Brodsky v. EBAY, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jay Brodsky
Defendant: PayPal Inc, EBAY, Inc. and Nael Yakoub
Case Number: 5:2019cv03443
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Referring Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; Screening Complaint Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e). Amended complaint due by 8/19/2019. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/22/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (pmcS, COURT STAFF).
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 8/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2019)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi for all further proceedings RE #4 Order of Recusal. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen no longer assigned to case. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/18/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (bwS, COURT STAFF).
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Clerk of Court to reassign this case to another Judge. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 6/18/19. (dmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/10/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/17/2019 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jay Brodsky. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EBAY, Inc., PayPal Inc, Nael Yakoub. Filed byJay Brodsky. Consent/Declination due by 7/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brodsky v. EBAY, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Brodsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PayPal Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EBAY, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nael Yakoub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?