Kasra Keyhan, Laila Keyhan, Timmy Mai, Chrissy Pham, Laurence Poirier, Cole Smith, Ronda Smith, Alyssa Tamboura, Amy Tatusko, Kathleen Tatusko, Candace Tjoa, Mika Tjoa, Angelique Vollmer, Michael Vollmer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Abdi, Alia) (Filed on 2/19/2020)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER Re Supplemental Briefing. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on February 11, 2020. The hearing set for February 13, 2020 is CONTINUED to March 26, 2020. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2020)
February 10, 2020 Filing 145 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Wayne Sweetin on behalf of Defendants WILLIAM RICK SINGER and THE EDGE COLLEGE & CAREER NETWORK, LLC, d/b/a THE KEY (Sweetin, Robert) (Filed on 2/10/2020)
February 10, 2020 Filing 144 MOTION to Dismiss and to strike class allegations filed by William Rick Singer, The Edge College & Career Network, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 5/28/2020 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 2/24/2020. Replies due by 3/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice)(Shepard, Nicholas) (Filed on 2/10/2020) Modified on 2/10/2020 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER by Judge Edward J. Davila Granting #141 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2020)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER by Judge Edward J. Davila Granting #140 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2020)
January 22, 2020 Filing 141 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14093129.) filed by Dirk Armbrust, Karl Armbrust, LaNae Durden, Leilani Durden, Jillian Garcia, Victor Garcia, Yasamin Ghodsbin, Keith Hall, Marine Hall-Poirier, Kasra Keyhan, Laila Keyhan, Timmy Mai, Chrissy Pham, Laurence Poirier, Cole Smith, Ronda Smith, Alyssa Tamboura, Amy Tatusko, Kathleen Tatusko, Candace Tjoa, Mika Tjoa, Angelique Vollmer, Michael Vollmer. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Borrelli, Raina) (Filed on 1/22/2020)
January 22, 2020 Filing 140 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14093074.) filed by Dirk Armbrust, Karl Armbrust, LaNae Durden, Leilani Durden, Jillian Garcia, Victor Garcia, Yasamin Ghodsbin, Keith Hall, Marine Hall-Poirier, Kasra Keyhan, Laila Keyhan, Timmy Mai, Chrissy Pham, Laurence Poirier, Cole Smith, Ronda Smith, Alyssa Tamboura, Amy Tatusko, Kathleen Tatusko, Candace Tjoa, Mika Tjoa, Angelique Vollmer, Michael Vollmer. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Gustafson, Daniel) (Filed on 1/22/2020)
January 17, 2020 Filing 139 REPLY (re #107 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, or in the Alternative, to Sever and Transfer by Defendants Georgetown University, Wake Forest University, and Yale University ) filed byGeorgetown University, Wake Forest University. (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 1/17/2020)
January 17, 2020 Filing 138 Joinder re #134 Opposition/Response to Motion, #135 Reply to Opposition/Response by Georgetown University, Wake Forest University. (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 1/17/2020)
January 17, 2020 Filing 137 REPLY (re #106 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint ) filed byThe Regents of the University of California. (Stern, William) (Filed on 1/17/2020)
January 17, 2020 Filing 136 RESPONSE re #105 Request for Judicial Notice, The California University Defendants' Reply In Support of Request for Judicial Notice by The Regents of the University of California. (Stern, William) (Filed on 1/17/2020)
January 17, 2020 Filing 135 REPLY (re #104 MOTION to Sever or Misjoinder in Support of the California Defendants' Motion to Dismiss ) filed byThe Regents of the University of California. (Stern, William) (Filed on 1/17/2020)
January 17, 2020 Filing 134 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #95 MOTION to Dismiss (The California University Defendants) ) filed byStanford University. (Grenfell, John) (Filed on 1/17/2020)
January 15, 2020 Filing 133 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward J. Davila: Status Conference held on 1/15/2020. The Motions hearing date of 2/13/2020 remains as to Cases 5:19-cv-01405-EJD and 5:19-cv-03411-EJD. The Court will approve and file the Stipulation/Proposed Order #35 to Stay Response in the Case 5:19-cv-08466-EJD. Plaintiff Attorney: John Medler,Alia Abdi,Kevin Mahoney. Defendant Attorney: James Fogelman,Kim Do,Hakeem Risk,Molly Jennings,Laura Goodall,Adam Doerr,Mark Seifert,Stephen Devereaux,Jacob Sorenson. NO APPEARANCE MADE BY DEFENDANT SINGER or SINGER ENTITIES. Total Time in Court:10:14-10:34am(20 Mins.) Court Reporter: Irene Rodriguez. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/15/2020)
January 14, 2020 Filing 132 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Marie Goodall Of Counsel for Defendant Georgetown University (Goodall, Laura) (Filed on 1/14/2020)
January 9, 2020 Filing 131 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant Yale University by LaNae Durden, Leilani Durden, Yasamin Ghodsbin, Keith Hall, Marine Hall-Poirier, Kasra Keyhan, Laila Keyhan, Timmy Mai, Chrissy Pham, Laurence Poirier, Cole Smith, Ronda Smith, Alyssa Tamboura, Amy Tatusko, Kathleen Tatusko, Candace Tjoa, Mika Tjoa, Angelique Vollmer, Michael Vollmer (Abdi, Alia) (Filed on 1/9/2020)
January 6, 2020 Filing 130 STATUS REPORT (Joint) by The University of Southern California. (Fogelman, James) (Filed on 1/6/2020)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 129 Order Relating Cases; Terminating #128 Administrative Motion Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/6/2020. 5:19-cv-03411-EJD Tamboura et al v. Singer et al is deemed related to 5:19-cv-01405-EJD Bendis et al v. Singer et al.(ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2020)
January 3, 2020 Filing 128 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION To Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related Pursuant to Civil L.R. 7-11 filed by The University of Southern California. Responses due by 1/7/2020. (Fogelman, James) (Filed on 1/3/2020)
December 13, 2019 Filing 127 NOTICE by LaNae Durden, Leilani Durden, Yasamin Ghodsbin, Keith Hall, Marine Hall-Poirier, Kasra Keyhan, Laila Keyhan, Timmy Mai, Chrissy Pham, Laurence Poirier, Cole Smith, Ronda Smith, Alyssa Tamboura, Amy Tatusko, Kathleen Tatusko, Candace Tjoa, Mika Tjoa, Angelique Vollmer, Michael Vollmer re #108 Joinder, of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Out of State Defendants' Joinder (Cialkowski, David) (Filed on 12/13/2019)
December 13, 2019 Filing 126 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #106 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint ) filed byLaNae Durden, Leilani Durden, Yasamin Ghodsbin, Keith Hall, Marine Hall-Poirier, Kasra Keyhan, Laila Keyhan, Timmy Mai, Chrissy Pham, Laurence Poirier, Cole Smith, Ronda Smith, Alyssa Tamboura, Amy Tatusko, Kathleen Tatusko, Candace Tjoa, Mika Tjoa, Angelique Vollmer, Michael Vollmer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Cialkowski, #2 Exhibit A-F)(Cialkowski, David) (Filed on 12/13/2019)
December 13, 2019 Filing 125 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #95 MOTION to Dismiss (The California University Defendants) ) filed byLaNae Durden, Leilani Durden, Yasamin Ghodsbin, Keith Hall, Marine Hall-Poirier, Kasra Keyhan, Laila Keyhan, Timmy Mai, Chrissy Pham, Laurence Poirier, Cole Smith, Ronda Smith, Alyssa Tamboura, Amy Tatusko, Kathleen Tatusko, Candace Tjoa, Mika Tjoa, Angelique Vollmer, Michael Vollmer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Cialkowski, #2 Exhibit A-H)(Cialkowski, David) (Filed on 12/13/2019)
December 13, 2019 Filing 124 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #107 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, or in the Alternative, to Sever and Transfer by Defendants Georgetown University, Wake Forest University, and Yale University ) filed byLaNae Durden, Leilani Durden, Yasamin Ghodsbin, Keith Hall, Marine Hall-Poirier, Kasra Keyhan, Laila Keyhan, Timmy Mai, Chrissy Pham, Laurence Poirier, Cole Smith, Ronda Smith, Alyssa Tamboura, Amy Tatusko, Kathleen Tatusko, Candace Tjoa, Mika Tjoa, Angelique Vollmer, Michael Vollmer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Cialkowski, #2 Exhibit A-M)(Cialkowski, David) (Filed on 12/13/2019)
December 13, 2019 Filing 123 OPPOSITION by LaNae Durden, Leilani Durden, Yasamin Ghodsbin, Keith Hall, Marine Hall-Poirier, Kasra Keyhan, Laila Keyhan, Timmy Mai, Chrissy Pham, Laurence Poirier, Cole Smith, Ronda Smith, Alyssa Tamboura, Amy Tatusko, Kathleen Tatusko, Candace Tjoa, Mika Tjoa, Angelique Vollmer, Michael Vollmer re #105 Request for Judicial Notice. (Cialkowski, David) (Filed on 12/13/2019) Modified on 12/13/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 13, 2019 Filing 122 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #104 MOTION to Sever or Misjoinder in Support of the California Defendants' Motion to Dismiss ) filed byLaNae Durden, Leilani Durden, Yasamin Ghodsbin, Keith Hall, Marine Hall-Poirier, Kasra Keyhan, Laila Keyhan, Timmy Mai, Chrissy Pham, Laurence Poirier, Cole Smith, Ronda Smith, Alyssa Tamboura, Amy Tatusko, Kathleen Tatusko, Candace Tjoa, Mika Tjoa, Angelique Vollmer, Michael Vollmer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David M. Cialkowski, #2 Exhibit A-D)(Cialkowski, David) (Filed on 12/13/2019)
December 9, 2019 Filing 121 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING HEARING. Please take NOTICE that a Status Conference is HEREBY SET for 1/15/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Joint Status Report due by 1/6/2020. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2019)
November 4, 2019 Filing 120 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy William Loose FOR DEFENDANT UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA (Loose, Timothy) (Filed on 11/4/2019)
October 29, 2019 Filing 119 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Cole Smith, Candace Tjoa, Michael Vollmer, Laila Keyhan, Marine Hall-Poirier, Alyssa Tamboura, Kasra Keyhan, Angelique Vollmer, LaNae Durden, Amy Tatusko, Ronda Smith, Leilani Durden, Kathleen Tatusko, Mika Tjoa, Keith Hall, Chrissy Pham, Timmy Mai, Laurence Poirier, Yasamin Ghodsbin. Service waived by William Rick Singer waiver sent on 9/27/2019, answer due 11/26/2019. (Abdi, Alia) (Filed on 10/29/2019)
October 21, 2019 Filing 118 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING HEARING. Please take NOTICE that the Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 10/31/2019 is HEREBY CONTINUED to 4/2/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/23/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2019)
October 21, 2019 Filing 117 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by The University of Southern California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fogelman, James) (Filed on 10/21/2019)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER APPROVAL re #111 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant THE UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS AT AUSTIN ONLY. The Clerk shall terminate Defendant UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS AT AUSTIN Only from this action. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/18/2019. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2019)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER Granting #103 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Adam Reinke, Counsel for Yale University. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/17/2019. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2019)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER Granting #102 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Shelby S. Guilbert, Jr., Counsel for Yale University. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/17/2019. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2019)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER Granting #101 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Stephen B. Devereaux, Counsel for Yale University. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/17/2019. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2019)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER Granting #100 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Meghan H. Magruder, Counsel for Yale University. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/17/2019. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2019)
October 16, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Document not properly linked. [err102]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #108 Joinder,, filed by Yale University, Georgetown University, Wake Forest University, GEORGETOWN UNIVERSITY (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2019)
October 16, 2019 Filing 111 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant The University of Texas at Austin by Dirk Armbrust, Karl Armbrust, Jillian Garcia, Victor Garcia (Abdi, Alia) (Filed on 10/16/2019)
October 11, 2019 Filing 110 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION. Motion Hearing as to #104 Motion to Sever or Misjoinder in Support of the California Defendants' Motion to Dismiss set for 2/13/2020 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 11, 2019 Filing 109 Certificate of Interested Entities by Georgetown University identifying Corporate Parent GEORGETOWN UNIVERSITY for Georgetown University. (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 10/11/2019) Modified on 10/16/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 11, 2019 Filing 108 Joinder re #95 #104 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, or in the Alternative, to Sever and Transfer by Defendants Georgetown University, Wake Forest University, and Yale University by Georgetown University, Wake Forest University, Yale University. (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 10/11/2019) Modified on 10/16/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/16/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 11, 2019 Filing 107 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, or in the Alternative, to Sever and Transfer by Defendants Georgetown University, Wake Forest University, and Yale University filed by Georgetown University, Wake Forest University, Yale University. Motion Hearing set for 2/13/2020 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 10/25/2019. Replies due by 11/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 11, 2019 Filing 106 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by The Regents of the University of California. Motion Hearing set for 2/13/2020 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 10/25/2019. Replies due by 11/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stern, William) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 11, 2019 Filing 105 Request for Judicial Notice re #104 MOTION to Sever or Misjoinder in Support of the California Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #95 MOTION to Dismiss (The California University Defendants) The California University Defendants' filed byThe Regents of the University of California. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #104 , #95 ) (Stern, William) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 11, 2019 Filing 104 MOTION to Sever or Misjoinder in Support of the California Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by The Regents of the University of California. Motion Hearing set for 2/13/2019 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 10/25/2019. Replies due by 11/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stern, William) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 11, 2019 Filing 103 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Adam Reinke ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13787750.) filed by Yale University. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Reinke, Adam) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 11, 2019 Filing 102 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Shelby S. Guilbert, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13787724.) filed by Yale University. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Guilbert, Shelby) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 11, 2019 Filing 101 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Stephen B. Devereaux ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13787697.) filed by Yale University. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Devereaux, Stephen) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 11, 2019 Filing 100 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Meghan H. Magruder ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13787665.) filed by Yale University. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Magruder, Meghan) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 11, 2019 Filing 99 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options on behalf of Yale University (Shepard, Michael) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 11, 2019 Filing 98 Certificate of Interested Entities by Yale University and Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 Disclosures (Shepard, Michael) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 11, 2019 Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Shepard on behalf of Yale University (Shepard, Michael) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 11, 2019 Filing 96 MOTION to Dismiss filed by The University of Texas at Austin. Motion Hearing set for 2/13/2020 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 12/13/2019. Replies due by 1/17/2020. (Biggs, Adam) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 11, 2019 Filing 95 MOTION to Dismiss (The California University Defendants) filed by Stanford University. Motion Hearing set for 2/13/2020 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 10/25/2019. Replies due by 11/1/2019. (Grenfell, John) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 11, 2019 Filing 94 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cole Smith, Candace Tjoa, Michael Vollmer, Laila Keyhan, Marine Hall-Poirier, Alyssa Tamboura, Kasra Keyhan, Victor Garcia, Angelique Vollmer, LaNae Durden, Amy Tatusko, Karl Armbrust, Ronda Smith, Leilani Durden, Kathleen Tatusko, Mika Tjoa, Keith Hall, Chrissy Pham, Dirk Armbrust, Jillian Garcia, Timmy Mai, Laurence Poirier, Yasamin Ghodsbin. The Edge College & Career Network, LLC served on 9/20/2019, answer due 10/11/2019. (Abdi, Alia) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 11, 2019 Filing 93 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cole Smith, Candace Tjoa, Michael Vollmer, Laila Keyhan, Marine Hall-Poirier, Alyssa Tamboura, Kasra Keyhan, Victor Garcia, Angelique Vollmer, LaNae Durden, Amy Tatusko, Karl Armbrust, Ronda Smith, Leilani Durden, Kathleen Tatusko, Mika Tjoa, Keith Hall, Chrissy Pham, Dirk Armbrust, Jillian Garcia, Timmy Mai, Laurence Poirier, Yasamin Ghodsbin. The Key Worldwide Foundation served on 9/19/2019, answer due 10/10/2019. (Abdi, Alia) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 10, 2019 Filing 92 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by The Regents of the University of California and Civil Local Rule 3-15 Certification (Stern, William) (Filed on 10/10/2019)
October 10, 2019 Filing 91 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Stanford University (Sorensen, Jacob) (Filed on 10/10/2019)
October 10, 2019 Filing 90 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Stanford University and Civil Local Rule 3-15 Certification (Sorensen, Jacob) (Filed on 10/10/2019)
October 10, 2019 Filing 89 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Stern, William) (Filed on 10/10/2019)
October 10, 2019 Filing 88 Certificate of Interested Entities by The University of Southern California (Fogelman, James) (Filed on 10/10/2019)
October 10, 2019 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by John M. Grenfell On behalf of defendant Stanford University (Grenfell, John) (Filed on 10/10/2019)
October 10, 2019 Filing 86 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah G. Flanagan On behalf of defendant Stanford University (Flanagan, Sarah) (Filed on 10/10/2019)
October 10, 2019 Filing 85 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options for Wake Forest University (Doerr, Adam) (Filed on 10/10/2019)
October 10, 2019 Filing 84 Certificate of Interested Entities by Wake Forest University (Doerr, Adam) (Filed on 10/10/2019)
October 10, 2019 Filing 83 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 10/10/2019)
October 10, 2019 Filing 82 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options for Defendant The University of Southern California (Fogelman, James) (Filed on 10/10/2019)
October 10, 2019 Filing 81 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options for Plaintiffs Alyssa Tamboura, Marine Hall-Poirier, Keith Hall, Laurence Poirier, Yasamin Ghodsbin, Mika Tjoa, Candace Tjoa, Timmy Mai, Chrissy Pham, Leilani Durden, LaNae Durden, Laila Keyhan, Kasra Keyhan, Cole Smith, Ronda Smith, Kathleen Tatusko, Amy Tatusko, Angelique Vollmer and Michael Vollmer (Abdi, Alia) (Filed on 10/10/2019)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER APPROVAL re #72 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Falen Robinson, Caleb Crane, Esteban Frausto. Plaintiffs Esteban Frausto, Caleb Crane and Falen Robinson ONLY shall be terminated from the action. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/9/2019. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2019)
October 8, 2019 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Michael Davidson (Davidson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
October 8, 2019 Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by Hakeem Salib Rizk (Rizk, Hakeem) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
October 8, 2019 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by William Lewis Stern (Stern, William) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Order Granting #75 Stipulation to Stay Discovery Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/8/2019.(ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
October 7, 2019 Filing 75 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Stay Discovery filed by The University of Southern California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fogelman, James) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 74 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Amended Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, and Supplementary Materials served on William "Rick" Singer on 10/01/2019, filed by Dirk Armbrust, Karl Armbrust, Caleb Crane, LaNae Durden, Leilani Durden, Esteban Frausto, Jillian Garcia, Victor Garcia, Yasamin Ghodsbin, Keith Hall, Marine Hall-Poirier, Kasra Keyhan, Laila Keyhan, Timmy Mai, Chrissy Pham, Laurence Poirier, Falen Robinson, Cole Smith, Ronda Smith, Alyssa Tamboura, Amy Tatusko, Kathleen Tatusko, Candace Tjoa, Mika Tjoa, Angelique Vollmer, Michael Vollmer. (Abdi, Alia) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 73 Certificate of Interested Entities by Dirk Armbrust, Karl Armbrust, LaNae Durden, Leilani Durden, Jillian Garcia, Victor Garcia, Yasamin Ghodsbin, Keith Hall, Marine Hall-Poirier, Kasra Keyhan, Laila Keyhan, Timmy Mai, Chrissy Pham, Laurence Poirier, Cole Smith, Ronda Smith, Alyssa Tamboura, Amy Tatusko, Kathleen Tatusko, Candace Tjoa, Mika Tjoa, Angelique Vollmer, Michael Vollmer (Abdi, Alia) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 72 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Plaintiffs Esteban Frausto, Caleb Crane and Falen Robinson by Caleb Crane, Esteban Frausto, Falen Robinson (Abdi, Alia) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Order Granting #70 Administrative Motion re Service Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila.(ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 12, 2019 Filing 70 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Extend Time for Service Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 4(m) filed by Dirk Armbrust, Karl Armbrust, Caleb Crane, LaNae Durden, Leilani Durden, Esteban Frausto, Jillian Garcia, Victor Garcia, Yasamin Ghodsbin, Keith Hall, Marine Hall-Poirier, Kasra Keyhan, Laila Keyhan, Timmy Mai, Chrissy Pham, Laurence Poirier, Falen Robinson, Cole Smith, Ronda Smith, Alyssa Tamboura, Amy Tatusko, Kathleen Tatusko, Candace Tjoa, Mika Tjoa, Angelique Vollmer, Michael Vollmer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit - A, #3 Exhibit - B, #4 Exhibit - C, #5 Exhibit - D, #6 Exhibit - E, #7 Exhibit - F, #8 Proposed Order)(Abdi, Alia) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
August 16, 2019 Filing 69 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Georgetown University, William Rick Singer, Stanford University, The Edge College & Career Network, LLC, The Key Worldwide Foundation, The Regents of the University of California, The University of Southern California, The University of Texas at Austin, Wake Forest University, Yale University. Filed byCole Smith, Candace Tjoa, Michael Vollmer, Laila Keyhan, Marine Hall-Poirier, Alyssa Tamboura, Kasra Keyhan, Victor Garcia, Angelique Vollmer, LaNae Durden, Falen Robinson, Amy Tatusko, Esteban Frausto, Karl Armbrust, Ronda Smith, Leilani Durden, Kathleen Tatusko, Mika Tjoa, Keith Hall, Chrissy Pham, Dirk Armbrust, Jillian Garcia, Timmy Mai, Laurence Poirier, Caleb Crane, Yasamin Ghodsbin. (Abdi, Alia) (Filed on 8/16/2019)
August 16, 2019 Filing 68 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant The University of San Diego by Dirk Armbrust, Karl Armbrust, Caleb Crane, LaNae Durden, Leilani Durden, Esteban Frausto, Jillian Garcia, Victor Garcia, Yasamin Ghodsbin, Keith Hall, Marine Hall-Poirier, Kasra Keyhan, Laila Keyhan, Timmy Mai, Chrissy Pham, Laurence Poirier, Falen Robinson, Cole Smith, Ronda Smith, Alyssa Tamboura, Amy Tatusko, Kathleen Tatusko, Candace Tjoa, Mika Tjoa, Angelique Vollmer, Michael Vollmer (Abdi, Alia) (Filed on 8/16/2019)
August 16, 2019 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Cody Sullivan, Esq (Sullivan, Michael) (Filed on 8/16/2019)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER Granting #63 Application for Pro Admission of Attorney Hac Vice for Bruce M. Berman, Counsel for Georgetown University. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/12/2019. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Granting #64 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Mollly M. Jennings, Counsel for Georgetown University. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/12/2019. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 9, 2019 Filing 64 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13597367.) Filing fee previously paid on 08/09/2019 filed by Georgetown University. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Jennings, Molly) (Filed on 8/9/2019)
August 9, 2019 Filing 63 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13597277.) filed by Georgetown University. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Berman, Bruce) (Filed on 8/9/2019)
August 9, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A Mugmon (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 8/9/2019)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Granting #60 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Adam Arthur Biggs, Counsel for the University of Texas at Austin. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/8/2019. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2019)
August 8, 2019 Filing 60 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13594185.) filed by The University of Texas at Austin. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Standing)(Biggs, Adam) (Filed on 8/8/2019)
August 8, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob R. Sorensen on Behalf of Defendant Stanford University (Sorensen, Jacob) (Filed on 8/8/2019)
August 8, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Miles Medina on Behalf of Defendant The University of Texas at Austin (Medina, Alexander) (Filed on 8/8/2019)
August 8, 2019 ***Set Deadlines/Hearings per ECF #57 Order: Amended Pleadings due by 8/16/2019. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/21/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/31/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. Dispositive Motion due by 10/11/2019. Responses due by 12/13/2019. Replies due by 1/17/2020. Motion Hearing set for 2/13/2020 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2019)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Order Granting as Modified #56 Stipulation Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/8/2019. The court tentatively sets the hearing for the anticipated motion(s) for 2/13/2020 at 9:00 a.m. The case management conference set for 10/3/2019 is continued until 10/31/2019. The parties' joint CMC statement is due 10/21/2019.(ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2019)
August 7, 2019 Filing 56 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #1 Complaint,,, filed by The University of Texas at Austin. (Hacker, David) (Filed on 8/7/2019)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Granting #45 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Adam K. Doerr, Counsel for Wake Forest University. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/30/2019. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2019)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Granting #46 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Amanda P. Nitto, Counsel for Wake Forest University. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/30/2019. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2019)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Granting #47 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Travis S. Hinman, Counsel for Wake Forest University. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/30/2019. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2019)
July 25, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Kim Uyen Do (Do, Kim) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 25, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Avery Elizabeth Masters (Masters, Avery) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 25, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by George Charles Nierlich, III (Nierlich, George) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 25, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Debra Wong Yang (Yang, Debra) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 25, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by James P. Fogelman (Fogelman, James) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 24, 2019 Filing 47 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Travis S. Hinman ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13551040.) filed by Wake Forest University. (Seifert, Mark) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 24, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Amanda P. Nitto ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13551037.) filed by Wake Forest University. (Seifert, Mark) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 24, 2019 Filing 45 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Adam K. Doerr ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13551031.) filed by Wake Forest University. (Seifert, Mark) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 17, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark J. Seifert on Behalf of Wake Forest University (Seifert, Mark) (Filed on 7/17/2019)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Order Granting #42 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/10/2019.(ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2019)
July 9, 2019 Filing 42 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint filed by The University of Southern California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fogelman, James) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
July 9, 2019 Filing 41 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cole Smith, Candace Tjoa, Michael Vollmer, Laila Keyhan, Marine Hall-Poirier, Alyssa Tamboura, Kasra Keyhan, Victor Garcia, Angelique Vollmer, LaNae Durden, Falen Robinson, Amy Tatusko, Esteban Frausto, Karl Armbrust, Ronda Smith, Leilani Durden, Kathleen Tatusko, Mika Tjoa, Keith Hall, Chrissy Pham, Dirk Armbrust, Jillian Garcia, Timmy Mai, Laurence Poirier, Caleb Crane, Yasamin Ghodsbin. The Regents of the University of California served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. (Abdi, Alia) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
July 9, 2019 Filing 40 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cole Smith, Candace Tjoa, Michael Vollmer, Laila Keyhan, Marine Hall-Poirier, Alyssa Tamboura, Kasra Keyhan, Victor Garcia, Angelique Vollmer, LaNae Durden, Falen Robinson, Amy Tatusko, Esteban Frausto, Karl Armbrust, Ronda Smith, Leilani Durden, Kathleen Tatusko, Mika Tjoa, Keith Hall, Chrissy Pham, Dirk Armbrust, Jillian Garcia, Timmy Mai, Laurence Poirier, Caleb Crane, Yasamin Ghodsbin. Georgetown University served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019. (Abdi, Alia) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
July 9, 2019 Filing 39 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cole Smith, Candace Tjoa, Michael Vollmer, Laila Keyhan, Marine Hall-Poirier, Alyssa Tamboura, Kasra Keyhan, Victor Garcia, Angelique Vollmer, LaNae Durden, Falen Robinson, Amy Tatusko, Esteban Frausto, Karl Armbrust, Ronda Smith, Leilani Durden, Kathleen Tatusko, Mika Tjoa, Keith Hall, Chrissy Pham, Dirk Armbrust, Jillian Garcia, Timmy Mai, Laurence Poirier, Caleb Crane, Yasamin Ghodsbin. Yale University served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019. (Abdi, Alia) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
July 9, 2019 Filing 38 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cole Smith, Candace Tjoa, Michael Vollmer, Laila Keyhan, Marine Hall-Poirier, Alyssa Tamboura, Kasra Keyhan, Victor Garcia, Angelique Vollmer, LaNae Durden, Falen Robinson, Amy Tatusko, Esteban Frausto, Karl Armbrust, Ronda Smith, Leilani Durden, Kathleen Tatusko, Mika Tjoa, Keith Hall, Chrissy Pham, Dirk Armbrust, Jillian Garcia, Timmy Mai, Laurence Poirier, Caleb Crane, Yasamin Ghodsbin. Wake Forest University served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019. (Abdi, Alia) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
July 9, 2019 Filing 37 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cole Smith, Candace Tjoa, Michael Vollmer, Laila Keyhan, Marine Hall-Poirier, Alyssa Tamboura, Kasra Keyhan, Victor Garcia, Angelique Vollmer, LaNae Durden, Falen Robinson, Amy Tatusko, Esteban Frausto, Karl Armbrust, Ronda Smith, Leilani Durden, Kathleen Tatusko, Mika Tjoa, Keith Hall, Chrissy Pham, Dirk Armbrust, Jillian Garcia, Timmy Mai, Laurence Poirier, Caleb Crane, Yasamin Ghodsbin. The University of Texas at Austin served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019. (Abdi, Alia) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
July 9, 2019 Filing 36 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cole Smith, Candace Tjoa, Michael Vollmer, Laila Keyhan, Marine Hall-Poirier, Alyssa Tamboura, Kasra Keyhan, Victor Garcia, Angelique Vollmer, LaNae Durden, Falen Robinson, Amy Tatusko, Esteban Frausto, Karl Armbrust, Ronda Smith, Leilani Durden, Kathleen Tatusko, Mika Tjoa, Keith Hall, Chrissy Pham, Dirk Armbrust, Jillian Garcia, Timmy Mai, Laurence Poirier, Caleb Crane, Yasamin Ghodsbin. The University of San Diego served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019. (Abdi, Alia) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
July 9, 2019 Filing 35 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cole Smith, Candace Tjoa, Michael Vollmer, Laila Keyhan, Marine Hall-Poirier, Alyssa Tamboura, Kasra Keyhan, Victor Garcia, Angelique Vollmer, LaNae Durden, Falen Robinson, Amy Tatusko, Esteban Frausto, Karl Armbrust, Ronda Smith, Leilani Durden, Kathleen Tatusko, Mika Tjoa, Keith Hall, Chrissy Pham, Dirk Armbrust, Jillian Garcia, Timmy Mai, Laurence Poirier, Caleb Crane, Yasamin Ghodsbin. Stanford University served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Abdi, Alia) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
July 9, 2019 Filing 34 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cole Smith, Candace Tjoa, Michael Vollmer, Laila Keyhan, Marine Hall-Poirier, Alyssa Tamboura, Kasra Keyhan, Victor Garcia, Angelique Vollmer, LaNae Durden, Falen Robinson, Amy Tatusko, Esteban Frausto, Karl Armbrust, Ronda Smith, Leilani Durden, Kathleen Tatusko, Mika Tjoa, Keith Hall, Chrissy Pham, Dirk Armbrust, Jillian Garcia, Timmy Mai, Laurence Poirier, Caleb Crane, Yasamin Ghodsbin. The University of Southern California served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019. (Abdi, Alia) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Granting #32 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Alia M. Abdi, Counsel for Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/28/2019. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13477010.) filed by Dirk Armbrust, Karl Armbrust, Caleb Crane, LaNae Durden, Leilani Durden, Esteban Frausto, Jillian Garcia, Victor Garcia, Yasamin Ghodsbin, Keith Hall, Marine Hall-Poirier, Kasra Keyhan, Laila Keyhan, Timmy Mai, Chrissy Pham, Laurence Poirier, Falen Robinson, Cole Smith, Ronda Smith, Alyssa Tamboura, Amy Tatusko, Kathleen Tatusko, Candace Tjoa, Mika Tjoa, Angelique Vollmer, Michael Vollmer. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Abdi, Alia) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting #30 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for David M. Cialkowski, Counsel for Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/26/2019. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 26, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13469420.) filed by Dirk Armbrust, Karl Armbrust, Caleb Crane, LaNae Durden, Leilani Durden, Esteban Frausto, Jillian Garcia, Victor Garcia, Yasamin Ghodsbin, Keith Hall, Marine Hall-Poirier, Kasra Keyhan, Laila Keyhan, Timmy Mai, Chrissy Pham, Laurence Poirier, Falen Robinson, Cole Smith, Ronda Smith, Alyssa Tamboura, Amy Tatusko, Kathleen Tatusko, Candace Tjoa, Mika Tjoa, Angelique Vollmer, Michael Vollmer. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Cialkowski, David) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 29 (Text Only) CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/23/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/3/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Hon. Edward J. Davila. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. e Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 6/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 27 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 26 Summons Issued as to Georgetown University. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 25 Summons Issued as to Yale University. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 24 Summons Issued as to Wake Forest University. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 23 Summons Issued as to The University of Texas at Austin. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 22 Summons Issued as to The University of San Diego. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 21 Summons Issued as to Stanford University. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 20 Summons Issued as to The Regents of the University of California. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 19 Summons Issued as to The University of Southern California. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to The Edge College & Career Network, LLC. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to The Key Worldwide Foundation. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to William Rick Singer. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 15 Proposed Summons. (Marker, Caleb) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 14 Proposed Summons. (Marker, Caleb) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 13 Proposed Summons. (Marker, Caleb) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 12 Proposed Summons. (Marker, Caleb) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 11 Proposed Summons. (Marker, Caleb) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 10 Proposed Summons. (Marker, Caleb) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. (Marker, Caleb) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. (Marker, Caleb) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. (Marker, Caleb) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Marker, Caleb) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Marker, Caleb) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Dirk Armbrust, Karl Armbrust, Caleb Crane, LaNae Durden, Leilani Durden, Esteban Frausto, Jillian Garcia, Victor Garcia, Yasamin Ghodsbin, Keith Hall, Marine Hall-Poirier, Kasra Keyhan, Laila Keyhan, Timmy Mai, Chrissy Pham, Laurence Poirier, Falen Robinson, Cole Smith, Ronda Smith, Alyssa Tamboura, Amy Tatusko, Kathleen Tatusko, Candace Tjoa, Mika Tjoa, Angelique Vollmer, Michael Vollmer.. (Marker, Caleb) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/10/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/17/2019 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/28/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Georgetown University, William Rick Singer, Stanford University, The Edge College & Career Network, LLC d/b/a The Key, The Key Worldwide Foundation, The Regents of the University of California, The University of San Diego, The University of Southern California, The University of Texas at Austin, Wake Forest University, Yale University ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13439425.). Filed byCole Smith, Candace Tjoa, Michael Vollmer, Laila Keyhan, Marine Hall-Poirier, Alyssa Tamboura, Kasra Keyhan, Victor Garcia, Angelique Vollmer, LaNae Durden, Falen Robinson, Amy Tatusko, Esteban Frausto, Karl Armbrust, Ronda Smith, Leilani Durden, Kathleen Tatusko, Mika Tjoa, Keith Hall, Chrissy Pham, Dirk Armbrust, Jillian Garcia, Timmy Mai, Laurence Poirier, Caleb Crane, Yasamin Ghodsbin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Marker, Caleb) (Filed on 6/14/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tamboura et al v. Singer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marine Hall-Poirier
Represented By: Caleb Marker
Represented By: Alia Mohamed Abdi
Represented By: David M. Cialkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caleb Crane
Represented By: Caleb Marker
Represented By: Alia Mohamed Abdi
Represented By: David M. Cialkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cole Smith
Represented By: Caleb Marker
Represented By: Alia Mohamed Abdi
Represented By: David M. Cialkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurence Poirier
Represented By: Caleb Marker
Represented By: Alia Mohamed Abdi
Represented By: David M. Cialkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kasra Keyhan
Represented By: Caleb Marker
Represented By: Alia Mohamed Abdi
Represented By: David M. Cialkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karl Armbrust
Represented By: Caleb Marker
Represented By: John F. Medler, Jr.
Represented By: Alia Mohamed Abdi
Represented By: David M. Cialkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dirk Armbrust
Represented By: Caleb Marker
Represented By: John F. Medler, Jr.
Represented By: Alia Mohamed Abdi
Represented By: David M. Cialkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jillian Garcia
Represented By: Caleb Marker
Represented By: Alia Mohamed Abdi
Represented By: David M. Cialkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leilani Durden
Represented By: Caleb Marker
Represented By: Alia Mohamed Abdi
Represented By: David M. Cialkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Falen Robinson
Represented By: Caleb Marker
Represented By: Alia Mohamed Abdi
Represented By: David M. Cialkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candace Tjoa
Represented By: Caleb Marker
Represented By: Alia Mohamed Abdi
Represented By: David M. Cialkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronda Smith
Represented By: Caleb Marker
Represented By: Alia Mohamed Abdi
Represented By: David M. Cialkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Vollmer
Represented By: Caleb Marker
Represented By: John F. Medler, Jr.
Represented By: Alia Mohamed Abdi
Represented By: David M. Cialkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Hall
Represented By: Caleb Marker
Represented By: Alia Mohamed Abdi
Represented By: David M. Cialkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelique Vollmer
Represented By: Caleb Marker
Represented By: Alia Mohamed Abdi
Represented By: David M. Cialkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Tatusko
Represented By: Caleb Marker
Represented By: Alia Mohamed Abdi
Represented By: David M. Cialkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timmy Mai
Represented By: Caleb Marker
Represented By: Alia Mohamed Abdi
Represented By: David M. Cialkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alyssa Tamboura
Represented By: Caleb Marker
Represented By: John F. Medler, Jr.
Represented By: Alia Mohamed Abdi
Represented By: David M. Cialkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mika Tjoa
Represented By: Caleb Marker
Represented By: Alia Mohamed Abdi
Represented By: David M. Cialkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Tatusko
Represented By: Caleb Marker
Represented By: Alia Mohamed Abdi
Represented By: David M. Cialkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaNae Durden
Represented By: Caleb Marker
Represented By: Alia Mohamed Abdi
Represented By: David M. Cialkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Garcia
Represented By: Caleb Marker
Represented By: Alia Mohamed Abdi
Represented By: David M. Cialkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esteban Frausto
Represented By: Caleb Marker
Represented By: Alia Mohamed Abdi
Represented By: David M. Cialkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laila Keyhan
Represented By: Caleb Marker
Represented By: Alia Mohamed Abdi
Represented By: David M. Cialkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chrissy Pham
Represented By: Caleb Marker
Represented By: Alia Mohamed Abdi
Represented By: David M. Cialkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yasamin Ghodsbin
Represented By: Caleb Marker
Represented By: Alia Mohamed Abdi
Represented By: David M. Cialkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanford University
Represented By: Jacob R. Sorensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The University of San Diego
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Edge College & Career Network, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Rick Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Regents of the University of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The University of Texas at Austin
Represented By: Adam Arthur Biggs
Represented By: Alexander Miles Medina
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The University of Southern California
Represented By: Kim Uyen Do
Represented By: Avery Elizabeth Masters
Represented By: George Charles Nierlich, III
Represented By: Debra Wong Yang
Represented By: James P. Fogelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wake Forest University
Represented By: Amanda P. Nitto
Represented By: Travis Styres Hinman
Represented By: Mark J. Seifert
Represented By: Adam Karl Doerr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgetown University
Represented By: Bruce M. Berman
Represented By: Michael A Mugmon
Represented By: Molly Maureen Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yale University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Key Worldwide Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?